James Shayler v. James E. Bicos et al
Plaintiff: JAMES SHAYLER
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive, JAMES E. BICOS, individually and as trustee of the JAMES S. BICOS LIVING TRUST dated OCTOBER 1, 2015, Does 1-10, inclusive and James E. Bicos
Case Number: 2:2021cv03233
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge John F. Walter. In the Notice of Settlement filed on May 12, 2021 #10 , the parties represent that they have settled this action. As a result, the Court dismisses this action without prejudice subject to either party reopening the action on or before June 25, 2021. The Court will retain jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing the settlement until June 25, 2021. Thereafter, absent further order of the Court, the dismissal of this action will be with prejudice. All dates in this action, including the trial date are vacated.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. (Manning, Joseph)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Shayler, upon Defendant James E. Bicos(as trustee of the JAMES S. BICOS LIVING TRUST dated OCTOBER 1, 2015 ) served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021; James E. Bicos(individually) served on 4/21/2021, answer due 5/12/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants James E. Bicos(as trustee of the JAMES S. BICOS LIVING TRUST dated OCTOBER 1, 2015 ), James E. Bicos(individually). (ghap)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31115784 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party JAMES SHAYLER (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Shayler v. James E. Bicos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES E. BICOS, individually and as trustee of the JAMES S. BICOS LIVING TRUST dated OCTOBER 1, 2015
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Bicos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SHAYLER
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?