Nathan Smith v. GIA et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Smith
Defendant: Jennifer Wilson, Susan Jacques, Nathan Renfro, Does 1-50, Tom Moses, GIA, Debeers Centenary, John King, AGS, DB Investments Inc, Central Selling Organization, Debeers Diamond Trading Company, CSO Valuations, Debeers Consolidated Mines, Ltd and Debeers S.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03242
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Nathan Smith re Opposition to GIA Defendants Motion to Dismiss; Judicial Notice #21 served on 6/8/2021. (jp)
June 8, 2021 Filing 21 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to the GIA Defendants Co-Defendants Motion to Dismiss Case PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #13 and Opposition to GIA Defendants Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Nathan Smith. (jp)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER STRIKING FILED DOCUMENTS FROM THE RECORD by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the documents listed below were improperly filed for the following reasons: Document not presented in double-spaced format; document not consecutively numbered; not submitted on 28-line paper; therefore, the following document(s) shall be stricken from the record and shall not be considered by the Court: Opposition to the GIA Defendants and Co-defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages #18 . FURTHER ORDERED that the documents shall not be returned to the filing party; however, the Clerk shall note on the case docket that the documents are stricken from the record. (jp)
June 3, 2021 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by plaintiff Nathan Smith re Objection/Opposition to GIA Defendants Motion to Dismiss #18 served on 6/3/2021. (jp)
June 3, 2021 Filing 18 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 6/7/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #20 ] - OPPOSITION to the GIA Defendants and CoDefendants MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #13 filed by Plaintiff Nathan Smith. (jp). Modified on 6/7/2021 (jp).
May 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. According to court records, on May 10, 2021, plaintiff(s) filed a First Amended Complaint #11 . Therefore, defendants Motion to Dismiss #6 , is denied as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 28, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to Obtain Permission to File Lawsuit Prior to Filing; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #6 filed by Defendants GIA, Susan Jacques, Tom Moses, Nathan Renfro, Jennifer Wilson. (Belzer, Aaron)
May 26, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by plaintiff Nathan Smith, re Response to Motion to Dismiss #14 served on 5/26/2021. (jp)
May 26, 2021 Filing 14 RESONSE IN OPPOSITION to GIA and CoDefendants Motion Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to Obtain Permission to File #6 filed by Plaintiff Nathan Smith. (jp)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Defendants GIA, Susan Jacques, Tom Moses, Nathan Renfro, Jennifer Wilson. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Belzer, Aaron)
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by plaintiff Nathan Smith, re First Amended Complaint #11 served on 5/10/2021. (jp)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants GIA, Susan Jacques, Tom Moses, Nathan Renfro, Jennifer Wilson, AGS, DB Investments Inc, Debeers S.A., Debeers Consolidated Mines, Ltd, Debeers Diamond Trading Company, CSO Valuations, Central Selling Organization, Debeers Centenary, John King, Does 1-50 amending Complaint - (Discovery) #1 , filed by plaintiff Nathan Smith(jp)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants GIA, Susan Jacques, Tom Moses, Nathan Renfro, Jennifer Wilson, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to Obtain Permission to File Lawsuit Prior to Filing; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #6 served on May 7, 2021. (Belzer, Aaron)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants GIA, Susan Jacques, Tom Moses, Nathan Renfro, Jennifer Wilson, (Belzer, Aaron)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/2/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 9:00 am. (sw)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 Text Only Entry: The Court has reviewed the Motion to Dismiss filed by defendants #6 . Counsel/defendant shall file the required Notice of Interested Parties (LR 7-1.1) not later than 2:00 pm on May 7, 2021, otherwise, the motion is subject to being stricken. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to Obtain Permission to File Lawsuit Prior to Filing; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants GIA, Susan Jacques, Tom Moses, Nathan Renfro, Jennifer Wilson. Motion set for hearing on 6/14/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Belzer, #2 Exhibit A- Motion to Declare Plaintiff Vexatious Litigant, #3 Exhibit B= Order Declaring Plaintiff Vexatious Litigant, #4 Exhibit C - Prefiling Order - Vexatious Litigant, #5 Exhibit D - Vexatious Litigant List, #6 Proposed Order) (Attorney Aaron Belzer added to party GIA(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Belzer added to party Susan Jacques(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Belzer added to party Tom Moses(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Belzer added to party Nathan Renfro(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Belzer added to party Jennifer Wilson(pty:dft)) (Belzer, Aaron)
April 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nathan Smith, (lh)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, GIA, Susan Jacques, Tom Moses, Nathan Renfro, Jennifer Wilson. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Filing Fee $402 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Nathan Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nathan Smith v. GIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Wilson
Represented By: Aaron Belzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jacques
Represented By: Aaron Belzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Renfro
Represented By: Aaron Belzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Moses
Represented By: Aaron Belzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIA
Represented By: Aaron Belzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debeers Centenary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Investments Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Selling Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debeers Diamond Trading Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSO Valuations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debeers Consolidated Mines, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debeers S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?