James Shayler v. Andon Tony Akhian et al
Plaintiff: JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, and James Shayler
Defendant: ANDON TONY AKHIAN, individually and as trustee of the TONY A. AKHIAN REVOCABLE TRUST as amended and restated on AUGUST 29, 2014, DOES 1-10 Inclusive, Does 1-10, inclusive and Andon Tony Akhian
Case Number: 2:2021cv03228
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Manning, Joseph)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Andon Tony Akhian. (esa)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31115233 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Shayler v. Andon Tony Akhian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDON TONY AKHIAN, individually and as trustee of the TONY A. AKHIAN REVOCABLE TRUST as amended and restated on AUGUST 29, 2014
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andon Tony Akhian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shayler
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?