David Normand v. Boingo Wireless, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Bower Law Group Normand and David Normand
Defendant: Michele V Choka, Terrell Jones, Boingo Wireless, Inc., Michael Finley, Maurice Austin, Lance E. Rosenzweig, David Hagan, Roy H Chestnutt, Charles Davis and Kathleen Misunas
Case Number: 2:2021cv03626
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXCUSE DEFENDANTS FROM RESPONDING TO THE COMPLAINT UNTIL LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL ARE APPOINTED #13 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. None of the Defendants need answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on file. (iv)
May 13, 2021 Filing 14 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Zelichov, Richard)
May 12, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Order Excusing Defendants From Responding to the Complaint Until Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel is Appointed filed by Defendants Maurice Austin, Boingo Wireless, Inc., Roy H Chestnutt, Michele V Choka, Charles Davis, Michael Finley, David Hagan, Terrell Jones, Kathleen Misunas, Lance E. Rosenzweig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Richard H Zelichov added to party Maurice Austin(pty:dft), Attorney Richard H Zelichov added to party Boingo Wireless, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard H Zelichov added to party Roy H Chestnutt(pty:dft), Attorney Richard H Zelichov added to party Michele V Choka(pty:dft), Attorney Richard H Zelichov added to party Charles Davis(pty:dft), Attorney Richard H Zelichov added to party Michael Finley(pty:dft), Attorney Richard H Zelichov added to party David Hagan(pty:dft), Attorney Richard H Zelichov added to party Terrell Jones(pty:dft), Attorney Richard H Zelichov added to party Kathleen Misunas(pty:dft), Attorney Richard H Zelichov added to party Lance E. Rosenzweig(pty:dft))(Zelichov, Richard)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney John W. Baylet to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff David Normand, designating David Bower as local counsel #10 . (iv)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Juan E. Monteverde to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff David Normand, designating David Bower as local counsel #9 . (iv)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 First REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney John W. Baylet to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff David Normand (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31233196) filed by plaintiff David Normand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Pro Hac Baylet) (Bower, David)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 First REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Juan E. Monteverde to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff David Normand (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31232897) David Normand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Pro Hac Monteverde) (Bower, David)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff David Normand, (Bower, David)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Juan E Monteverde on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John W Baylet on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff David Bower Law Group Normand. (Bower, David)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31204037 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff David Bower Law Group Normand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration PSLRA Cert) (Attorney David E Bower added to party David Bower Law Group Normand(pty:pla))(Bower, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Normand v. Boingo Wireless, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele V Choka
Represented By: Richard H Zelichov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrell Jones
Represented By: Richard H Zelichov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boingo Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Richard H Zelichov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Finley
Represented By: Richard H Zelichov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Austin
Represented By: Richard H Zelichov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance E. Rosenzweig
Represented By: Richard H Zelichov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hagan
Represented By: Richard H Zelichov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy H Chestnutt
Represented By: Richard H Zelichov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Davis
Represented By: Richard H Zelichov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Misunas
Represented By: Richard H Zelichov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bower Law Group Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Normand
Represented By: David E. Bower
Represented By: Juan E. Monteverde
Represented By: John W. Baylet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?