James Shayler v. Elie W. Attar et al
Plaintiff: JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, and James Shayler
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive, ELIE W. ATTAR and JOANNA S. ATTAR, individually and as trustees of ATTAR FAMILY TRUST dated MAY 31, 2007, Elie W. Attar and Joanna Attar
Case Number: 2:2021cv03205
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Manning, Joseph)
May 12, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Shayler, upon Defendant Elie W. Attar served on 4/26/2021, answer due 6/11/2021; Joanna Attar served on 4/26/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Elie W. Attar answer now due 6/11/2021; Joanna Attar answer now due 6/11/2021, filed by Defendants Elie W. Attar; Joanna Attar.(Attorney Jack H Chammas added to party Elie W. Attar(pty:dft), Attorney Jack H Chammas added to party Joanna Attar(pty:dft))(Chammas, Jack)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cb)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Elie W. Attar, Joanna Attar. (car)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31113692 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Shayler v. Elie W. Attar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIE W. ATTAR and JOANNA S. ATTAR, individually and as trustees of ATTAR FAMILY TRUST dated MAY 31, 2007
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elie W. Attar
Represented By: Jack H Chammas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Attar
Represented By: Jack H Chammas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shayler
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?