Roger Feldman v. Discover Bank
Plaintiff: ROGER FELDMAN, dba ALIGA ONLINE and Roger Feldman doing business as Aliga Online
Defendant: Discover Bank and Does 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv01670
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF DEFENDANT DISCOVER BANK TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURUSANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiff Roger Feldman. (Hovanessian, Vahe)
April 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Discover Bank. Motion set for hearing on 5/14/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rao, Arjun)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The requirements for diversity jurisdiction are met, and the Court DENIES Plaintiff Roger Feldman's Motion to Remand #10 . The 4/2/2021 hearing is VACATED. Defendant shall file its Answer by 4/12/2021. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
March 19, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY reply in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT filed by Plaintiff Roger Feldman. (Hovanessian, Vahe)
March 12, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ISO Defendant Discover Bank's Memo of Points & Authorities In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Discover Bank. (Rao, Arjun)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 Opposition In Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Discover Bank. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec of J Halling ISO Oppo of Discover to Plaintiffs Mtn to Remand)(Rao, Arjun)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DISCOVER BANK'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Defendant Discovery Bank's Ex Parte Application #9 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Discover's time to respond to the Complaint, by answer, motion or otherwise, is extended by 14 days after this Court issues a ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #10 . (gk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Discover Bank. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-01721-FLA-MRW (Guerami, Shahrzad)
February 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Roger Feldman. Motion set for hearing on 4/2/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #2 Declaration Declaration of Vahe Hovanessian in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court, #3 Proposed Order proposed Order, #4 Affidavit Certificate of Interested Parties, #5 Affidavit Proof of Service) (Hovanessian, Vahe)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 3/16/2021 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Discover Bank. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sheri Guerami, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Guerami, Shahrzad)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Discover Bank, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on 2/25/2021. (Guerami, Shahrzad)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shahrzad Guerami counsel for Defendant Discover Bank. Adding Sheri Guerami as counsel of record for Discover Bank for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Discover Bank. (Attorney Shahrzad Guerami added to party Discover Bank(pty:dft))(Guerami, Shahrzad)
February 23, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Roger Feldman, upon Defendant Discover Bank served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/26/2026 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
February 23, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Discover Bank, Does, filed by Plaintiff Roger Feldman. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/21/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Discover Bank, identifying Discover Financial Services. (Rao, Arjun)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Discover Bank. (Rao, Arjun)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA - County of Los Angeles, case number 21STCV02528 Receipt No: ACACDC-30669242 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Discover Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Ntc of Case Assignment, #5 Exhibit POS of Summons of Complaint, #6 Exhibit Ntc of Case Management Conf, #7 Exhibit Ntc of Case Management Conf 5-20-21) (Attorney Arjun P Rao added to party Discover Bank(pty:dft))(Rao, Arjun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roger Feldman v. Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Arjun P Rao
Represented By: Shahrzad Guerami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER FELDMAN, dba ALIGA ONLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Feldman doing business as Aliga Online
Represented By: Vahe Hovanessian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?