Ostrich International Company, Ltd. v. Michael A. Edwards Group International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ostrich International Company Ltd.
Defendant: Michael A. Edwards Group International, Inc. a California corporation doing business as MAE Group International, Inc., Does 1-25, inclusive and Michael A. Edwards
Petitioner: Michael A. Edwards Group International
Case Number: 2:2021cv00639
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Ostrich International Company Ltd.(Dokko, Theodore)
March 5, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Plaintiffs, filed by plaintiff Ostrich International Company Ltd..(Dokko, Theodore)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 4/19/2021 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 4/12/2021. (lb)
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RETURNED EXECUTED 21 DAY] SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ostrich International Company Ltd., upon Defendant Michael A. Edwards served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Dokko, Theodore) Modified on 2/16/2021 (es).
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 [SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RETURNED EXECUTED 21 DAY] SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ostrich International Company Ltd., upon Defendant Michael A. Edwards Group International, Inc. served on 1/27/2021, answer due 2/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Dokko, Theodore) Modified on 2/16/2021 (es).
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Michael A. Edwards Group International, Inc. answer now due 2/17/2021; Michael A. Edwards answer now due 2/22/2021, filed by Defendants Michael A. Edwards Group International, Inc.; Michael A. Edwards.(Attorney Eugene Samuel Suh added to party Michael A. Edwards(pty:dft), Attorney Eugene Samuel Suh added to party Michael A. Edwards Group International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Suh, Eugene)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00639-JVS-ASx. (aco)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00639 CAS(ASx). (rn)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Michael A. Edwards Group International, Inc. (et)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Michael A. Edwards. (et)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Attorney Theodore Hyun Dokko added to party Ostrich International Company Ltd.(pty:pla))(Dokko, Theodore)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Ostrich International Company Ltd.. (Dokko, Theodore)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Ostrich International Company Ltd.. (Dokko, Theodore)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ostrich International Company Ltd.. (Dokko, Theodore)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-30198085 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Michael A. Edwards Group International. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Theodore Hyun Dokko added to party Michael A. Edwards Group International(pty:bkmov))(Dokko, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ostrich International Company, Ltd. v. Michael A. Edwards Group International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael A. Edwards Group International
Represented By: Theodore Hyun Dokko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ostrich International Company Ltd.
Represented By: Anne K Edwards
Represented By: Theodore Hyun Dokko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Edwards Group International, Inc. a California corporation doing business as MAE Group International, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene Samuel Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Edwards
Represented By: Eugene Samuel Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?