Daniel Davis et al v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis and Gringo Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Amazon Studios, LLC doing business as Amazon Studios, Amazon.com, Inc., Nash Edgerton, A. J. Dix, Eros International Media LTD., Trish Hoffman, Matthew Stone, Charlize Theron, Beth Kono, Denver and Delilah Productions, Anthony Tambakis, Rebecca Yeldham and Blue Tongue Films
Case Number: 2:2021cv02090
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Moez M Kaba counsel for Defendants Denver and Delilah Productions, A. J. Dix, Eros International Media LTD., Trish Hoffman, Beth Kono, Matthew Stone, Anthony Tambakis, Charlize Theron, Rebecca Yeldham. Adding Moez M. Kaba as counsel of record for Defendants D&D Filmed Productions, Inc. (erroneously named as "Denver and Delilah Productions"); A.J. Dix; Eros International Media, Ltd.; Trish Hofmann (erroneously named as "Trish Hoffman"); Beth Kono; Matthew Stone; Anthony Tambakis; Charlize Theron; and Rebecca Yeldham for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants D&D Filmed Productions, Inc. (erroneously named as "Denver and Delilah Productions"); A.J. Dix; Eros International Media, Ltd.; Trish Hofmann (erroneously named as "Trish Hoffman"); Beth Kono; Matthew Stone; Anthony Tambakis; Charlize Theron; and Rebecca Yeldham. (Attorney Moez M Kaba added to party Denver and Delilah Productions(pty:dft), Attorney Moez M Kaba added to party A. J. Dix(pty:dft), Attorney Moez M Kaba added to party Eros International Media LTD.(pty:dft), Attorney Moez M Kaba added to party Trish Hoffman(pty:dft), Attorney Moez M Kaba added to party Beth Kono(pty:dft), Attorney Moez M Kaba added to party Matthew Stone(pty:dft), Attorney Moez M Kaba added to party Anthony Tambakis(pty:dft), Attorney Moez M Kaba added to party Charlize Theron(pty:dft), Attorney Moez M Kaba added to party Rebecca Yeldham(pty:dft))(Kaba, Moez)
July 22, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Peter Conti, Gringo Holdings, LLC, Daniel E. Davis. upon Denver and Delilah Productions waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; A. J. Dix waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; Eros International Media LTD. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; Trish Hoffman waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; Beth Kono waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; Matthew Stone waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; Anthony Tambakis waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; Charlize Theron waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021; Rebecca Yeldham waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Moez M. Kaba, Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service - AJ Dix, #2 Waiver of Service - Anthony Tambakis, #3 Waiver of Service - Beth Kono, #4 Waiver of Service - Charlize Theron, #5 Waiver of Service - D&D, #6 Waiver of Service - Eros, #7 Waiver of Service - Matthew Stone, #8 Waiver of Service - Rebecca Yeldham)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 21, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Spencer Dreier to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis, Gringo Holdings, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-31666811) #25 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Application for Spencer Dreier)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 21, 2021 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Spencer Dreier to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis, Gringo Holdings, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-31666811) filed by Plaintiffs Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis, Gringo Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 20, 2021 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peter Conti, Gringo Holdings, LLC, Daniel E. Davis, upon Defendant Eros International Media LTD. served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dolly Kaur, Person Authorized to Accept Service for Eros International Media, Ltd. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 19, 2021 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peter Conti, Gringo Holdings, LLC, Daniel E. Davis, upon Defendant Charlize Theron served on 7/2/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carl Williams, Administrative Assistant to Charlize Theron in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 19, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peter Conti, Gringo Holdings, LLC, Daniel E. Davis, upon Defendant Denver and Delilah Productions served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Celina Charles, authorized agent of Denver and Delilah Productions in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 19, 2021 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peter Conti, Gringo Holdings, LLC, Daniel E. Davis, upon Defendant Matthew Stone served on 7/3/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Matthew Stone in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
July 19, 2021 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Peter Conti, Gringo Holdings, LLC, Daniel E. Davis, upon Defendant A. J. Dix served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon A.J. Dix in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 25, 2021 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 as to Defendant(s) Blue Tongue Films, Denver and Delilah Productions, A. J. Dix, Nash Edgerton, Eros International Media LTD., Beth Kono, Matthew Stone, Anthony Tambakis, Charlize Theron, Rebecca Yeldham. (es)
June 24, 2021 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis, Gringo Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Denver and Delilah, #2 Summons to Eros Int., #3 Summons to A.J. Dix, #4 Summons to Nash Edgerton, #5 Summons to Beth Kono, #6 Summons to Matthew Stone, #7 Summons to Anthony Tambakis, #8 Summons to Charlize Theron, #9 Summons to Rebecca Yeldham)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 22, 2021 Filing 17 [IN CHAMBERS] Text Only Entry: Order to Show Cause issued 6/2/2021 is ORDERED DISCHARGED. It is the plaintiff's responsibility to diligently prosecute this matter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: The court, having considered the Ex Parte Motion and having found good cause or excusable neglect, therefore hereby ORDERS that the motion is GRANTED and Plaintiffs have an additional 45 days from the issuance of this Order to serve the Summons and Amended Complaint on all Defendants. Scheduling Conference set for August 9, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. is continued to August 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. #14 (es)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Errata filed by Plaintiffs Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis, Gringo Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 15, 2021 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis, Gringo Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 15, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis, Gringo Holdings, LLC, (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Gringo Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis, Gringo Holdings, LLC (Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Blue Tongue Films, Denver and Delilah Productions, A. J. Dix, Nash Edgerton, Eros International Media LTD., Trish Hoffman, Beth Kono, Matthew Stone, Anthony Tambakis, Charlize Theron, Rebecca Yeldham amending Complaint - (Discovery),, #1 , filed by Plaintiff Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis(Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt on behalf of Plaintiffs Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Peter Conti(pty:pla), Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Daniel E. Davis(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge James V. Selna: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff(s) to Show Cause (OSC) in writing no later than June 15, 2021, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: (see document for further details) (bm)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 6/7/2021 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 6/1/2021. (lb)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JAMES V. SELNA. (kdu)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (lh)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Peter Conti, (lh)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Daniel E. Davis, (lh)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon Studios, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Blue Tongue Films, Denver and Delilah Productions, A. J. Dix, Nash Edgerton, Eros International Media LTD., Trish Hoffman, Beth Kono, Matthew Stone, Anthony Tambakis, Charlize Theron, Rebecca Yeldham.Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (Filing Fee $402 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Peter Conti, Daniel E. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Davis et al v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Studios, LLC doing business as Amazon Studios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash Edgerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. J. Dix
Represented By: Moez M Kaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eros International Media LTD.
Represented By: Moez M Kaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Hoffman
Represented By: Moez M Kaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Stone
Represented By: Moez M Kaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlize Theron
Represented By: Moez M Kaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Kono
Represented By: Moez M Kaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver and Delilah Productions
Represented By: Moez M Kaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Tambakis
Represented By: Moez M Kaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Yeldham
Represented By: Moez M Kaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Tongue Films
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Conti
Represented By: Matthew Laurence Rollin
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Represented By: Spencer Dreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel E. Davis
Represented By: Matthew Laurence Rollin
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Represented By: Spencer Dreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gringo Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Laurence Rollin
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Represented By: Spencer Dreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?