Sean Colvin et al v. Valve Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Everett Stephens, Ryan Lally, Sean Colvin, Hope Marchionda and Susann Davis
Defendant: Valve Corporation, kChamp Games, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc., CD Projekt, Inc., Rust, LLC, Ubisoft Entertainment S.A., CD Projekt S.A., Devolver Digital, Inc. and Ubisoft L.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00801
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles Blaine Casper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Valve Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30995194) filed by Defendant Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Pennsylvania, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - New Jersey, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - New York, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - Utah, #5 Proposed Order) (Mouradian, Mhare)
March 23, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marc Ellis Mayer counsel for Defendants CD Projekt S.A., CD Projekt, Inc.. Adding Marc E. Mayer as counsel of record for Defendants CD Projekt S.A. and CD Projekt, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants CD Projekt S.A. and CD Projekt, Inc.. (Attorney Marc Ellis Mayer added to party CD Projekt S.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Ellis Mayer added to party CD Projekt, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mayer, Marc)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: GRANTING #14 Non-Resident Attorney Kara M. Mundy APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens, designating Thomas N. McCormick as local counsel. (shb)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: GRANTING #15 Non-Resident Attorney Timothy B. McGranor APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens, designating Thomas N. McCormick as local counsel. (shb)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: GRANTING #16 Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth J. Rubin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens, designating Thomas N. McCormick as local counsel. (shb)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: GRANTING #20 Non-Resident Attorney Gavin W. Skok APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Valve Corporation, designating Mhare Mouradian as local counsel. (shb)
March 17, 2021 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gavin W. Skok to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Valve Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30938301) filed by Defendant Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - WA Supreme Court, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - WA Western District, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - WA Eastern Districk, #4 Decl of G. Skok re 9th Circuit Certificate, #5 Proposed Order) (Mouradian, Mhare)
March 17, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Valve Corporation answer now due 4/21/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Valve Corporation.(Attorney Mhare Ohan Mouradian added to party Valve Corporation(pty:dft))(Mouradian, Mhare)
March 10, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Devolver Digital, Inc. answer now due 4/26/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Devolver Digital, Inc..(Attorney Teresa Harrold Michaud added to party Devolver Digital, Inc.(pty:dft))(Michaud, Teresa)
March 1, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Rust, LLC answer now due 4/5/2021, filed by Defendant Rust, LLC.(Attorney Todd W Bonder added to party Rust, LLC(pty:dft))(Bonder, Todd)
February 24, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth J. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30684754) filed by Plaintiff Attorney Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (McCormick, Thomas)
February 24, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy B. McGranor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30684574) filed by Plaintiff Attorney Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (McCormick, Thomas)
February 24, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kara M. Mundy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30684456) filed by Plaintiff Attorney Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (McCormick, Thomas)
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Thomas N McCormick counsel for Plaintiffs Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens. Changing Address to 4675 MacArthur Court, Suite 700, Newport Beach, CA 92660. Changing Fax number to (949) 383-2384. Filed by Plaintiffs Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens. (McCormick, Thomas)
February 4, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendants CD Projekt, Inc., Devolver Digital, Inc., Rust, LLC, Ubisoft L.A., Inc., Ubisoft, Inc. and, kChamp Games, Inc.. (yl)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Counsel Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens. (McCormick, Thomas)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued ON Complaint #1 as to Defendant CD Projekt, Inc., Devolver Digital, Inc., Rust, LLC, Ubisoft L.A., Inc., Ubisoft, Inc., Valve Corporation, kChamp Games, Inc.. (yl)
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Counsel Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to Summons)(McCormick, Thomas)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: No "Attachment 2" as referenced on Summons Request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Counsel All Plaintiffs, (McCormick, Thomas)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Counsel Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens. (McCormick, Thomas)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Ryan Lally, Hope Marchionda, Everett Stephens. (McCormick, Thomas)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30295118 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Counsel Ryan Lally, Everett Stephens, Sean Colvin, Susann Davis, Hope Marchionda. (Attorney Thomas N McCormick added to party Sean Colvin(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas N McCormick added to party Susann Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas N McCormick added to party Ryan Lally(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas N McCormick added to party Hope Marchionda(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas N McCormick added to party Everett Stephens(pty:pla))(McCormick, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sean Colvin et al v. Valve Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valve Corporation
Represented By: Gavin W Skok
Represented By: Mhare Ohan Mouradian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kChamp Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubisoft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Projekt, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Ellis Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rust, LLC
Represented By: Todd W Bonder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubisoft Entertainment S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CD Projekt S.A.
Represented By: Marc Ellis Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devolver Digital, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa Harrold Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubisoft L.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everett Stephens
Represented By: Thomas N McCormick
Represented By: Kara M. Mundy
Represented By: Kenneth J. Rubin
Represented By: Timothy B. McGranor
Represented By: Thomas N. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Lally
Represented By: Thomas N McCormick
Represented By: Kara M. Mundy
Represented By: Kenneth J. Rubin
Represented By: Timothy B. McGranor
Represented By: Thomas N. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Colvin
Represented By: Thomas N McCormick
Represented By: Kara M. Mundy
Represented By: Kenneth J. Rubin
Represented By: Timothy B. McGranor
Represented By: Thomas N. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Marchionda
Represented By: Thomas N McCormick
Represented By: Kara M. Mundy
Represented By: Kenneth J. Rubin
Represented By: Timothy B. McGranor
Represented By: Thomas N. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susann Davis
Represented By: Thomas N McCormick
Represented By: Kara M. Mundy
Represented By: Kenneth J. Rubin
Represented By: Timothy B. McGranor
Represented By: Thomas N. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?