James Shayler v. Joseph Conzonire et al
Plaintiff: JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, and James Shayler
Defendant: JOSEPH CONZONIRE and JANICE CONZONIRE, individually and as trustors of the JOSEPH CONZONIRE AND JANICE CONZONIRE TRUST established MARCH 31, 2009, RONALD H. CONZONIRE and MARILYN L. CONZONIRE, individually and as trustees under the CONZONIRE FAMILY TRUST dated JUNE 6, 2002, DOES 1-10 Inclusive, Joseph Conzonire, Does 1-10, inclusive, Marilyn L. Conzonire, Janice Conzonire and Ronald H. Conzonire
Case Number: 2:2021cv03260
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Manning, Joseph)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Notice of Settlement filed May 20, 2021, the Court sets a hearing on Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal for August 2, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other hearings and deadlines are hereby vacated. (iv)
May 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. (Manning, Joseph)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the foregoing, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs state claims asserted in the Complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (iv)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff James Shaylerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JRM, #2 Declaration of Shayler)(Manning, Joseph)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why this Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the other state law claims alleged by Plaintiff. The Response shall be filed on or before MAY 3, 2021. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court's declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (iv)
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Marilyn L. Conzonire, Ronald H. Conzonire. (lh)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Janice Conzonire, Joseph Conzonire. (lh)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31121054 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Shayler v. Joseph Conzonire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH CONZONIRE and JANICE CONZONIRE, individually and as trustors of the JOSEPH CONZONIRE AND JANICE CONZONIRE TRUST established MARCH 31, 2009
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD H. CONZONIRE and MARILYN L. CONZONIRE, individually and as trustees under the CONZONIRE FAMILY TRUST dated JUNE 6, 2002
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Conzonire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn L. Conzonire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Conzonire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald H. Conzonire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shayler
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?