Peak Oil Holdings LLC et al v. County of Ventura
Plaintiff: Peak Oil Holdings LLC
Counter Defendant: Peak Operator LLC and County of Ventura
Counter Claimant: HBH FARM LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00734
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Filing 80 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 23-55239 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #78 as to Counter Claimant HBH FARM LLC(a California limited liability company). (mat)
March 15, 2023 Filing 79 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to HBH FARM LLC, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #78 . (mat)
March 14, 2023 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals HBH FARM LLC. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss #77 . (Kassouni, Timothy)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING County of Ventura's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #70 ). Any amended pleading must be filed and served no later than 3/25/2023. (jp)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer on Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Pre-Trial Dates #75 . See Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 4/22/2024 at 3:00 PM. Trial is continued to 5/28/2024 at 8:30 AM. (jp)
January 30, 2023 Filing 75 Joint STIPULATION to Continue TRIAL and PRE-TRIAL DATES from 09/26/2023 to 05/28/2024 filed by DEFENDANT County of Ventura. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sabey, Andrew)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #70 set for January 23, 2023 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 10, 2023 Filing 73 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HBH FARM'S ENTIRE SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM #70 filed by Defendant County of Ventura. (Sabey, Andrew)
January 3, 2023 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HBH FARM'S ENTIRE SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM #70 filed by Counter Defendant HBH FARM LLC. (Kassouni, Timothy)
January 3, 2023 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HBH FARM'S ENTIRE SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM #70 filed by Cross Defendants Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Plaintiffs Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Counter Defendants Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Peak Operator LLC. (Collins, Craig)
November 18, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HBH FARM'S ENTIRE SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM filed by DEFENDANT County of Ventura. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew B. Sabey, #2 Proposed Order) (Sabey, Andrew)
October 28, 2022 Filing 69 SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant amending Counterclaim #61 ; JURY DEMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CUP 181, #2 Exhibit B - CUP 393, #3 Exhibit C - County of Ventura)(Kassouni, Timothy)
October 28, 2022 Filing 68 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant County of Ventura amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Amended Complaint/Petition, #60 , filed by Plaintiffs Peak Operator LLC, Peak Oil Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Collins, Craig)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part County of Ventura's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Dkt. #62 ). Leave to amend in conformity with this Order is granted. Any amended pleading may be filed and served no later than 10/28/2022. See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss PEAKS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HBHS FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM #62 set for 9/26/2022 at 1:30 p.m. off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
September 13, 2022 Filing 65 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PEAKS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HBHS FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM (F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6)) #62 filed by Defendant County of Ventura. (Sabey, Andrew)
September 6, 2022 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PEAKS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HBHS FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM (F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6)) #62 filed by Cross Claimant HBH FARM LLC, Counter Defendants HBH FARM LLC, HBH FARM LLC, Counter Claimants HBH FARM LLC, HBH FARM LLC. (Kassouni, Timothy)
September 6, 2022 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PEAKS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HBHS FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM (F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6)) #62 filed by Plaintiffs Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC. (Collins, Craig)
August 22, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PEAKS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HBHS FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM (F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6)) filed by DEFENDANT County of Ventura. Motion set for hearing on 9/26/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrey Sabey, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Sabey, Andrew)
July 22, 2022 Filing 61 Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant County of Ventura; Jury Demand, filed by Counterclaimants HBH FARM LLC.(Kassouni, Timothy)
July 21, 2022 Filing 60 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Peak Operator LLC, Peak Oil Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-CUP 181, #2 Exhibit B-CUP 393, #3 Exhibit C-PL14-0195)(Collins, Craig)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Amended Pleadings and Response, and to Continue Trial Date and Pre-Trial Dates #58 . The Jury Trial is continued to 9/26/2023 at 8:30 AM. The Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 8/21/2023 at 3:00 AM. See Order for specifics. (jp)
June 16, 2022 Filing 58 Joint STIPULATION to Continue TRIAL DATE from 01/24/2023 to 09/26/2023 filed by Defendant County of Ventura. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sabey, Andrew)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING County of Ventura's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Dkt. #44 ). Should Peak and HBH choose to file amended complaints, they must be filed and served no later than 6/22/2022. See Order for specifics. (jp)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the COUNTY OF VENTURA'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING PRE-TRIAL DATES #48 set for April 11, 2022 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) Modified on 4/7/2022 (vv).
March 29, 2022 Filing 55 REPLY In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue PRE-TRIAL DATES #48 filed by Defendant County of Ventura. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Sabey)(Sabey, Andrew)
March 24, 2022 Filing 54 Opposition in opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue PRE-TRIAL DATES #48 filed by Cross Defendants Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Plaintiffs Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Counter Defendants Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Peak Operator LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Collins in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition to Defendant County's Ex Parte Application)(Collins, Craig)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Joint Stipulation to Continue Remaining Pre-Trial Dates #52 . The Trial is continued to 1/24/2023 at 8:30 AM. The Pretrial Conference is continued to 12/19/2022 at 3:00 PM. See Order for specifics. (jp)
March 22, 2022 Filing 52 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pre-Trial Dates from Current Dates to Dates as set forth in proposed order filed by Defendant County of Ventura. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Sabey, #2 Proposed Order)(Sabey, Andrew)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The ex parte application #48 should have been filed as a regularly noticed motion. The motion is set for April 11, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Any further opposition is due March 24. Any reply is due March 31.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
March 17, 2022 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue PRE-TRIAL DATES #48 (i.e., re-open discovery) filed by Cross Defendants Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Plaintiffs Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Counter Defendants Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Peak Operator LLC. (Collins, Craig)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings set for March 21, 2022 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
March 15, 2022 Filing 48 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue PRE-TRIAL DATES filed by DEFENDANT County of Ventura. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Sabey, #2 Proposed Order) (Sabey, Andrew)
March 7, 2022 Filing 47 REPLY In Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Complaint by Peak Oil and Counterclaim by HBH Farm #44 filed by Defendant County of Ventura. (Sabey, Andrew)
February 28, 2022 Filing 46 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Complaint by Peak Oil and Counterclaim by HBH Farm #44 filed by Cross Claimant HBH FARM LLC, Counter Defendants HBH FARM LLC, HBH FARM LLC, Counter Claimant HBH FARM LLC. (Kassouni, Timothy)
February 28, 2022 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Complaint by Peak Oil and Counterclaim by HBH Farm #44 filed by Cross Defendants Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Plaintiffs Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Counter Defendants Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Peak Operator LLC. (Collins, Craig)
February 11, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Complaint by Peak Oil and Counterclaim by HBH Farm filed by Defendant County of Ventura. Motion set for hearing on 3/21/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Sabey, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Sabey, Andrew)
October 5, 2021 Filing 43 Counter-Defendant HBH Farm LLC's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #41 with JURY DEMAND Answer to First Amended Counterclaim of County of Ventura filed by Counter-Defendant HBH FARM LLC(a California limited liability company).(Kassouni, Timothy)
October 5, 2021 Filing 42 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #41 with JURY DEMAND filed by Counter Defendant Peak Oil Holdings LLC(a California limited liabiltiy company), Peak Operator LLC(a California limited liability company).(Collins, Craig)
September 14, 2021 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 First Amended Answer and, COUNTERCLAIM against HBH FARM LLC, Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant County of Ventura.(Sabey, Andrew)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The stipulation at docket #38 is approved. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Dates #36 . The Pretrial Conference is continued to 11/14/2022 at 3:00 PM. The Trial is continued to 1/24/2023 at 8:30 AM. See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 2, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM filed by Defendant County of Ventura. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order) (Sabey, Andrew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 37 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant County of Ventura. Amendment to Stipulation for New Trial #36 Proposed Order (Sabey, Andrew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 36 Joint STIPULATION for New Trial on January 23, 2023 filed by Defendant County of Ventura. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Sabey, #2 Proposed Order)(Sabey, Andrew)
June 25, 2021 Filing 35 County of Ventura's ANSWER to Answer to Counterclaim, #32 Answer to Counterclaim filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant County of Ventura.(Sabey, Andrew)
June 24, 2021 Filing 34 ANSWER to Crossclaim #33 with JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiffs and Cross-Defendants Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC.(Collins, Craig)
June 4, 2021 Filing 33 CROSSCLAIM against Cross-Defendant Peak Oil Holdings LLC; Jury Demand, filed by cross-complainant HBH FARM LLC.(Kassouni, Timothy)
June 4, 2021 Filing 32 HBH Farm LLC ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #13 with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against County of Ventura filed by Counter-Defendant HBH FARM LLC.(Kassouni, Timothy)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer Extending Time for Counter-Defendant HBH Farm LLC to Respond to Counterclaim of County of Ventura #30 to 6/4/2021. See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 5, 2021 Filing 30 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Counter-Defendant HBH FARM LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kassouni, Timothy)
May 5, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy V Kassouni on behalf of Counter Defendant HBH FARM LLC (Attorney Timothy V Kassouni added to party HBH FARM LLC(pty:cd))(Kassouni, Timothy)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6/13/22. (rfi)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
April 22, 2021 Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 20, 2021 Filing 25 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Defendant County of Ventura, upon Counter-Defendant HBH FARM LLC served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Sabey, Andrew)
April 20, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric Walts counsel for Counter Claimant County of Ventura, Defendant County of Ventura. Emily T. Gardner is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant County of Ventura. (Walts, Eric)
April 20, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric Walts counsel for Counter Claimant County of Ventura, Defendant County of Ventura. Adding Eric Walts as counsel of record for County of Ventura for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant County of Ventura. (Attorney Eric Walts added to party County of Ventura(pty:cc), Attorney Eric Walts added to party County of Ventura(pty:dft))(Walts, Eric)
April 19, 2021 Filing 22 JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT REPORT of PER RULE 26(F) filed by Plaintiffs Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, Counter Defendants Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC. (Collins, Craig)
April 14, 2021 Filing 21 Peak Oil Holdings' and Peak Operator's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #13 with JURY DEMAND filed by Cross Defendant Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC.(Collins, Craig)
April 9, 2021 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re CAnswer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), COUNTERCLAIM, #13 as to Counter Defendants HBH FARM LLC, Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC. (shb)
April 8, 2021 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #13 filed by Defendant County of Ventura. (Sabey, Andrew)
April 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #17 . The following error(s) was found: Please indicate as to "COUNTERCLAIM" right after SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please indicate the counter-claimant(s) in the "To": Space on the summons. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (shb)
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #13 filed by Defendant County of Ventura. (Sabey, Andrew)
April 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #15 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the Counterclaim verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the Counterclaim or a second page addendum to the Summons. Please indicate as to "COUNTERCLAIM" right after SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
April 1, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #13 filed by defendant/counter-claimant County of Ventura. (Sabey, Andrew)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
March 24, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , COUNTERCLAIM against Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant County of Ventura.(Attorney Andrew B Sabey added to party County of Ventura(pty:dft))(Sabey, Andrew)
February 9, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to County of Ventura answer now due 3/24/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant County of Ventura.(Attorney Emily T Gardner added to party County of Ventura(pty:dft))(Gardner, Emily)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant County of Ventura. (jp)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC. (Collins, Craig)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC. (Collins, Craig)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC, (Collins, Craig)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC. (Collins, Craig)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30267205 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Peak Oil Holdings LLC, Peak Operator LLC. (Attorney Craig M Collins added to party Peak Oil Holdings LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Craig M Collins added to party Peak Operator LLC(pty:pla))(Collins, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peak Oil Holdings LLC et al v. County of Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Peak Operator LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Ann Axtell
Represented By: Craig M Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: County of Ventura
Represented By: Andrew B Sabey
Represented By: Eric Walts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peak Oil Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Ann Axtell
Represented By: Craig M Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: HBH FARM LLC
Represented By: Timothy V Kassouni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?