Suzanne Gough v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Suzanne Gough
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv02233
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/3/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
May 5, 2021 Filing 11 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, (Maguire, Daniel)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Maguire, Daniel)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 5/6/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (ghap)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Gough. (Petti, Russell)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Gough, identifying Suzanne Gough. (Petti, Russell)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Gough. (Petti, Russell)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30903915 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Gough. (Attorney Russell G Petti added to party Suzanne Gough(pty:pla))(Petti, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suzanne Gough v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Gough
Represented By: Russell G Petti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Karen T Tsui
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?