Domenic Romeo v. Canoga Healthcare, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Domenic Romeo
Defendant: Does 1-50 and Canoga Healthcare, Inc. doing business as West Hills Health and Rehab Center
Case Number: 2:2021cv02918
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
2 Judge: Rozella A Oliver
3 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 filed by Defendant Canoga Healthcare, Inc.. (Reardon, Barbara)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Canoga Healthcare, Inc., re Answer to Complaint #22 served on 05/14/2021. (Reardon, Barbara)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On May 7, 2021, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why it should not dismiss this action for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff has filed a response to the Order to Show Cause re Lack of Prosecution on May 14, 2021. The Court deems that response satisfactory, and orders the Order to Show Cause discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (tf)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion Related Document #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Lodging. Other error(s) with document(s): When efiling a [Prop] Order as a separate document, a Notice of Lodging document is needed, then attach the [prop] order as the second attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #12 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Canoga Healthcare, Inc..(Reardon, Barbara)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 filed by Plaintiff Domenic Romeo. (Smith, Dawn)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Motion to Remand Case #16 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Counsel shall immediately file a Proposed Order and email a Microsoft Word version of the Proposed Order to the chambers email address. (iv)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 5/19/2021 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of plaintiff(s)/defendant(s) response. If plaintiff(s)/ defendant( s) files: An answer; Plaintiff(s) application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to defendant(s); on or before the date indicated above, the Court will consider this a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Domenic Romeo, Canoga Healthcare, Inc.. (Smith, Dawn)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Domenic Romeo. Motion set for hearing on 6/11/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Attorney Dawn Marie Smith added to party Domenic Romeo(pty:pla)) (Smith, Dawn)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Canoga Healthcare, Inc., re Miscellaneous Document,,,, #14 served on April 6, 2021. (Reardon, Barbara)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #11 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #12 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #13 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #14 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #15 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #16 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #17 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #18 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #19 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #20 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #21 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #22 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #23 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #24 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #25 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice, #26 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice)(Reardon, Barbara)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Canoga Healthcare, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Smit Clinesmith LLP served on Notice of Removal. (Reardon, Barbara)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV07310 with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 04/05/2021,, filed by defendant Canoga Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit in support of notice of removal)(Reardon, Barbara)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CA, case number CA21stcv07310 with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 04/05/2021,, filed by defendant Canoga Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit in support of notice of removal, #2 Exhibit in support of notice of removal, #3 Exhibit in support of notice of removal, #4 Exhibit in support of notice of removal)(Reardon, Barbara)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-02876 AB(RAOx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-02918 AB(RAOx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (rn)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Exhibit (Superior Court Complaint) re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Reardon, Barbara)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Removal of action. #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests - select - For Judicial Notice. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST for Removal of action. filed by defendant Canoga Healthcare, Inc.. (Reardon, Barbara)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Canoga Healthcare, Inc.. (Reardon, Barbara)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant All Defendants, identifying Evanston InsuranceandLongwood Management Company.. (Reardon, Barbara)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV07310 Receipt No: ACACDC-31045093 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Canoga Healthcare, Inc.. (Attorney Barbara M Reardon added to party Canoga Healthcare, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Reardon, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Domenic Romeo v. Canoga Healthcare, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domenic Romeo
Represented By: Dawn Marie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canoga Healthcare, Inc. doing business as West Hills Health and Rehab Center
Represented By: Cecille L Hester
Represented By: Barbara M Reardon
Represented By: Cheryl P Nessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?