D.G., a minor et al v. United States of America, et al
Plaintiff: D. G., A MlNOR, THROUGH MARIA FAJARDO, his GUARDIAN AD LITEM, Maria Fajardo and D.G.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, JOCELYN SINGH, N.P., NORTHEAST VALLEY HEALTH CORPORATION, DR. MENDEZ, M.D., MARY ELLEN WAKIM, M.D., DOES 1 to 100, PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, CHILDRENS HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, Jocelyn Singh, NP, US Department of Health and Human Services, Mary Ellen Wakim, MD, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Dr. Mendez, MD
Case Number: 2:2021cv02122
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Filing 20 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Everardo Vargas Valencia to Withdraw as Attorney Everardo Vargas Valencia filed by Attorney D.G., Maria Fajardo. Motion set for hearing on 5/12/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Valencia, Everardo)
May 7, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jacobs, Jennifer)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING FILING by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court strikes the REQUEST of Everardo Vargas Valencia to Withdraw as Attorney Everardo Vargas Valencia filed by Attorney D.G., Maria Fajardo #14 , and the REQUEST for Order for withdraw as counsel Everardo Vargas Valencia filed by Attorney D.G., Maria Fajardo #15 , without prejudice to refiling in compliance with the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies #17 . Additionally, this matter should not be scheduled for a hearing. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
April 30, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First REQUEST of Everardo Vargas Valencia to Withdraw as Attorney Everardo Vargas Valencia #14 , First REQUEST for Order for withdraw as counsel Everardo Vargas Valencia #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
April 28, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 Days, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.. (Jacobs, Jennifer)
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER CIVIL MINUTES OF 5/4/2021, SEE DOCKET NO. 18] First REQUEST for Order for withdraw as counsel Everardo Vargas Valencia filed by Attorney D.G., Maria Fajardo. Request set for hearing on 5/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Valencia, Everardo) Modified on 5/4/2021 (gk).
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER CIVIL MINUTES OF 5/4/2021, SEE DOCKET NO. 18] First REQUEST of Everardo Vargas Valencia to Withdraw as Attorney Everardo Vargas Valencia filed by Attorney D.G., Maria Fajardo. Request set for hearing on 5/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Valencia, Everardo) Modified on 5/4/2021 (gk).
April 26, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Heidi L Kjar counsel for Defendant Childrens Hospital Los Angeles. Adding Heidi L. Kjar as counsel of record for Children's Hospital Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Children's Hospital Los Angeles. (Attorney Heidi L Kjar added to party Childrens Hospital Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Kjar, Heidi)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for 5/21/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. The parties shall file a joint Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/14/2021. (vcr)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motion set for hearing on 5/21/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #2 Declaration of Lisa Datta, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proposed Judgment) (Jacobs, Jennifer)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CORRECTING CAPTION by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Upon Defendants' Notice of Substitution #6 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The names Northeast Valley Health Corporation, Mary Ellen Wakim, M.D. and Jocelyn Singh, N.P. shall be deleted from the caption of this case. The United States shall be inserted in the caption in place and instead of Northeast Valley Health Corporation, Mary Ellen Wakim, M.D. and Jocelyn Singh, N.P. The Caption shall be changed as follows: D. G., A MlNOR, THROUGH MARIA FAJARDO, his GUARDIAN AD LITEM and MARIA FAJARDO, Plaintiffs, v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES; CHILDRENS HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES; PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER; DR. MENDEZ, M.D.; and DOES 1 through 100, inclusive, Defendants. (gk)
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Maria Fajardo, D.G. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) complaint as to US Department of Health and Human Services. (Valencia, Everardo)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA answer now due 4/15/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Attorney Jennifer R Jacobs added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:dft))(Jacobs, Jennifer)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Northeast Valley Health Corporation, Jocelyn Singh, NP, Mary Ellen Wakim, MD. correcting Notice (Other) #6 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Scope, #2 Proof of Service)(Jacobs, Jennifer)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION filed by Defendants Northeast Valley Health Corporation, Jocelyn Singh, NP, Mary Ellen Wakim, MD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Jacobs, Jennifer)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
March 9, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Maria Fajardo and D.G., a minor in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/3/2021, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants NORTHEAST VALLEY HEALTH CORPORATION, JOCELYN SINGH, N.P., MARY ELLEN WAKIM, M.D.. (Jacobs, Jennifer)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, for the County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV20868 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant JOCELYN SINGH, N.P., MARY ELLEN WAKIM, M.D., NORTHEAST VALLEY HEALTH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Jennifer R Jacobs added to party NORTHEAST VALLEY HEALTH CORPORATION (pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer R Jacobs added to party JOCELYN SINGH, N.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer R Jacobs added to party MARY ELLEN WAKIM, M.D.(pty:dft))(Jacobs, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.G., a minor et al v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOCELYN SINGH, N.P.
Represented By: Jennifer R Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHEAST VALLEY HEALTH CORPORATION
Represented By: Jennifer R Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. MENDEZ, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY ELLEN WAKIM, M.D.
Represented By: Jennifer R Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHILDRENS HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES
Represented By: Heidi L Kjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Singh, NP
Represented By: Jennifer R Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Jennifer R Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ellen Wakim, MD
Represented By: Jennifer R Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jennifer R Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mendez, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. G., A MlNOR, THROUGH MARIA FAJARDO, his GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Fajardo
Represented By: Everardo Vargas Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.G.
Represented By: Everardo Vargas Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?