Margaret Halsell v. United Airlines, Inc
Plaintiff: MARGARET HALSELL
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc and DOES 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv01791
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-01791 FMO(JPRx). (rn)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Worthe, Todd)
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc, identifying Plaintiff, Margaret Halsell, Defendant, United Airlines, Inc.; and Insurance Carrier for Defendant United Airlines, Inc., Global Aerospace Inc.. (Worthe, Todd)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.(Attorney Todd Christopher Worthe added to party United Airlines, Inc(pty:dft))(Worthe, Todd)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United Airlines, Inc. (jtil)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff MARGARET HALSELL. (Pocrass, James)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MARGARET HALSELL, (Pocrass, James)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MARGARET HALSELL. (Pocrass, James)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30724607 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff MARGARET HALSELL. (Attorney James L Pocrass added to party MARGARET HALSELL(pty:pla))(Pocrass, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Margaret Halsell v. United Airlines, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET HALSELL
Represented By: James L Pocrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc
Represented By: Todd Christopher Worthe
Represented By: Mackenzie Cass Foellmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?