John August v. United States of America
Plaintiff: John August
Defendant: ST. JOHN'S WELL CHILD AND FAMILY CENTER, INC.,, St. Johns Well Child and Family Center, Inc and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv02635
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (gga)
May 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Defendant United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 6/14/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Seidman, Talya)
April 7, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gwen M. Gamble counsel for Defendant United States of America. Gwen M. Gamble is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gamble, Gwen)
April 6, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Talya M. Seidman counsel for Defendant United States of America. Adding Talya M. Seidman as counsel of record for United States Of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondent United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Talya M. Seidman added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Seidman, Talya)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United States of America, served on March 26, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Gamble, Gwen)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to Answer #8 . Defendant United States, shall have up to, and including 5/7/2021. (jp)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Correcting Caption by Judge Dale S. Fischer that the United States shall be inserted in the caption in place and stead of St. John's Well Child and Family Center. See Order for specifics. (jp)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/7/2021 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Attorney Gwen M. Gamble added to party UNITED STATES(pty:dft)) (Gamble, Gwen)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION filed by Defendants ST. JOHN'S WELL CHILD AND FAMILY CENTER, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Gamble, Gwen)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mrgo)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (mrgo)
March 30, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT COMPLAINT against defendant ST. JOHN'S WELL CHILD AND FAMILY CENTER, INC., filed by plaintiff John August. (mrgo) Modified on 3/30/2021 (mrgo).
March 30, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John August, upon defendant ST. JOHN'S WELL CHILD AND FAMILY CENTER, INC., served on 1/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Trinese Hassen, Authorized Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. (mrgo) Modified on 3/30/2021 (mrgo).
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 APPENDIX filed by Defendant ST. JOHN'S WELL CHILD AND FAMILY CENTER, INC.,. Re: (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Gamble, Gwen)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ST. JOHN'S WELL CHILD AND FAMILY CENTER, INC.,. (Gamble, Gwen)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court County of Los Angeles, case number 19STSC13664 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant ST. JOHN'S WELL CHILD AND FAMILY CENTER, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Gwen M. Gamble added to party ST. JOHN'S WELL CHILD AND FAMILY CENTER, INC., (pty:dft))(Gamble, Gwen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John August v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John August
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. JOHN'S WELL CHILD AND FAMILY CENTER, INC.,
Represented By: Gwen M. Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Johns Well Child and Family Center, Inc
Represented By: Gwen M Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Gwen M Gamble
Represented By: Talya M Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?