Hovsep Hagopian v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Hovsep Hagopian
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc. and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv02248
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Amended Complaint/Petition #21 filed by Defendants Does, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sperling, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hovanes Margarian counsel for Plaintiff Hovsep Hagopian. Adding Armen Margarian as counsel of record for Hovsep Hagopian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Hovsep Hagopian. (Margarian, Hovanes)
March 23, 2021 Filing 21 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Hovsep Hagopian(Margarian, Hovanes)
March 23, 2021 Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Amendment to Supplement #16 to Appendix (Sperling, Elizabeth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Supplement #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: First Amended Complaint, amendments re does and dismissal request as to Toyota Motor North America Only are NOT conformed Filed stamped copies In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 22, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, filed by Defendant Does, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Elizabeth A Sperling added to party Does(pty:dft))(Sperling, Elizabeth)
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 JOINDER filed by Defendants Does, Toyota Motor North America, Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Sperling, Elizabeth)
March 22, 2021 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT to Appendix #4 filed by Defendants Does, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Sperling, Elizabeth)
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Does, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., served on 03/12/2021. (Sperling, Elizabeth)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cari K. Dawson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc. and designating Elizabeth A. Sperling as local counsel #13 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Cari K. Dawson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30934985) filed by Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application for Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Clow, Gillian)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Courts Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerks Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Courts Website and Judges procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
March 12, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gillian H Clow counsel for Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Adding Gillian H. Clow as counsel of record for Toyota Motor North America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attorney Gillian H Clow added to party Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Clow, Gillian)
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Does, Toyota Motor North America, Inc. identifying Toyota Motor Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Sperling, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Does, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Amendment to Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 (Sperling, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Cari K. Dawson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Does answer now due 4/19/2021; Toyota Motor North America, Inc. answer now due 4/19/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Does; Toyota Motor North America, Inc..(Sperling, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 APPENDIX filed by Defendants Does, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Sperling, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Does, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., identifying Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.. (Attorney Elizabeth A Sperling added to party Does(pty:dft))(Sperling, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Does, Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Sperling, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV03559 Receipt No: ACACDC-30908640 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant DOES 1 through 100, inclusive, TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC., a California corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Attorney Elizabeth A Sperling added to party DOES 1 through 100, inclusive(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth A Sperling added to party TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC., a California corporation(pty:dft))(Sperling, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Hovsep Hagopian, upon Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc. served on 2/11/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Authorized to Accept Service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 2/19/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 37)(esa)
March 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Hovsep Hagopian. (filed in state court 1/29/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 5) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hovsep Hagopian v. Toyota Motor North America, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hovsep Hagopian
Represented By: Hovanes Margarian
Represented By: Shushanik Margarian
Represented By: Armen Margarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Gillian H Clow
Represented By: Elizabeth A Sperling
Represented By: Cari K Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Represented By: Elizabeth A Sperling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?