Robert Genova et al v. General Insurance Company Of America et al
Plaintiff: Robert Genova and Dora Genova
Defendant: General Insurance Company Of America and DOES 1-30, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv02441
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant General Insurance Company Of America.(Carmel, Rina)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
March 19, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff General Insurance Company Of America in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/16/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Insurance Company Of America, identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc.; LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc; Liberty Mutual Group Inc.; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc.; Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation; Safeco Corporation. (Carmel, Rina)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant General Insurance Company Of America. (Carmel, Rina)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21PSCV00120 Receipt No: ACACDC-30951012 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant General Insurance Company Of America. (Attorney Rina Carmel added to party General Insurance Company Of America(pty:dft))(Carmel, Rina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Genova et al v. General Insurance Company Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Genova
Represented By: Jason R Bendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Genova
Represented By: Jason R Bendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Insurance Company Of America
Represented By: Rina Carmel
Represented By: Donald W. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-30, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?