Experience Hendrix, L.L.C. et al v. Andrew Pitsicalis
Plaintiff: Experience Hendrix, L.L.C. and Authentic Hendrix, LLC
Defendant: Carmen Cottone an individual also known as Carmen Thomas Andolina doing business as Carm Cottone doing business as Partners and Players, a New York Company doing business as Dynasty Gourmet Foods, a New York Company, Green Cures and Botanical Distribution, Inc., Rockin Artwork, LLC, Firefly Brand Management, LLC, Freeze, Grassroots Clothing, LLC a Colorado Limited Liability Company doing business as Grassroots California, Cynthia Modders, Carmen Thomas Andolina, Leon Hendrix, Firefly Consumer Products, Inc., Purple Haze Properties, LLC and Andrew Pitsicalis
Case Number: 2:2021cv03362
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting #5 APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam. In person Judgment Debtor Exam is set for 9/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (dml)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:17-cv-07235 VAP(MRWx) (rn)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Authentic Hendrix, LLC, Experience Hendrix, L.L.C.. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-3360-PSG (PDx); 2:18-cv-07429-VAP (MRWx); 2:17-cv-07235-VAP (MRWx) (Weir, Charles)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because subsequent filings have changed the nature of the case. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver are assigned to this new case number. All future documents must be filed under the new case number, which is 2:21-cv-3362 PSG (RAOx). The previous case number, 2:20-mc-114, is hereby terminated. (ghap)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Gregory Nordon counsel for Plaintiffs Authentic Hendrix, LLC, Experience Hendrix, L.L.C.. Adding Michael G. Nordon as counsel of record for EXPERIENCE HENDRIX, LLC and AUTHENTIC HENDRIX, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs EXPERIENCE HENDRIX, LLC and AUTHENTIC HENDRIX, LLC. (Attorney Michael Gregory Nordon added to party Authentic Hendrix, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Gregory Nordon added to party Experience Hendrix, L.L.C.(pty:pla))(Nordon, Michael)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Judgment Debtor Exam as to Andrew Pitsicalis filed by Plaintiffs Experience Hendrix, L.L.C., Authentic Hendrix, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Weir, Charles)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 Writ of Execution issued against Andrew Pitsicalis re: Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution #3 . (yl)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Plaintiffs Authentic Hendrix, LLC, Experience Hendrix, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Writ of Execution)(Weir, Charles)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Authentic Hendrix, LLC, Experience Hendrix, L.L.C.. Related Case(s): 2:20-mc-0113; 2:18-cv-07429-VAP (MRWx); and 2:17-cv- 07235-VAP (MRWx) (Weir, Charles)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 REGISTRATION OF JUDGMENT FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: ACACDC-28155524 - Fee: $47, filed by Plaintiffs Authentic Hendrix, LLC, Experience Hendrix, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Judgment) (Attorney Charles E Weir added to party Authentic Hendrix, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Charles E Weir added to party Experience Hendrix, LLC(pty:pla))(Weir, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Experience Hendrix, L.L.C. et al v. Andrew Pitsicalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Cottone an individual also known as Carmen Thomas Andolina doing business as Carm Cottone doing business as Partners and Players, a New York Company doing business as Dynasty Gourmet Foods, a New York Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Cures and Botanical Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockin Artwork, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firefly Brand Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grassroots Clothing, LLC a Colorado Limited Liability Company doing business as Grassroots California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Modders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Thomas Andolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firefly Consumer Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purple Haze Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Pitsicalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Experience Hendrix, L.L.C.
Represented By: Charles E Weir
Represented By: Michael Gregory Nordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Authentic Hendrix, LLC
Represented By: Charles E Weir
Represented By: Michael Gregory Nordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?