Achraf Safieddine v. MBC FZ, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Achraf Safieddine
Defendant: Al Arabiya News Channel FZ LLC, JOHN DOE, Middle East News FZ LLC, MBC FZ, LLC d/b/a MBC Group a/k/a Middle East Broadcasting Services, MBC FZ, LLC doing business as MBC Group also known as Middle East Broadcasting Services, Al Arabiya Network and Middle East Broadcasting Services
Case Number: 2:2021cv03495
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #10 presently scheduled for hearing on June 11, 2021, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 10, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sheena Barzi Tehrani counsel for Plaintiff Achraf Safieddine. Adding Sheena B. Tehrani as counsel of record for Achraf Safieddine for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Achraf Safieddine. (Attorney Sheena Barzi Tehrani added to party Achraf Safieddine(pty:pla))(Tehrani, Sheena)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney David D. Lin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Achraf Safieddine, designating John Begakis as local counsel #18 . (gk)
May 24, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #10 filed by Defendants Al Arabiya Network, MBC FZ, LLC, Middle East News FZ LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Decl. of M. Alshammari)(Cate, Matthew)
May 21, 2021 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David D. Lin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Achraf Safieddine (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31334440) filed by Plaintiff Achraf Safieddine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Begakis, John)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney John Begakis for Plaintiff Achraf Safieddine in place of Attorney Jianmin Zhou #11 . (gk)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Chad R. Bowman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MBC FZ, LLC, Al Arabiya Network FZ-LLC, and Middle East News FZ-LLC, designating Elizabeth L. Schilken as local counsel #9 . (gk)
May 18, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 21-01 filed on 5/18/2021. The case number will now read CV 21-3495-DMG (JPRx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. Further, the Court hereby continues Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction #10 to 6/11/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. The new hearing date does not affect the reply due date of 5/24/2021. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-03495 DMG (JPRx). (esa)
May 17, 2021 Filing 12 Opposition Motion to Dimiss re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #10 filed by Plaintiff Achraf Safieddine. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Achraf Safieddine, #2 Exhibit "A" to Achraf Safieddien Decl, #3 Exhibit "B" to Achraf Safieddien Decl, #4 Declaration of Justin Mercer, #5 Exhibit "A" to Mercer Decl, #6 Exhibit "B" to Mercer Decl, #7 Exhibit "C" to Mercer Decl, #8 Exhibit "D" to Mercer Decl, #9 Exhibit "E" to Mercer Decl, #10 Exhibit "F" to Mercer Decl, #11 Exhibit "G" to Mercer Decl, #12 Exhibit "H" to Mercer Decl)(Attorney John M Begakis added to party Achraf Safieddine(pty:pla))(Begakis, John)
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY John Begakis in place of attorney Jianmin Zhou filed by ACHRAF SAFIEDDINE Achraf Safieddine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zhou, Jianmin)
April 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Al Arabiya Network, MBC FZ, LLC, Middle East News FZ LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Alshammari, #2 Declaration of J. Whitehead, #3 Declaration of M. Cate, #4 Proposed Order) (Cate, Matthew)
April 28, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Chad R. Bowman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Al Arabiya Network, MBC FZ, LLC, Middle East News FZ LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31196325) filed by Defendants Al Arabiya Network, MBC FZ, LLC, Middle East News FZ LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schilken, Elizabeth)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Chad R Bowman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Justin Mercer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David D. Lin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
April 23, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Al Arabiya Network, John Doe, MBC FZ, LLC, Middle East News FZ LLC, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Achraf Safieddine. (filed in state court 2/5/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
April 23, 2021 COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Achraf Safieddine, upon Defendant Middle East News FZ LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/19/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Chad Bowman, Counsel. (submitted as document 1, attachment 5) (esa)
April 23, 2021 COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned executed filed by Plaintiff Achraf Safieddine, upon Defendant MBC FZ, LLC acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/19/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Chad Bowman, Counsel. (submitted as document 1, attachment 5) (esa)
April 23, 2021 COP OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Achraf Safieddine, upon Defendant Al Arabiya Network acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/19/2021. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Chad Bowman, Counsel. (submitted as document 1, attachment 5) (esa)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Al Arabiya News Channel FZ LLC, MBC FZ, LLC, Middle East News FZ LLC, identifying MBC Group Holdings Limited, Al Arabiya News Holding, Ltd. and News 24 Holding, Ltd.. (Schilken, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Al Arabiya News Channel FZ LLC, MBC FZ, LLC, Middle East News FZ LLC. (Schilken, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV04636 Receipt No: ACACDC-31175967 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Middle East News FZ LLC, Al Arabiya News Channel FZ LLC, MBC FZ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Attorney Elizabeth L Schilken added to party Al Arabiya News Channel FZ LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth L Schilken added to party MBC FZ, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth L Schilken added to party Middle East News FZ LLC(pty:dft))(Schilken, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Achraf Safieddine v. MBC FZ, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Arabiya News Channel FZ LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth L Schilken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middle East News FZ LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth L Schilken
Represented By: Chad R. Bowman
Represented By: Matthew S. L. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBC FZ, LLC d/b/a MBC Group a/k/a Middle East Broadcasting Services
Represented By: Elizabeth L Schilken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBC FZ, LLC doing business as MBC Group also known as Middle East Broadcasting Services
Represented By: Elizabeth L Schilken
Represented By: Chad R. Bowman
Represented By: Matthew S. L. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Arabiya Network
Represented By: Elizabeth L Schilken
Represented By: Chad R. Bowman
Represented By: Matthew S. L. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middle East Broadcasting Services
Represented By: Elizabeth L Schilken
Represented By: Chad R. Bowman
Represented By: Matthew S. L. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Achraf Safieddine
Represented By: David D. Lin
Represented By: John M Begakis
Represented By: Jianmin Zhou
Represented By: Sheena Barzi Tehrani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?