S10 Entertainment and Media LLC v. Samsung Elecronics Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: S10 Entertainment and Media LLC
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc. and Samsung Elecronics Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02443
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (L.R. 8-3), #24 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court hereby orders and confirms that the deadline for Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc., to respond to the initial Complaint is extended to July 13, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: GRANTING #26 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew C. Hurley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff S10 Entertainment & Media LLC, designating Matthew Novian as local counsel. (shb)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: GRANTING Vice on behalf of Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC, designating Matthew Novian as local counsel. (shb)
April 8, 2021 Filing 27 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by S10 Entertainment and Media LLC. (Novian, Matthew)
April 8, 2021 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew C. Hurley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/29/2021, Receipt No. 31003988) filed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Novian, Matthew)
April 8, 2021 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael R. Graif to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/29/2021, Receipt No. 31003729) filed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Matthew Joseph Novian added to party S10 Entertainment and Media LLC(pty:pla)) (Novian, Matthew)
April 7, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 13, 2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Skale, Andrew)
April 7, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC. upon Samsung Elecronics Co., Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/6/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Kyongman Kim. (Skale, Andrew)
April 7, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Amended Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Process Server In Support of Amended Notice of Amended Proof of Service)(Skale, Andrew)
April 6, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: DENYING WITHOUT PREDJUDICE #14 Non-Resident Attorney Michael T. Renaud APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff S10 Entertainment & Media LLC. Terming Attorney Michael T. Renaud. (mrgo)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #13 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew C. Hurley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff S10 Entertainment & Media LLC. Terming Attorney Matthew C. Hurley. (mrgo)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: DENYING #12 Non-Resident Attorney Michael R. Graif APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, S10 Entertainment & Media LLC. Pursuant to L.R. 83-2134 - Counsel does not maintain office in this District. Terming Attorney Michael R. Graif. (shb)
March 30, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew C. Hurley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31003988) #13 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael T. Renaud to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31004039) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Other error(s) with document(s): A declaration is required regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance.. (lt)
March 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael R. Graif to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31003729) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
March 30, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC, upon Defendant Samsung Electronics America Inc. served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz designated by law to accept service on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Skale, Andrew)
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael T. Renaud to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31004039) filed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Skale, Andrew)
March 29, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew C. Hurley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31003988) filed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Skale, Andrew)
March 29, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael R. Graif to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31003729) filed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Skale, Andrew)
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael R Graif on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Matthew S Hurley on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael T Renaud on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Samsung Elecronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America Inc. (ghap)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC, (Skale, Andrew)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC. (Skale, Andrew)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC. (Skale, Andrew)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30951309 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff S10 Entertainment and Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Andrew D Skale added to party S10 Entertainment and Media LLC(pty:pla))(Skale, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S10 Entertainment and Media LLC v. Samsung Elecronics Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Elecronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S10 Entertainment and Media LLC
Represented By: Andrew D Skale
Represented By: Michael T. Renaud
Represented By: Geoffrey Friedman
Represented By: Matthew C. Hurley
Represented By: Michael R. Graif
Represented By: Andrew D. Skale
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Novian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?