Pedro A. Abuda v. Patriot Contract Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Pedro A. Abuda
Defendant: Patriot Contract Services LLC and Patriot Contract Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02494
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Patriot Contract Services, LLC (Kuhne, James)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Striking Prayer for Punitive Damages from Plaintiff Pedro A Abuda's Complaint #19 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. See Order for further specifics. (jp)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Corporate Disclosure Statement #18 , for the following reasons: Case number is incorrect or missing. (jp)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/2/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 9:00 am. (sw)
May 11, 2021 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION to Strike filed by Defendant Patriot Contract Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kuhne, James)
May 11, 2021 Filing 18 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 5/12/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #21 ] - CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Patriot Contract Services, LLC (Kuhne, James). Modified on 5/12/2021 (jp).
May 11, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Patriot Contract Services, LLC.(Attorney James F Kuhne, Jr added to party Patriot Contract Services, LLC (pty:dft))(Kuhne, James)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed #15 , for the following reasons: The document (Superior Court form) is the same document filed at #10 that was stricken by the Court. Counsel shall file a proof of service using a U.S. District Court approved form. The filer shall refer to the Court's website for available forms. (jp)
May 10, 2021 Filing 15 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. #16 ] - NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Pedro A. Abuda, upon Defendant Acknowledgment of Service signed by Andrew I. Port, Attorney. (Mitchell, Stephen). Modified on 5/11/2021 (jp).
May 7, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed #10 by Courtroom Deputy Clerk to Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 5/11/2021. (jp)
May 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect Name of Court on Document; Please refer to the Courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov for applicable forms. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: DENYING #9 Non-Resident Attorney Megan C. Misko APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pedro Abuda for failure to attach a Certificate of Good Standing issued within 30 days prior to filing of Application; pursuant to L.R. 83-2.1.3.4. Local Counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Terming Attorney Megan C Misko. (lt)
April 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan C. Misko to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pedro A. Abuda (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31207423) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (sbou)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. #14 ] - NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Pedro A. Abuda, upon Defendant Patriot Contract Services, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Andrew I. Port, Attorney. (Mitchell, Stephen) Modified on 5/7/2021 (jp).
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan C. Misko to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pedro A. Abuda (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31207423) filed by Plaintiffs Attorney Pedro A. Abuda. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of non-resident attorney to application to appear Pro Hac Vice) (Mitchell, Stephen)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Patriot Contract Services, LLC. (ghap)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pedro A. Abuda, (Mitchell, Stephen)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pedro A. Abuda. (Mitchell, Stephen)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pedro A. Abuda. (Mitchell, Stephen)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30961404 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Pedro A. Abuda. (Attorney Stephen Frank Mitchell added to party Pedro A. Abuda(pty:pla))(Mitchell, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedro A. Abuda v. Patriot Contract Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Contract Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Contract Services, LLC
Represented By: James F Kuhne, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro A. Abuda
Represented By: Stephen Frank Mitchell
Represented By: Megan C Misko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?