Armen Mouradian v. City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Armen Mouradian
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Los Angeles Police Department, City of Los Angeles, Chief Michel Moore, Michel Moore, LAPD Officer Efrain Juarez Marcial, LAPD Officer Mychal Ortiz, LAPD Officer Raul Cuevas, LAPD Officer James Jeppson and LAPD Sergeant Luis Rosas
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Richard Copeland
Case Number: 2:2021cv03880
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
2 Judge: Hernan D Vera
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER #95 by Judge Hernan D. Vera. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference in this matter, previously set for September 26, 2023, is hereby continued to October 17, 2023. (lom)
August 10, 2023 Filing 95 STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from September 26, 2023 to October 17, 2023 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice 93 filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Middleton, Lawrence)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (cbr)
July 19, 2023 Filing 93 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Hernan D. Vera. The Court sets a Status Conference for 9/26/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Hernan D. Vera. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 7, 2023 Filing 92 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian re: Order #91 (Middleton, Lawrence)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: Please refer to Order for complete details. (cbr)
June 21, 2023 Filing 90 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christina P. Schmidt counsel for Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore, Michel Moore, Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. Emily S. Cohen is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, et al. (Schmidt, Christina)
June 21, 2023 Filing 89 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christina P. Schmidt counsel for Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore, Michel Moore, Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. Adding CHRISTINA P. SCHMIDT as counsel of record for Defendants City of Los Angeles, et al for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, et al. (Attorney Christina P. Schmidt added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Christina P. Schmidt added to party Raul Cuevas(pty:dft), Attorney Christina P. Schmidt added to party James Jeppson(pty:dft), Attorney Christina P. Schmidt added to party Los Angeles Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Christina P. Schmidt added to party Efrain Juarez Marcial(pty:dft), Attorney Christina P. Schmidt added to party Michel Moore(pty:dft), Attorney Christina P. Schmidt added to party Michel Moore(pty:dft), Attorney Christina P. Schmidt added to party Mychal Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Christina P. Schmidt added to party Luis Rosas(pty:dft))(Schmidt, Christina)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-070) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Hernan D. Vera, this case is transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Hernan D. Vera for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-03880-HDV-SHKx. (rn)
May 4, 2023 Filing 87 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document REDACTED DECLARATION OF EMILY S. COHEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL under seal #83 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore, Michel Moore, Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas.(Cohen, Emily)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO SEAL EMILY COHEN'S DECLARATION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's Application to File Under Seal the Declaration of Emily Cohen in support of a joint trial continuance #83 . Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5.2.2(c), Defendant shall e-file the unredacted document consistent with this Order within three days of this Order. (gk)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE #81 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that jury trial in this matter, previously set to begin on May 2, 2023, is hereby continued to October 24, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm)
April 26, 2023 Filing 84 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document REDACTED DECLARATION OF EMILY S. COHEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL under seal #83 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore, Michel Moore, Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas.(Cohen, Emily)
April 26, 2023 Filing 83 APPLICATION to file document REDACTED DECLARATION OF EMILY S. COHEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL under seal filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore, Michel Moore, Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Declaration of Emily Cohen, #2 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Emily)
April 26, 2023 Filing 81 Joint STIPULATION to Continue filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, et al City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Michel Moore(in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Emily)
April 24, 2023 Filing 82 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Dolly M. Gee. The hearing is held via videoconference. The parties informed the Court on the status of the case. By May 1, 2023, the parties shall meet and confer and file a stipulation and proposed for a new jury trial date. Court Reporter: Suzanne McKennon. (lom)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Having reviewed Plaintiff's notice to the Court #79 , the Court hereby set a status conference on April 24, 2023 at 4:30 p.m. The hearing shall take place by Zoom videoconference ("Zoom") and the clerk shall email the video link to the parties. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 20, 2023 Filing 79 Notice Notice to the Court Regarding Plaintiff Armen Mouradian's Readiness for Trial filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. (Middleton, Lawrence)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Parties are advised the the jury trial shall commence on Tuesday, May 2, 2023 at 8:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 5/2/2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (vdr)
March 1, 2023 Filing 76 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian.. (Middleton, Lawrence)
March 1, 2023 Filing 75 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. (Middleton, Lawrence)
March 1, 2023 Filing 74 Amended MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Michel Moore(in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. (Cohen, Emily)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #72 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Jury Trial is continued to 5/2/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any revised or updated pretrial documents, including the Proposed Pretrial Conference Order, shall be filed by no later than 3/1/2023. The parties shall comply with the Court's Scheduling and Case Management Order (Doc. No. 14), except to the extent modified herein. (gk)
February 8, 2023 Filing 72 STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date from February 21, 2023 to May 2, 2023 Re: Order on Motion in Limine to Exclude,,,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to Preclude,,,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to Bifurcate,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion in Limine to Permit,,,,,, Pretrial Conference - Final - optional html form,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,,, #70 , Amended Complaint/Petition #20 filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Middleton, Lawrence)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part both Defendants' Motion in Limine ("MIL") No. 1 #48 and Plaintiff's MIL #52 as to his treating physicians. The Court thus GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiff's MIL as to his own testimony. The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendants' MIL No. 4 #51 . Lilit Mouradian may testify regarding her personal perceptions of Plaintiff, as well as her observations of his injuries. She may not provide, however, her opinion regarding PTSD or any other psychological diagnosis. The Court DENIES Defendants' MIL No. 2 #49 as to the investigation findings, but grants Defendants leave to renew their objection at trial when it becomes clear what evidence of the findings Plaintiff seeks to present. On balance, the risk of unfair prejudice significantly outweighs the probative value, and the Court therefore GRANTS Defendants' MIL No. 2 as to these references. Defendants' MIL No. 2 is DENIED as to Defendants' vague request to preclude questioning regarding any other lawsuits, although Defendants may object on Rule 403 grounds to any such questioning at trial if warranted. Defendants' MIL No. 3 #50 is GRANTED as to bifurcation. Insofar as Defendants also seek, in cursory fashion, to exclude "evidence of other claims, lawsuits, and scandals," the Court has already addressed those arguments with respect to MIL No. 2, and this motion is therefore DENIED without prejudice as to those issues. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
January 24, 2023 Filing 70 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing held before Judge Dolly M. Gee RE: Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude or Limit Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses from Testifying #48 ; Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Evidence of Other Lawsuits/Claims #49 ; Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3 to to Bifurcate Monell and Punitive Damages and Exclude Other Incidents #50 ; Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude, or Alternatively Limit, the Testimony of Lilit Mouradian #51 ; Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Permit Lay Opinion and Non-Expert Treating Physician Medical Testimony #52 . The Court invites counsel to respond to its tentative ruling on the motions in limine. The parties submit to the papers as filed. The Court advises counsel that the tentative ruling stands and a written order will issue. The Court and counsel confer regarding the logistics of trial. The Jury Trial on 2/21/2023 is VACATED and will be continued to a date to be determined. The parties shall meet and confer by 2/8/2023 and submit a stipulation and proposed order for a new Jury Trial date. The trial is estimated to be five days. The trial will be bifurcated. Any revised or updated pretrial documents, including the proposed Pretrial Conference Order, shall be filed by no later than 3/1/2023. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (gk)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Due to the Court's trial schedule, the final pretrial conference and motions in liminie #48 #49 #50 #51 #52 hearing on January 24, 2023 is here continued from 2:00 p.m. to 4:00 p.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 18, 2023 Filing 68 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian.. (Middleton, Lawrence)
January 18, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. (Middleton, Lawrence)
January 17, 2023 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. (Middleton, Lawrence)
January 17, 2023 Filing 65 Witness List filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas.. (Attachments: #1 JOINT TRIAL WITNESS ESTIMATE FORM)(Cohen, Emily)
January 17, 2023 Filing 64 Joint PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits . (Cohen, Emily)
January 17, 2023 Filing 63 JOINT Exhibit List filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas.. (Cohen, Emily)
January 17, 2023 Filing 62 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. (Cohen, Emily)
January 17, 2023 Filing 61 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Clean set) filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas.. (Cohen, Emily)
January 17, 2023 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. (Cohen, Emily)
January 17, 2023 Filing 59 Witness List filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas.. (Cohen, Emily)
January 17, 2023 Filing 58 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas.. (Cohen, Emily)
January 10, 2023 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Preclude Evidence of Other Lawsuits/Claims #49 filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. (Middleton, Lawrence)
January 10, 2023 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Bifurcate Liability and Damages and Exclude Other Incidents #50 filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. (Middleton, Lawrence)
January 10, 2023 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Testimony of Lilit Mouradian #51 filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Middleton, Lawrence)
January 10, 2023 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses from Testifying #48 filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. (Middleton, Lawrence)
January 10, 2023 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE to Permit Lay Opinion and Non-Expert Treating Physician Medical Testimony #52 DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PERMIT LAY OPINION ON NON-EXPERT TREATING PHYSICIAN MEDICAL OPINIONS filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore, Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. (Cohen, Emily)
January 3, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Permit Lay Opinion and Non-Expert Treating Physician Medical Testimony filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Middleton, Lawrence)
January 3, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Testimony of Lilit Mouradian filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' MIL No. 4)(Cohen, Emily)
January 3, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Bifurcate Liability and Damages and Exclude Other Incidents filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3)(Cohen, Emily)
January 3, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Preclude Evidence of Other Lawsuits/Claims filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants MIL No. 2)(Cohen, Emily)
January 3, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses from Testifying filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1)(Cohen, Emily)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER APPROVING FOURTH JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATES #46 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
October 18, 2022 Filing 46 Fourth STIPULATION to Continue filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Emily)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO ALLOW FOR DEPOSITION IN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION OF PLAINTIFF ARMEN MOURADIAN #43 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE THIRD JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATES #42 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
September 29, 2022 Filing 43 STIPULATION for Order TO ALLOW FOR DEPOSITION IN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION OF PLAINTIFF ARMEN MOURADIAN filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Michel Moore(in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Emily)
September 29, 2022 Filing 42 Third STIPULATION to Continue filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Michel Moore(in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Emily)
August 25, 2022 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily Cohen counsel for Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore, Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. James V. Bilek is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, et al. (Cohen, Emily)
August 25, 2022 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily Cohen counsel for Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore, Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. Cory M. Brente is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, et al. (Cohen, Emily)
August 25, 2022 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily Cohen counsel for Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore, Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. Adding Emily S. Cohen as counsel of record for City of Los Angeles, et al for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, et al. (Attorney Emily Cohen added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Cohen added to party Raul Cuevas(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Cohen added to party James Jeppson(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Cohen added to party Los Angeles Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Cohen added to party Efrain Juarez Marcial(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Cohen added to party Michel Moore(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Cohen added to party Mychal Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Cohen added to party Luis Rosas(pty:dft))(Cohen, Emily)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #37 , the Court APPROVES the parties' second request for a continuance of dates and deadlines in accordance with the attached Second Amended Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 2/21/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (gk)
April 14, 2022 Filing 37 Second STIPULATION to Continue Dates from September 13, 2022 to February 21, 2023 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bilek, James)
April 11, 2022 Filing 36 (Attorney James Victor Bilek added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney James Victor Bilek added to party Raul Cuevas(pty:dft), Attorney James Victor Bilek added to party James Jeppson(pty:dft), Attorney James Victor Bilek added to party Los Angeles Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney James Victor Bilek added to party Efrain Juarez Marcial(pty:dft), Attorney James Victor Bilek added to party Michel Moore(pty:dft), Attorney James Victor Bilek added to party Mychal Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney James Victor Bilek added to party Luis Rosas(pty:dft))(Bilek, James)
March 31, 2022 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cory M Brente counsel for Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore, Michel Moore, Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. Lisa W. Lee is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, et al. (Brente, Cory)
March 31, 2022 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cory M Brente counsel for Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore, Michel Moore, Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. Adding Cory M. Brente as counsel of record for City of Los Angeles, LAPD, Michel R. Moore, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, and Luis Rosas for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, et al. (Attorney Cory M Brente added to party Raul Cuevas(pty:dft), Attorney Cory M Brente added to party James Jeppson(pty:dft), Attorney Cory M Brente added to party Efrain Juarez Marcial(pty:dft), Attorney Cory M Brente added to party Michel Moore(pty:dft), Attorney Cory M Brente added to party Michel Moore(pty:dft), Attorney Cory M Brente added to party Mychal Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Cory M Brente added to party Luis Rosas(pty:dft))(Brente, Cory)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani re Stipulation for Protective Order, #32 . (see document for details) (hr)
February 28, 2022 Filing 32 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Michel Moore(in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Lisa)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER APPROVING FIRST JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #30 , the Court hereby orders: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (gk)
January 13, 2022 Filing 30 First STIPULATION to Continue filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Michel Moore(in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Lisa)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Having received Defendants' answer #26 , the Court hereby discharges the Order to Show Cause dated December 29, 2021 #25 . IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 11, 2022 Filing 28 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradianto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Order to Show Cause,,, #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proofs of service for defendants Michel Moore, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Mychal Ortiz, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, and Luis Rosas, #2 Exhibit proofs of service for defendants the City of Los Angeles and the Los Angeles Police Department)(Middleton, Lawrence)
January 6, 2022 Filing 27 MICHEL R. MOORE, EFRAIN JUAREZMARCIAL, MYCHAL ORTIZ, RAUL CUEVAS, JAMES JEPPSON, AND LUIS ROSAS CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Michel Moore(in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas, (Lee, Lisa)
January 6, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #20 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Raul Cuevas, James Jeppson, Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, Michel Moore(individually), Michel Moore(in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department), Mychal Ortiz, Luis Rosas.(Attorney Lisa W Lee added to party Raul Cuevas(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa W Lee added to party James Jeppson(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa W Lee added to party Efrain Juarez Marcial(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa W Lee added to party Michel Moore(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa W Lee added to party Michel Moore(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa W Lee added to party Mychal Ortiz(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa W Lee added to party Luis Rosas(pty:dft))(Lee, Lisa)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 1/12/2022 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendants Chief Michel Moore, LAPD Officer Efrain, Juarez Marcial, LAPD Officer Mychal Ortiz, LAPD Officer Raul Cuevas, LAPD Officer James Jeppson, and LAPD Sergeant Luis Rosas for lack of prosecution. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a written response on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed as to defendants Chief Michel Moore, LAPD Officer Efrain, Juarez Marcial, LAPD Officer Mychal Ortiz, LAPD Officer Raul Cuevas, LAPD Officer James Jeppson, and LAPD Sergeant Luis Rosas if a written response demonstrating good cause is not filed by the date indicated above. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
December 8, 2021 Filing 24 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #20 as to Defendants The City of Los Angeles, The Los Angeles Police Department, Chief Michel Moore individually and in his official capacity as Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department, Efrain Juarez Marcial, LAPD Officer Mychal Ortiz, LAPD Officer Raul Cuevas, LAPD Officer James Jeppson, LAPD Sergeant Luis Rosas. (gk)
December 6, 2021 Filing 23 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #20 filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. (Middleton, Lawrence)
October 13, 2021 Filing 22 City of Los Angeles, et al CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Police Department, (Lee, Lisa)
October 13, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #20 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Police Department.(Lee, Lisa)
September 29, 2021 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian(Middleton, Lawrence)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #18 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to Amend the Complaint and file the First Amended Complaint ("FAC") adding LAPD Chief Michel Moore, LAPD Officer Efrain Juarez Marcial, LAPD Officer Mychal Ortiz, LAPD Officer Raul Cuevas, LAPD Officer James Jeppson, and LAPD Sergeant Luis Rosas, as Defendants in this action. The FAC shall be filed on the docket within three court days of this Order. (gk)
September 24, 2021 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION to Amend Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Middleton, Lawrence)
July 28, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Richard Copeland has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
July 26, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Richard T. Copeland may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Police Department(Lee, Lisa)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/12/2022. Joint status report re settlement due by 4/19/2022. (gk)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates) (gk)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on June 25, 2021. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Pretrial & Trial Dates Worksheet)(Middleton, Lawrence)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/11/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2021 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Police Department.(Lee, Lisa)
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Police Department, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 05/10/2021. (Lee, Lisa)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa W Lee counsel for Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Police Department. Scott Marcus is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants. (Lee, Lisa)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa W Lee counsel for Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Police Department. Kathleen A. Kenealy is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, et al. (Lee, Lisa)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 City of Los Angeles, et al CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Police Department, (Lee, Lisa)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Lee, Lisa)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV09800 Receipt No: ACACDC-31255270 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Los Angeles Police Department, City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4- Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location, #5 Exhibit 5- Notice of Case Assignment- Unlimited Civil Case, #6 Exhibit 6- Notice of Case Management Conference, #7 Exhibit 7- POS of Summons- The City of Los Angeles, #8 Exhibit 8- POS of Summons- Los Angeles Police Department, #9 Exhibit 9- Summons on City of Los Angeles, #10 Exhibit 10- Summons on LAPD) (Attorney Lisa W Lee added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa W Lee added to party Los Angeles Police Department(pty:dft))(Lee, Lisa)
May 7, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian, upon Defendant Los Angeles Police Department served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Octavia Smith, City Clerk in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/21/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
May 7, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian, upon Defendant City of Los Angeles served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Octavia Smith, City Clerk in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/23/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
May 7, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants City of Los Angeles, Does, Los Angeles Police Department. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Armen Mouradian. FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/12/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armen Mouradian v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armen Mouradian
Represented By: Lawrence S Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Police Department
Represented By: Kathleen A Kenealy
Represented By: Cory M Brente
Represented By: Lisa W Lee
Represented By: Scott D Marcus
Represented By: James Victor Bilek
Represented By: Emily Cohen
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Christina P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Kathleen A Kenealy
Represented By: Cory M Brente
Represented By: Lisa W Lee
Represented By: Scott D Marcus
Represented By: James Victor Bilek
Represented By: Emily Cohen
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Christina P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Michel Moore
Represented By: Cory M Brente
Represented By: James Victor Bilek
Represented By: Lisa W Lee
Represented By: Emily Cohen
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Christina P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michel Moore
Represented By: Cory M Brente
Represented By: Lisa W Lee
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Emily Cohen
Represented By: Christina P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAPD Officer Efrain Juarez Marcial
Represented By: Cory M Brente
Represented By: James Victor Bilek
Represented By: Lisa W Lee
Represented By: Emily Cohen
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Christina P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAPD Officer Mychal Ortiz
Represented By: Cory M Brente
Represented By: James Victor Bilek
Represented By: Lisa W Lee
Represented By: Emily Cohen
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Christina P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAPD Officer Raul Cuevas
Represented By: Cory M Brente
Represented By: James Victor Bilek
Represented By: Lisa W Lee
Represented By: Emily Cohen
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Christina P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAPD Officer James Jeppson
Represented By: Cory M Brente
Represented By: James Victor Bilek
Represented By: Lisa W Lee
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Emily Cohen
Represented By: Christina P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAPD Sergeant Luis Rosas
Represented By: Cory M Brente
Represented By: James Victor Bilek
Represented By: Lisa W Lee
Represented By: Emily Cohen
Represented By: Lisa W. Lee
Represented By: Christina P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Richard Copeland
Represented By: Richard T Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?