Valeri L. Stephens-Ellis et al v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Valeri L. Stephens-Ellis and Javier R. Ortiz
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. doing business as Princess Cruises and Does 1-5
Case Number: 2:2021cv02467
Filed: March 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
2 Judge: Michael R Wilner
3 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT (Joint) filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Hughes, Jonathan)
April 23, 2021 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial (Plaintiffs estimate 5-7 days; Defendant estimates 20 days), filed by Plaintiffs Javier R. Ortiz, Valeri L. Stephens-Ellis.. (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher M. Odell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., designating Angel Tang Nakamura as local counsel. (et)
April 16, 2021 Filing 21 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher M. Odell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31130158) filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nakamura, Angel)
April 16, 2021 Filing 20 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: In light of the 4/15/2021 Joint Status Report #16 filed by the parties, the scheduling conference now set for April 19, 2021 is continued to May 20, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. The parties will file a joint status report by May 17. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 16, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Angel Tang Nakamura counsel for Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Adding Angel Tang Nakamura as counsel of record for Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Nakamura, Angel)
April 16, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan W. Hughes counsel for Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Adding Jonathan W. Hughes as counsel of record for Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Hughes, Jonathan)
April 15, 2021 Filing 17 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 04/19/2021 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 15, 2021 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT , Joint, Pursuant to the Court's April 2, 2021 Text-Only Entry (ECF No. 15) filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Hughes, Jonathan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu; The Court sets a SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for April 19, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint scheduling report by noon on April 15, 2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-06218 GW(MRWx). Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-02467 GW(MRWx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
March 23, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Valeri L. Stephens-Ellis, Javier R. Ortiz. upon Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/20/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Edgar R. Nield, Esq.. (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., identifying Carnival Corporation. (Nield, Edgar)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edgar R Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Nield, Edgar)
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Castells, Rafaela)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(DeSantis Nield, Gabrielle)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (car)
March 22, 2021 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-30960234 for $402 filing fee. (Nelson, Gretchen)
March 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Javier R. Ortiz, Valeri L. Stephens-Ellis, (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
March 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Javier R. Ortiz, Valeri L. Stephens-Ellis. (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
March 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by Plaintiff Valeri L. Stephens-Ellis, Javier R. Ortiz. (Attorney Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret added to party Javier R. Ortiz(pty:pla), Attorney Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret added to party Valeri L. Stephens-Ellis(pty:pla))(Llinas Negret, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valeri L. Stephens-Ellis et al v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. doing business as Princess Cruises
Represented By: Jeffrey B Maltzman
Represented By: Angel Tang Nakamura
Represented By: Rafaela Patricia Castells
Represented By: Gabrielle DeSantis Nield
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Christopher M. Odell
Represented By: Edgar R. Nield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeri L. Stephens-Ellis
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Represented By: Gretchen M. Nelson
Represented By: Gretchen M Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier R. Ortiz
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Represented By: Gretchen M. Nelson
Represented By: Gretchen M Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?