J. Clark et al v. Rita Gail Farris-Ellison et al
Plaintiff: James Clark and J. Clark
Defendant: Doe Bank, Genevieve Adolphus, Yi Ming LLC, Flagstar Bank, FSB, First American Title Insurance Company, Tammy Farris Ellison, Rita Gail Farris Ellison, Just That EZ Financial, Thomas Gibbs, Just That EZ Financial Corporation, Tammy Farris-Ellison, Rita Gail Farris-Ellison, Lenders Escrow, Inc. and Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv00587
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 Mail Returned addressed to J. Clark re Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34), #9 (lc)
March 16, 2021 Filing 15 Mail Returned addressed to J. Clark re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #6 (lc)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court issued an Order to Show Cause #12 (OSC) on 2/16/2021. Defendant Flagstar Bank FSB filed a Response to OSC #13 (Response) on 3/10/2021. Based on Flagstars Response, the Court DISCHARGES the OSC as to Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB. Pursuant to FRCP 4(m), the Court EXTENDS the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the OSC to 4/12/2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 10, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSBto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #12 Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Response to Order to Show Cause)(Reynolds, Roland)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file proofs of service of the Summons and Complaint on all Defendants in this action on or before March 10, 2021. The Court ORDERS Flagstar to show cause, in writing, on or before March 10, 2021, why it has complied with or is excused from complying with the rule of unanimity, see 28 U.S.C. 1446(b)(2)(A). (iv)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 Mail Returned addressed to J. Clark re Order #10 . (iv)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-02009 MWF(AJWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim and Judge Mark C. Scarsi to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00587 MWF(PLAx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #7 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 served on January 25, 2021. (Reynolds, Roland)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB. Related Case(s): 2:16-cv-2009, 2:19-cv-8551 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-6)(Reynolds, Roland)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
January 21, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Genevieve Adolphus, Doe Bank, Does, Rita Gail Farris-Ellison, Tammy Farris-Ellison, First American Title Insurance Company, Flagstar Bank, FSB, Thomas Gibbs, Just That EZ Financial Corporation, Lenders Escrow, Inc., Yi Ming LLC, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff J. Clark. (filed in state court 12/10/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 5) (esa)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB, identifying Flagstar Bancorp. (Reynolds, Roland)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB. (Reynolds, Roland)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20CMCV00325 Receipt No: ACACDC-30175163 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Flagstar Bank, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Removal of Civil Action, #2 Notice of Notice of Removal) (Attorney Roland P Reynolds added to party Flagstar Bank, FSB(pty:dft))(Reynolds, Roland)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J. Clark et al v. Rita Gail Farris-Ellison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genevieve Adolphus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yi Ming LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Represented By: Roland P Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Farris Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Gail Farris Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just That EZ Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just That EZ Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Farris-Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Gail Farris-Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenders Escrow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?