Esme Bianco v. Brian Warner et al
Plaintiff: Esme Bianco
Defendant: Brian Warner, Marilyn Manson, Ciulla Management, Inc., Tony Ciulla and Marilyn Manson Records, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03677
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi re Stipulation for Protective Order #36 . See Order for details. (es)
April 27, 2022 Filing 36 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Marilyn Manson Records, Inc., Brian Warner.(King, Howard)
April 27, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Scheduling Order,, Terminate Hearings,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #34 , Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by Plaintiff Esme Bianco. Motion set for hearing on 5/27/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Ellwanger, Jay)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE: SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, TRIAL REQUIREMENTS, AND CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2023 03:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 3/21/2023 08:30 AM; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 3/3/2023 at 03:00 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 01/27/2023. (tf)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference currently set for hearing on December 17, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. is hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 3, 2021 Filing 31 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4-8 days, filed by Plaintiff Esme Bianco.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Scheduling Worksheet)(Ellwanger, Jay)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (jre)
October 22, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 08-27-2021 re Transcript #28 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Montes, Janelly) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 22, 2021 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 08-27-2021. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2022. (Montes, Janelly)
October 21, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #12 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Brian Warner.(King, Howard)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS #14 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Court DENIES Defendant Warner's Motion to Dismiss. Warner shall file an Answer to the FAC within 14 days of this order. (lc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Smart (CS).Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Henderson, Terri)
September 13, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Marilyn Manson Records, Inc., (King, Howard)
September 13, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #12 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Marilyn Manson Records, Inc..(Attorney Howard E King added to party Marilyn Manson Records, Inc.(pty:dft))(King, Howard)
September 3, 2021 Filing 22 JOINT SUBMISSION OF ADDITIONAL LEGISLATIVE HISTORY MATERIALS FOR CONSIDERATION IN CONNECTION WITH DEFENDANT BRIAN WARNER'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Defendant Brian Warner re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss The First and Second Causes of Action in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #14 (King, Howard)
August 27, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: RE DEFENDANT BRIAN WARNER'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AND SECOND CAUSES OF ACTION IN PLAINTIFF ESME BIANCO'S AMENDED COMPLAINT #14 . The court and counsel confer. Counsel is instructed to file any additional legislative history as a joint document no later than September 3, 2021. The motion will be deemed submitted upon the filing of the joint document. Court Reporter: Leslie Schramm. (lc)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEEMING PLAINTIFF'S 6(B) MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AS MOOT (DKT. #17 ) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: In light of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant Brian Warner a/k/a/ Marilyn Manson's Motion to dismiss filed on August 13, 2021 (Dkt. #18 ), the Motion is denied as MOOT. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
August 16, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss The First and Second Causes of Action in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #14 filed by Defendant Brian Warner. (King, Howard)
August 13, 2021 Filing 18 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss The First and Second Causes of Action in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #14 filed by Plaintiff Esme Bianco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellwanger, Jay)
August 6, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First and Second Cause of Action in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Esme Bianco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ellwanger, Jay)
July 29, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Brian Warner, (King, Howard)
July 29, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss The First and Second Causes of Action in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
July 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss The First and Second Causes of Action in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Brian Warner. Motion set for hearing on 8/27/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Howard E. King and Exhibits 1-4, #4 Proposed Order) (Attorney Howard E King added to party Brian Warner(pty:dft)) (King, Howard)
July 22, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Esme Bianco. upon Marilyn Manson Records, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/14/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. Waiver of Service signed by John G. Snow. (Ellwanger, Jay)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Marilyn Manson Records, Inc., Brian Warner amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 , filed by Plaintiff Esme Bianco(Ellwanger, Jay)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Court hereby orders that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #9 is stricken for failure to comply with the Local Rules: Case number MISSING identifying assigned Judge and Magistrate Judge initials. REFER TO NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES JUDGES #2 . Counsel is instructed to file a CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT no later July 16, 2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Case number MISSING identifying assigned Judge and Magistrate initials. The Official case number to be used per notice of assignment docket no. 2 is:2:21cv03677 FLA (MARx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 ***STRICKEN REFER TO DOCKET ENTRY 11***FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Brian Warner, Marilyn Manson Records, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Esme Bianco(Ellwanger, Jay) Modified on 7/9/2021 (lc). Modified on 7/15/2021 (vv).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (vv)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Esme Bianco. upon Tony Ciulla waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/20/2021, answer due 7/19/2021; Ciulla Management, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/20/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Robert E. Dugdale. (Ellwanger, Jay)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Esme Bianco. upon Brian Warner waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/14/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Stephen D. Rothschild. (Ellwanger, Jay)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Esme Bianco, (Ellwanger, Jay)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (esa)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31212080 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Esme Bianco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Jay David Ellwanger added to party Esme Bianco(pty:pla))(Ellwanger, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esme Bianco v. Brian Warner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Warner
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: John G. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Manson
Represented By: Howard E King
Represented By: John G. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciulla Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Ciulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Manson Records, Inc.
Represented By: Howard E King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esme Bianco
Represented By: Jay David Ellwanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?