Jeffrey B. Sedlik v. Katherine Von Drachenberg et al
Plaintiff: JEFFREY B SEDLIK and Jeffrey B. Sedlik
Defendant: KATHERINE VON DRACHENBERG, HIGH VOLTAGE TATTOO, INC., KAT VON D, INC., DOES 1 10, inclusive, Kat Von D and High Voltage Tatoo, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01102
Filed: February 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Filing 107 AMENDED Exhibit List (Joint) filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
November 4, 2022 Filing 106 PROPOSED JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
November 4, 2022 Filing 105 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
November 4, 2022 Filing 104 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated - Clean set) filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
November 4, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Joint Statement of Case and Final Pretrial Order re Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,, #19 (Attachments: #1 Joint Statement of the Case, #2 Final Pretrial Order, #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B - Defendants' Exhibit B)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
November 4, 2022 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 to Allow Testimony from Non-Party Blake Farmer About the Meaning of His Tattoo #80 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
November 4, 2022 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 to Exclude Evidence or Argument About Defendants' Revenues or Profits Attributable to the Alleged Infringement #78 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
November 4, 2022 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 to Exclude Expert Testimony from Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik #76 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
November 4, 2022 Filing 99 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg.. (Grodsky, Allen)
November 4, 2022 Filing 98 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Bifurcate Liability and Damages #86 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Grodsky, Allen)
November 4, 2022 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Evidence and Argument on Unsupported Affirmative Defenses #85 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Grodsky, Allen)
November 4, 2022 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Prevent Blake Farmer from Discussing the Reasoning/Meaning Behind the Tattoo #84 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Metzidis, John)
November 4, 2022 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Prevent Katherine Van Drachenberg from Using the Term "Free-Hand" #83 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John J. Metzidis, #2 Exhibit 1 (3/14/22 Kat Von D Declaration), #3 Exhibit 2 (Kat Von D Depo Excerpts))(Metzidis, John)
November 4, 2022 Filing 94 PROPOSED (BY DEFENDANTS) SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Proposed Special Verdict Form)(Metzidis, John)
November 4, 2022 Filing 93 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED AND DISPUTED set) filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg.. (Metzidis, John)
November 4, 2022 Filing 92 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (JOINT AND AGREED-UPON set) filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg.. (Metzidis, John)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING The Parties Stipulation to Continue Pretrial Document Deadline #90 up to and including 11/4/2022. See Order for specifics. (jp)
October 31, 2022 Filing 90 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to File Pretrial Documents from 11/01/2022 to 11/04/2022 Re: Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Deadlines, #73 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, sets the hearing on the motions in limine that were filed by the parties as follows: The motions will be heard at the same time as the pretrial conference on 11/14/2022 at 03:00 pm before Judge Dale S. Fischer as set forth in the Court's Trial Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 25, 2022 Filing 88 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
October 25, 2022 Filing 87 Joint Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
October 25, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (4) to Bifurcate Liability and Damages filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
October 25, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (3) to Exclude Evidence and Argument on Unsupported Affirmative Defenses filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
October 25, 2022 Filing 84 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (2) to Prevent Blake Farmer from Discussing the Reasoning/Meaning Behind the Tattoo filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
October 25, 2022 Filing 83 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (1) to Prevent Katherine Van Drachenberg from Using the Term "Free-Hand" filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
October 25, 2022 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew L. Rollin, #2 Exhibit 1 - Depo Transcript Excerpts)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
October 25, 2022 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 to Allow Testimony from Non-Party Blake Farmer About the Meaning of His Tattoo #80 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Metzidis, John)
October 25, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 to Allow Testimony from Non-Party Blake Farmer About the Meaning of His Tattoo filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Metzidis, John)
October 25, 2022 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 to Exclude Evidence or Argument About Defendants' Revenues or Profits Attributable to the Alleged Infringement #78 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John J. Metzidis, #2 Exhibit 1 (Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures), #3 Exhibit 2 (3/2/22 Metzidis email), #4 Exhibit 3 (3/14/22 Gary Sedlik email))(Metzidis, John)
October 25, 2022 Filing 78 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 to Exclude Evidence or Argument About Defendants' Revenues or Profits Attributable to the Alleged Infringement filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Metzidis, John)
October 25, 2022 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 to Exclude Expert Testimony from Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik #76 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John J. Metzidis, #2 Exhibit 1 (Sedlik Rebuttal Report), #3 Exhibit 2 (Sedlik Report from Warhol), #4 Exhibit 3 (Redline of Section V.B), #5 Exhibit 4 (Redline of Section V.C), #6 Exhibit 5 (1/26/22 Gary Sedlik email))(Metzidis, John)
October 25, 2022 Filing 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 to Exclude Expert Testimony from Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. Motion set for hearing on 11/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Metzidis, John)
October 25, 2022 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Grodsky, Allen)
October 3, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Document No. #73 was not properly flattened. The clerk will replace with a flattened version. (jp)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING The Parties Stipulation to Continue Trial and Associated Pretrial Dates #72 . The Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 11/14/2022. The Trial is continued to 12/13/2022. See Order for specifics. (jp) (Main Document 73 replaced on 10/4/2022) (jp).
July 26, 2022 Filing 72 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Dates from September 20, 2022 to December 13, 2022 Re: Order on Motion to Continue, #67 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jonah A. Grossbardt, #2 Proposed Order)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Motion to Exclude (Dkt. #34 ). See Order for specifics. (jp)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting #68 Non-Resident Attorney Joel B Rothman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik, designating Jonah A Grossbardt as local counsel. (jp)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. #31 ); Order DENYING Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication (Dkt. #37 ). See Order for specifics. (jp)
May 26, 2022 Filing 68 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joel B. Rothman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33369266) filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial and Associated Pretrial Dates #61 . The Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 8/22/2022. The Trial is continued to 9/20/2022. See Order for specifics. ***NOTE: CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT.*** (jp)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Jonah A Grossbardt for Plaintiff Jeffrey B Sedlik in place and stead of Attorney Gary S Sedlik #60 . (jp)
May 18, 2022 Filing 65 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing, #62 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 18, 2022 Filing 64 STIPULATION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial and Associated Trial Dates, STIPULATION for Hearing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Dates from July 26, 2022 to September 20, 2022 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,, #19 #61 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 18, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Dates from July 26, 2022 to September 20, 2022 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,, #19 #61 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Dates from July 26, 2022 to September 20, 2022 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,, #19 #61 to May 24, 2022 (U #62 Defendants' Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Trial (Dkt. 61) and Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time (Dkt. 62) filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Metzidis, John)
May 18, 2022 Filing 62 [DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER DKT ENTRY NO. #65 ] - EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Dates from July 26, 2022 to September 20, 2022 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,, #19 #61 to May 24, 2022 (Unopposed by Defendants) filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jonah A. Grossbardt, #2 Proposed Order) (Grossbardt, Jonah). Modified on 5/19/2022 (jp).
May 18, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Trial and Pretrial Dates from July 26, 2022 to September 20, 2022 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,, #19 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Jonah A. Grossbardt, #3 Proposed Order) (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 18, 2022 Filing 60 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Jonah Grossbardt in place of attorney Gary Sedlik filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Substitution of Counsel) (Sedlik, Gary)
May 12, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #58 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. Blank document In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 12, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt on behalf of Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Jeffrey B. Sedlik(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)
April 18, 2022 Filing 57 STATUS REPORT Joint Report to Court Regarding ADR Proceedings filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Metzidis, John)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motions for Summary Judgment #31 #37 , and Motion for Order to Exclude Reports and Testimony of Defendants' Proffered Expert Witnesses #34 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
April 12, 2022 Filing 56 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conducted a settlement conference today. The parties were unable to reach an agreement on settlement. Court Recorder: Not Recorded. (vm)
April 4, 2022 Filing 54 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Experts, expert reports and expert testimony #34 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Sedlik, Gary)
April 4, 2022 Filing 53 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claims NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Individual Claims #37 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Statement of Genuine Facts in Reply to Defendants Addtl Facts)(Sedlik, Gary)
April 4, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment #31 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Grodsky, Allen)
April 4, 2022 Filing 51 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment #31 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John J. Metzidis, #2 Exhibit A - KVD 1, #3 Exhibit B - KVD 2, #4 Exhibit C - Jan 14 Metzidis Email, #5 Exhibit D - Addt'l Kat Depo. Excerpts, #6 Exhibit E - Jan 18 Metzidis Email, #7 Exhibit F - Jan 25 Metzidis Letter)(Grodsky, Allen)
March 29, 2022 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment #31 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum Statement of Genuine Facts in Dispute, #3 Memorandum Evidentiary Objections, #4 Declaration J Sedlik Decl, #5 Exhibit Exh A to J Sedlik Decl, #6 Exhibit Exh B to J Sedlik Decl, #7 Exhibit Exh C to J Sedlik Decl, #8 Exhibit Exh D to J Sedlik Decl, #9 Exhibit Exh E to J Sedlik Decl, #10 Exhibit Exh F to J Sedlik Decl, #11 Exhibit Exh G to J Sedlik Decl, #12 Declaration G Sedlik Decl, #13 Exhibit Exh A to GS Decl, #14 Exhibit Exh B to GS Decl, #15 Exhibit Exh C to GS Decl, #16 Exhibit Exh D to GS Decl, #17 Exhibit Exh E to GS Decl, #18 Exhibit Exh F to GS Decl, #19 Exhibit Exh H to GS Decl, #20 Exhibit Exh I to GS Decl, #21 Exhibit Exh J to GS Decl, #22 Exhibit Exh K to GS Decl, #23 Exhibit Exh L to GS Decl, #24 Exhibit Exh M to GS Decl)(Sedlik, Gary)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Dale S. Fischer: The Court hereby orders that Plaintiffs Motions for Summary Judgment and Exhibit G are stricken for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order 10-07 and/or the Courts Case Management Order as indicated: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry and incorrect event selected (Dkt. Nos. 45, 46). L.R. 11-3.8: Title page missing (Dkt. Nos. 46, 47). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
March 29, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Opposition to Defendants SJM #45 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. (2) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Objection/Opposition (Motion Related) - under Category - Responses, Replies and Other Motion Related Documents. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
March 29, 2022 Filing 47 [STRICKEN REFER TO DOCUMENT NUMBER 49] G Sedlik Decl Exh J to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Opposition to Defendants SJM #45 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Sedlik, Gary) Modified on 3/29/2022 (vv).
March 28, 2022 Filing 46 [STRICKEN REFER TO DOCUMENT NUMBER 49] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Opposition to Defendants SJM filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Sedlik, Gary) Modified on 3/29/2022 (vv).
March 28, 2022 Filing 45 [STRICKEN REFER TO DOCUMENT NUMBER 49] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Opposition to Defendants SJM filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. Motion set for hearing on 3/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Statement of Genuine Facts in Dispute, #2 Memorandum Evidentiary Objections, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Declaration J Sedlik Decl, #5 Exhibit Exh A to JS Dec, #6 Exhibit Exh B to JS Dec, #7 Exhibit Exh C to JS Dec, #8 Exhibit Exh D to JS Dec, #9 Exhibit Exh E to JS Dec, #10 Exhibit Exh F to JS Dec, #11 Exhibit Exh G to JS Dec, #12 Declaration G Sedlik Decl, #13 Exhibit Exh A to G Sedlik Decl, #14 Exhibit Exh B to GS Decl, #15 Exhibit Exh C to GS Decl, #16 Exhibit Exh D to GS Decl, #17 Exhibit Exh E to GS Decl, #18 Exhibit Exh F to GS Decl, #19 Exhibit Exh H to GS Decl, #20 Exhibit Exh I to GS Decl, #21 Exhibit Exh L to GS Decl, #22 Exhibit Exh M to GS Decl) (Sedlik, Gary) Modified on 3/29/2022 (vv).
March 28, 2022 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Experts, expert reports and expert testimony #34 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John J. Metzidis, #2 Exhibit E - Addt'l Friedman Depo. Excerpts)(Grodsky, Allen)
March 28, 2022 Filing 43 DEFENDANTS' APPENDIX OF DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claims NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Individual Claims #37 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allen B. Grodsky, #2 Exhibit 32 - Plaintiff's Responses to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 33 - Plaintiff's Responses to RFP Set 2, #4 Exhibit 34 - Addt'l Kat Depo. Excerpts)(Grodsky, Allen)
March 28, 2022 Filing 42 STATEMENT of Defendants' Statement of Genuine Disputes in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claims NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Individual Claims #37 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Grodsky, Allen)
March 28, 2022 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claims NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Individual Claims #37 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Grodsky, Allen)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court will conduct a settlement conference in this action on Tuesday, April 12, 2022, beginning at 2 p.m. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
March 23, 2022 Filing 39 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court conferred with the parties regarding settlement. The parties will email chambers with a date for settlement. Court Recorder: Not Recorded. (vm)
March 17, 2022 Filing 38 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Status Conference set for March 23, 2022 at 10:30 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 16, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claims , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Individual Claims filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Declaration of Gary Sedlik, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Gary Sedlik Decl, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Gary Sedlik Decl, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C to Gary Sedlik Decl, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D to Gary Sedlik Decl, #8 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey B. Sedlik, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A to Jeffrey Sedlik Decl) (Sedlik, Gary)
March 16, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Defendants' Notice of Lodging Nonpaper Exhibits 217 & 218 (C.D. Cal. Local Rules 11-5.1 & 5-4.2) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment #31 (Grodsky, Allen)
March 16, 2022 Filing 35 DEFENDANTS' APPENDIX OF DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment #31 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine Von Drachenberg, #2 Declaration of Blake M. Farmer, #3 Declaration of Anna Felicity Friedman, #4 Declaration of David C. Lane, #5 Declaration of Catherine Montie Wolenchuk, #6 Declaration of Allen B. Grodsky, #7 Declaration of John J. Metzidis, #8 Exhibit 3 - Description of Photograph, #9 Exhibit 7 - Certificate of Registration, #10 Exhibit 8 - Deposit Copy, #11 Exhibit 26 - Kat Deposition Excerpts, #12 Exhibit 27 - Sedlik Deposition Excerpts, #13 Exhibit 28 - Lane Expert Report, #14 Exhibit 29 - Montie Expert Report, #15 Exhibit 30 - Screenshot of Ex. 217, #16 Exhibit 31 - Plaintiff's RFPs, #17 Exhibit 201 - Image of Photograph, #18 Exhibit 202 - Kat's Line Drawing, #19 Exhibit 203 - 3/18/17 Kat Instagram Post, #20 Exhibit 204 - 3/18/17 Kat Facebook Post, #21 Exhibit 207 - 5/16/17 Kat Instagram Post, #22 Exhibit 208 - 5/16/17 Kat Facebook Post, #23 Exhibit 209 - 5/16/17 Kat Instagram Post, #24 Exhibit 210 - 5/16/17 Kat Facebook Post, #25 Exhibit 211 - 5/16/17 Kat Twitter Post, #26 Exhibit 212 - 3/17/17 HVT Instagram Post, #27 Exhibit 213 - 3/17/17 HVT Facebook Post, #28 Exhibit 214 - 4/15/17 HVT Instagram Post, #29 Exhibit 215 - 4/15/17 HVT Facebook Post, #30 Exhibit 216 - 4/26/18 HVT Instagram Post, #31 Exhibit 217 - Video of Completed Tattoo, #32 Exhibit 218 - Video from Instagram Highlights, #33 Exhibit 224 - Friedman Expert Report)(Grodsky, Allen)
March 16, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Experts, expert reports and expert testimony filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration G Sedlik Decl ISO Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit Exh A to Sedlik Decl, #3 Exhibit Exh B to Sedlik Decl, #4 Exhibit Exh C to Sedlik Decl, #5 Exhibit Exh D to Sedlik Decl, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion) (Sedlik, Gary)
March 16, 2022 Filing 33 STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment #31 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Grodsky, Allen)
March 16, 2022 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment #31 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Grodsky, Allen)
March 16, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment) (Grodsky, Allen)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Joint Stipulation Requesting Modification of 5/19/2021 "Order/Referral to ADR" to Permit ADR Proceeding Before United States Magistrate Judge (ADR Procedure No. 1) #29 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
March 9, 2022 Filing 29 STIPULATION for Order Authorizing Parties to Utilize ADR Procedure No. 1 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sedlik, Gary)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Joint Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motions #27 . See Order for specifics. (jp)
February 16, 2022 Filing 27 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motions filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Metzidis, John)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court received an e-mail from the parties indicating that the discovery dispute has been resolved and that Defendants wish to withdraw their motion. Thank you for the professional response. The motion is dismissed without prejudice. The hearing set for January 5 is cancelled as requested. withdrawing #23 Motion for Order (vm)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The Court sets the matter for a video status conference on Wednesday, January 5, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm)
December 29, 2021 Filing 24 JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Order for (1) Compelling Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories; Or, Alternatively, (2) Imposing Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Answer #23 filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John J. Metzidis, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Declaration of Gary S. Sedlik)(Metzidis, John)
December 29, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for (1) Compelling Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories; Or, Alternatively, (2) Imposing Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Answer filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg. Motion set for hearing on 1/19/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Metzidis, John)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. re Stipulation for Protective Order #21 (vm)
August 27, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg.(Metzidis, John)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 5/3/2022. (dd)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 7/26/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dd)
May 19, 2021 Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 17, 2021 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan AMENDED ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Pre-trial and Trial Dates)(Sedlik, Gary)
May 17, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey B. Sedlik.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Pre-trial and Trial Dates)(Sedlik, Gary)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg, identifying Jeffrey Sedlik, Katherine Von Drachenberg, Kat Von D, Inc., High Voltage Tattoo, Inc.. (Grodsky, Allen)
April 19, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc., Katherine Von Drachenberg.(Attorney Allen B Grodsky added to party High Voltage Tatoo, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allen B Grodsky added to party Kat Von D, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allen B Grodsky added to party Katherine Von Drachenberg(pty:dft))(Grodsky, Allen)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by PLAINTIFF Jeffrey B. Sedlik. upon High Voltage Tatoo, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/17/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; Kat Von D, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/17/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; Katherine Von Drachenberg waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/17/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Allen B. Grodsky. (Sedlik, Gary)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-01102 DSF(MRWx). (rn)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Jeffrey B. Sedlik. (Sedlik, Gary)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants High Voltage Tatoo, Inc., Kat Von D, Inc. and Katherine Von Drachenberg. (jtil)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
February 7, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF JEFFREY B SEDLIK. (Sedlik, Gary)
February 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF JEFFREY B SEDLIK, (Sedlik, Gary)
February 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JEFFREY B SEDLIK. (Sedlik, Gary)
February 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30437576 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF JEFFREY B SEDLIK. (Attorney Gary S Sedlik added to party JEFFREY B SEDLIK(pty:pla))(Sedlik, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey B. Sedlik v. Katherine Von Drachenberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE VON DRACHENBERG
Represented By: Allen B Grodsky
Represented By: John J. Metzidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIGH VOLTAGE TATTOO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAT VON D, INC.
Represented By: Allen B Grodsky
Represented By: John J. Metzidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kat Von D
Represented By: Allen B Grodsky
Represented By: John J. Metzidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Voltage Tatoo, Inc.
Represented By: Allen B Grodsky
Represented By: John J. Metzidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY B SEDLIK
Represented By: Gary S Sedlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey B. Sedlik
Represented By: Gary S Sedlik
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?