James Shayler v. 900 S. La Brea, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, and James Shayler
Defendant: ISAAC SHANFELD FAMILY LP, a California limited partnership, SHANFELD GROUP, INC., a California corporatioN, 900 S. LA BREA, LLC, a California limited liability company, DOES 1-10 Inclusive, Shanfeld Group, Inc., Does 1-10, inclusive, 900 S. La Brea, LLC and Isaac Shanfeld Family LP
Case Number: 2:2021cv03213
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE) (Dkt. #18 ); JS-6 by Judge John A. Kronstadt: In light of the parties Notice of Settlement, the Court orders that the action is dismissed without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this Order and to reopen the action within 45 days from the date of this Order; provided, however, any request by any party(ies) that the Court do so, shall make a showing of good cause as to why the settlement has not been completed within the 45-day period, what further settlement processes are necessary, and when the party(ies) making such a request reasonably expect the process to be concluded. This Order does not preclude the filing of a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41, which does not require the approval of the Court. Such a stipulation shall be filed within the aforementioned 45-day period, or by such later date ordered by the Court pursuant to a stipulation by the parties that conforms the requirements of a showing of good cause stated above. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
June 4, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. (Manning, Joseph)
May 19, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 900 S. La Brea, LLC answer now due 6/4/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants 900 S. La Brea, LLC.(Attorney Julie Christina Flores added to party 900 S. La Brea, LLC(pty:dft))(Flores, Julie)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACKOF PROSECUTION AS TO DEFENDANT MAJORMEDIA INC by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than May 25, 2021 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution regarding overdue responses, as to all defendants. (lom)
April 27, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Shayler, upon Defendant Shanfeld Group, Inc. served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
April 27, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Shayler, upon Defendant Isaac Shanfeld Family LP served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Shayler, upon Defendant 900 S. La Brea, LLC served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (jre)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Isaac Shanfeld Family LP. (ghap)
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Shanfeld Group, Inc. (ghap)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant 900 S. La Brea, LLC. (ghap)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31114217 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Shayler v. 900 S. La Brea, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISAAC SHANFELD FAMILY LP, a California limited partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANFELD GROUP, INC., a California corporatioN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 900 S. LA BREA, LLC, a California limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanfeld Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 900 S. La Brea, LLC
Represented By: Julie Christina Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Shanfeld Family LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shayler
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?