Joseph Nichols III v. Christian Pfeiffer
Petitioner: Joseph Nichols, III
Respondent: Christian Pfeiffer
Case Number: 2:2021cv01208
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (1) DENYING PETITIONER'S APPLICATION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABLITY (DOCKET NO. #8 ); AND (2) DENYING PETITIONER'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS (DOCKET NO. #6 ) by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (see document for details) (hr)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDMENT TO NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by petitioner Joseph Nichols, III. Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #7 Filed On: 3/8/21; Entered On: 3/9/21;Declaration of Appellate Joseph Nichols. (mat)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 21-55218 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #7 as to Petitioner Joseph Nichols, III. (hr)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 PETITIONER'S Application for Certificate of Appealability from the District Court; And Statement of Reasons in Support, to USDC by petitioner Joseph Nichols, III. (mat)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by petitioner Joseph Nichols, III. Appeal of Judgment, #4 Filed On: 2/16/21; Entered On: 2/17/21; Certificate of Appealability has been ruled on 2/16/21, see item 5. (mat)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner Joseph Nichols, III. (hr)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 . (see document for details) (hr)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer, Related to: Order Dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Action #3 . IT IS ADJUDGED that the Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody and this action are dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Current Federal Petition and this action are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to refer the Current Federal Petition to the Ninth Circuit pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 22-3(a). (see document for further details) (hr)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111, #2 CV60P) (esa)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, (Filing fee $ 5 due), filed by petitioner Joseph Nichols, III. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Nichols III v. Christian Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christian Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Nichols, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?