Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association v. City of Pasadena
Plaintiff: Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association
Defendant: City of Pasadena
Case Number: 2:2021cv01051
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEEMING DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S MOTION TO DISMISS #23 AS MOOT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: In light of the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 29 ), Defendants Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as MOOT, and the hearing scheduled for April 23, 2021, is hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 23, 2021 Filing 30 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Eleventh Claim for Relief Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 #21 filed by Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association. (Nadolenco, John)
March 23, 2021 Filing 29 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Nadolenco, John)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES RE REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #27 , the Court hereby continues the date of the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #23 and Special Motion to Strike #21 to 4/23/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association's opposition to Defendant's Motions and/or any amended complaint shall be filed no later than 3/23/2021. Defendant City of Pasadena's reply in support of Defendant's Motions shall be filed no later than 4/9/2021. (gk)
March 8, 2021 Filing 27 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Motion to Dismiss and Special Motion to Strike from April 2, 2021 to April 23, 2021 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Eleventh Claim for Relief Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Defendant City of Pasadena. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Raygor, Kent)
March 4, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Good Standing in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application of A. John P. Mancini filed by plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association. (Nadolenco, John)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 2, 2021 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Defendant City of Pasadena. (Raygor, Kent)
March 2, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant City of Pasadena. Motion set for hearing on 4/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Raygor, Kent)
March 2, 2021 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Eleventh Claim for Relief Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 #21 filed by Defendant City of Pasadena. (Raygor, Kent)
March 2, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Eleventh Claim for Relief Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant City of Pasadena. Motion set for hearing on 4/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kent R Raygor added to party City of Pasadena(pty:dft)) (Raygor, Kent)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney A. John P. Mancini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association, designating John Nadolenco as local counsel #15 , #18 . (gk)
February 17, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association, re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. John P. Mancini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30559848) #15 , Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. John P. Mancini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 2/16/2021, Receipt No. 30559848) #18 served on 2/16/21 and 2/17/21. (Nadolenco, John)
February 17, 2021 Filing 18 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. John P. Mancini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 2/16/2021, Receipt No. 30559848) filed by plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. John P. Mancini, #2 Proposed Order) (Nadolenco, John)
February 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. John P. Mancini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30559848) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): CT missing. A declaration is required regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (lt)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney A. John P. Mancini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30559848) filed by plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nadolenco, John)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: GRANTING #11 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan W. Thomas APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association, designating John Nadolenco as local counsel. (lt)
February 10, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association, re Order, #12 served on 2/10/2021. (Nadolenco, John)
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association, upon Defendant City of Pasadena served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon City of Pasadena in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Nadolenco, John)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: This action has been assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls upon the attorneys in the action and upon the Court. All counsel, including pro se litigants, are hereby ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See document for further details. (gk)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan W. Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30447660) filed by plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nadolenco, John)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant City of Pasadena. (jtil)
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan W. Thomas. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney A. John P. Mancini. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association. (Nadolenco, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association (Nadolenco, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association. (Nadolenco, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association. (Nadolenco, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30408346 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Attorney John Nadolenco added to party Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association(pty:pla))(Nadolenco, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association v. City of Pasadena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasadena Tournament of Roses Association
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Represented By: A. John P. Mancini
Represented By: Jonathan W. Thomas
Represented By: Christopher Mitchell Hendy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pasadena
Represented By: Valerie Elizabeth Alter
Represented By: Paul A Bost
Represented By: Jonathan David Moss
Represented By: Kent R Raygor
Represented By: Theresa E Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?