Linda Guerrero v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Linda Guerrero
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Russell Westrbrook Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Van Nuys and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv03565
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Terry J Hatter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. Kareem Shereef Aref is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 15, 2022 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 28, 2022 Filing 37 Receipt of CV-103 (05/18) LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT (CIVIL) received 03/17/2022 by Paul Cruz Deputy Clerk (shb)
March 14, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 11, 2022 Filing 35 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (lom)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Accordingly, It is Ordered that the motion to remand #13 be, and hereby is, Granted. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lom)
March 11, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bryan A Reynolds on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attorney Bryan A Reynolds added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Reynolds, Bryan)
February 9, 2022 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Linda Guerrero for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Linda Guerrero(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 31, 2022 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mikaela Marie Jackson counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Mikaela M. Jackson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Jackson, Mikaela)
January 29, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo re Stipulation for Protective Order #28 . (see document for details) (hr)
January 7, 2022 Filing 28 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Mikaela)
January 7, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kareem Shereef Aref on behalf of Plaintiff Linda Guerrero (Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Linda Guerrero(pty:pla))(Aref, Kareem)
December 18, 2021 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. Regina Lotardo is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. (Dolin, Tionna)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE NOVEMBER 1, 2021 FINAL PRETRIALCONFERENCE #24 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: The Court, having considered the Joint Stipulation to Continue the November 1, 2021 Pre-Trial Conference filed by the Parties, and upon finding that good cause exists, hereby ORDERS as follows: The Final Pre-Trial Conference is continued to MARCH 21, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. and any associated deadlines are in accordance to the Local Rules. PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb)
October 14, 2021 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference from November 1, 2021 to at least 120 days from November 1, 2021 Re: Order,,, Set/Reset Hearing,, #22 filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue November 1, 2021 Final Pre-Trial Conference)(Law, Daniel)
July 15, 2021 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero, served on 02/01/2021. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND REFERRING DISCOVERY by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: It is Ordered that all discovery matters which become at issue are referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for her/his consideration. Please contact the courtroom deputy clerk to the Magistrate Judge regarding these matters. It is Ordered, pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures and Local Rule 16, that the Final Pre-Trial Conference is placed on the Courts calendar for NOVEMBER 1, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 9B in the U. S. Courthouse on First Street. See order for details. (shb)
July 9, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been reassigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. Counsel are further notified that the Scheduling Conference now set for August 27, 2021 is hereby vacated. No appearance is needed on August 27, 2021. The motion to remand #13 set for July 16, 2021 is taken under submission and no appearance is needed on July 16, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
July 2, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #13 filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. (Law, Daniel)
June 25, 2021 Filing 19 OPPOSITION to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #13 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Jackson, Mikaela)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE 21-061 approved by Chief Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee, that the following cases be reassigned from the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. to the calendar of Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. for all further. Case now reads as 2:21-cv-03565 TJH(PVCx) (rn)
June 16, 2021 Filing 17 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero, identifying Linda Guerrero. (Law, Daniel)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Daniel Law re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #7 filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. (Law, Daniel)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles #13 filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. (Law, Daniel)
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. Motion set for hearing on 7/16/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Law, Daniel)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiff Linda Guerrero (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Linda Guerrero(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
June 3, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Regina Lotardo counsel for Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. Adding Regina Lotardo as counsel of record for Linda Guerrero for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. (Attorney Regina Lotardo added to party Linda Guerrero(pty:pla))(Lotardo, Regina)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (tf)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Jackson, Mikaela)
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mikaela Marie Jackson on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attorney Mikaela Marie Jackson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Jackson, Mikaela)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 6/11/2021 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of plaintiff(s)/defendant(s) response. If plaintiff(s)/defendant(s) files: An answer by the following defendant(s); Plaintiff(s) application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to the defendant(s); on or before the date indicated above, the Court will consider this a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (et)
April 26, 2021 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants FCA US LLC, Russell Westrbrook Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Van Nuys, Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Linda Guerrero. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/15/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
April 26, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to DEFENDANT RUSSELL WESTBROOK CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP RAM VAN NUYS ONLY without prejudice filed by Plaintiff [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/5/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 6 #1 . (et)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North American Holdings LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V.. (Michel, Andres)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Michel, Andres)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV01815 Receipt No: ACACDC-31187338 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard L Stuhlbarg in Support of FCA US LLCs Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Andres Michel in Support of FCA US LLCs Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B Joint Motion to Compel arbitration, #5 Exhibit C Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration, #6 Exhibit D Plaintiffs Request for Dismissal of Russell Westbrook, #7 Exhibit E LASCs Minute Order re MTCA, #8 Exhibit F Lease Agreement, #9 Exhibit G - Summons, #10 Exhibit H Civil Case Cover Sheet, #11 Exhibit I Notice of case assignment, #12 Exhibit J First Amended general order, #13 Exhibit K ADR info package, #14 Exhibit L Redacted TransUnion report of L. Guerrero, #15 Exhibit M - Certification and Notice of Interested Parties) (Attorney Andres F Michel added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Michel, Andres)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linda Guerrero v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Guerrero
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Kareem Shereef Aref
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Andres F Michel
Represented By: Richard L Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Mikaela Marie Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Westrbrook Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram Van Nuys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?