Radford Fisher v. Qantas Airways Limited
Plaintiff: Radford Fisher
Defendant: Qantas Airways Limited
Case Number: 2:2021cv02544
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr)
April 13, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Settlement filed by defendant Qantas Airways Limited. (Cunningham, Scott)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/27/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM. See order for complete details. (jre)
April 6, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Qantas Airways Limited, identifying no parent; no publicly held company owns 10% or more of its stock. (Cunningham, Scott)
April 6, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) #1 and Affirmative Defenses filed by defendant Qantas Airways Limited.(Cunningham, Scott)
April 1, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Rohit Talwar on behalf of Plaintiff Radford Fisher. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Plaintiff is in the process of obtaining Local Counsel. (lt)
March 31, 2021 Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 24, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James Gary Linder on behalf on Defendant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
March 24, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Rohit Talwar on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
March 24, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 24, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap)
March 24, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 4:20-cv-00362-JCH, from District of Arizona (Tucson Division). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:21-cv-2544 FMO (PDx). (ghap)
March 24, 2021 Filing 23 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Arizona
March 23, 2021 Filing 22 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed 3/23/21, this case shall be transferred to the Central District of California. Plaintiff to take nothing, and this matter is closed.(BAC) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Specially Appearing Defendant Qantas Airways Limited'(s) #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California pursuant to 28 USC 1631, enter judgment accordingly, and close this case. Signed by Judge John C Hinderaker on 3/22/21. (BAC) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Supplemental Brief) filed by Qantas Airways Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Cunningham, Scott) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM Brief on Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1631 by Plaintiff Radford Fisher. (Talwar, Rohit) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED HOLDING IN ABEYANCE Specially Appearing Defendant Qantas Airways Limited's #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction while the Court considers transfer of this action pursuant to 28 USC 1631. Parties are ORDERED to file simultaneous briefs of not more than 5 pages in length on whether the Court should transfer this action to another district court in the United States pursuant to 28 USC 1631 by 3/19/21. Plaintiff's #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is DENIED. Signed by Judge John C Hinderaker on 2/23/21. (BAC) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Permit Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Radford Fisher. (Talwar, Rohit) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Qantas Airways Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Cunningham, Scott) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Permit Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Qantas Airways Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Cunningham, Scott) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Preliminary) filed by Radford Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-15)(Talwar, Rohit) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Permit Jurisdictional Discovery by Radford Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5)(Talwar, Rohit)[Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Certification of Interested Entities by Qantas Airways Limited . (Cunningham, Scott) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Qantas Airways Limited. (Cunningham, Scott) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Justin Miles Schmidt on behalf of Defendant Qantas Airways Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Scott David Cunningham, Michelle A Rahban on behalf of Defendant Qantas Airways Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 *Additional Attachments re: Index of Exhibits by Qantas Airways Limited re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit A Boarding Passes)(Linder, James) *Modified to correct event type on 12/15/2020 (BAC). [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Qantas Airways Limited. (Linder, James) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION for Extension of Time and Alternative Service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to accomplish service of the Summons and Complaint is extended to 12/31/20. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge John C Hinderaker on 11/19/20. (BAC) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Due to the appointment of a new District Judge in the Tucson Division, this case is hereby reassigned by the Clerk to the Honorable District Judge John C Hinderaker. All future filings shall reflect the following case number CV 20-362-JCH. [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 EX PARTE MOTION for Extension of Time and Alternative Service by Radford Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6)(Talwar, Rohit) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: After all parties have been served and have answered the Complaint, Plaintiff(s) shall file a motion indicating that all Defendants have filed Answers such that the case is ready to proceed to the next step in the litigation. Plaintiffs to serve a copy of this Order on Defendants at the same time they serve Summons and Complaint; if these have already been served on Defendants prior to Plaintiffs receiving this Order, Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on Defendants within 14 days of the filing date of this Order. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 9/4/20.(BAC) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Radford Fisher. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Qantas Airways Limited. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18598279. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-362-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Radford Fisher. (Talwar, Rohit) (DLC) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18598279 filed by Radford Fisher.. (Talwar, Rohit) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radford Fisher v. Qantas Airways Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radford Fisher
Represented By: Rohit Talwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qantas Airways Limited
Represented By: James Gary Linder
Represented By: Michelle Rahban
Represented By: Scott D. Cunningham
Represented By: Justin M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?