Merelex Corporation et al v. American Elements, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Merelex Corporation a California Corporation, individually and doing business as American Elements
Defendant: Does 1-10, Element Manufacturing Design, LLC an Ohio Limited Liability Company, individually and doing business as EMD Interactives, Rebecca Skeeles, Skeeles Manufacturing Corp., Fred Skeeles, American Elements, LLC and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv01729
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Judgement re Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form, #21 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Judgment)(Burroughs, Scott)
July 7, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Stipulation for Judgment #19 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 07/09/2021. (jgr)
July 7, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Judgment #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. 1) No Main document corresponding to the event stipulation 2) filing is the proposed consent judgment 3) Judge's signature stands alone and separated from is signatory date line. Refer to L.R. 58-10 at least 2 lines of text must accompany the Signature Line for Signature of Judge on a last page of proposed order 4) First page of filing has a erroneous Blank Rectangle box. Other error(s) with document(s): As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed consent judgment (with corrections as needed) is submitted as Separate Attachment thereto. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 6, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Judgment as to Defendant American Elements, LLC filed by Plaintiff Merelex Corporation.(Burroughs, Scott)
May 24, 2021 Filing 18 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (lc)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION (JS-6) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. re: Notice of Settlement #16 . (smo)
May 24, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Merelex Corporation. (Burroughs, Scott)
March 30, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Elements, LLC, (Simpson, Keith)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
March 30, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant American Elements, LLC.(Attorney Keith F Simpson added to party American Elements, LLC(pty:dft))(Simpson, Keith)
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Merelex Corporation, upon Defendant Skeeles Manufacturing Corp. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tom Anderson, Co-Owner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Merelex Corporation, upon Defendant Element Manufacturing Design, LLC served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tom Anderson, Co-Owner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Merelex Corporation, upon Defendant American Elements, LLC served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tom Anderson, Co-Owner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants American Elements, LLC, Element Manufacturing Design, LLC, Fred Skeeles, Rebecca Skeeles, Skeeles Manufacturing Corp. (et)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Merelex Corporation. (Burroughs, Scott)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Merelex Corporation. (Burroughs, Scott)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Merelex Corporation. (Burroughs, Scott)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Merelex Corporation, (Burroughs, Scott)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30695409 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Merelex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party Merelex Corporation(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merelex Corporation et al v. American Elements, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Manufacturing Design, LLC an Ohio Limited Liability Company, individually and doing business as EMD Interactives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Skeeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skeeles Manufacturing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Skeeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Elements, LLC
Represented By: Keith F Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merelex Corporation a California Corporation, individually and doing business as American Elements
Represented By: Scott A. Burroughs
Represented By: Stephen M. Doniger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?