Fon Yodpanan v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Fon Yodpanan
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv01212
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV21-1212 SK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Armand D Roth added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Roth, Armand)
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fon Yodpanan, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 2/17/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF Fon Yodpanan. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (see document for details) (hr)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (hr)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by PLAINTIFF Fon Yodpanan. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Fon Yodpanan, (Ruzin, Irene)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fon Yodpanan. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Fon Yodpanan. (Ruzin, Irene)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Fon Yodpanan. (Attorney Irene Ruzin added to party Fon Yodpanan(pty:pla))(Ruzin, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fon Yodpanan v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fon Yodpanan
Represented By: Irene Ruzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Armand D Roth
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?