Sandra Edmonds v. Byung P Kwon et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Edmonds
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Byung P. Kwon and Barbara B Kwon
Case Number: 2:2021cv00285
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #15 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to All Defendants. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 5/18/2021. (mku)
February 24, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Byung P. Kwon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Won, David)
February 9, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendant Byung P. Kwon.(Attorney David D Won added to party Byung P. Kwon(pty:dft))(Won, David)
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sandra Edmonds, upon Defendant Barbara B Kwon served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barbara B. Kwon, an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Steven, Laura)
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sandra Edmonds, upon Defendant Byung P. Kwon served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Byung P. Kwon, an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Steven, Laura)
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (mku)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Barbara B Kwon. (car)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Byung P. Kwon. (car)
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Sandra Edmonds, (Shahriari, Peter)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sandra Edmonds. (Shahriari, Peter)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Sandra Edmonds. (Shahriari, Peter)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Sandra Edmonds. (Shahriari, Peter)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30003079 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Sandra Edmonds. (Attorney Peter Shahriari added to party Sandra Edmonds(pty:pla))(Shahriari, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandra Edmonds v. Byung P Kwon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byung P. Kwon
Represented By: David D Won
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara B Kwon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Edmonds
Represented By: Peter Shahriari
Represented By: Ani A Avetisyan
Represented By: Laura Anne Steven
Represented By: Anoush Hakimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?