Jed Behar et al v. Northrup Grumman Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Alisa Behar and Jed Behar
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Systems Corporation and Northrup Grumman Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv03946
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jed Behar, Alisa Behar, upon Defendant Northrup Grumman Systems Corporation served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company as Registered Agent for Defendant in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gadoury, Christopher)
July 2, 2021 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jed Behar, Alisa Behar, upon Defendant Northrup Grumman Corporation served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Corporation Trust Company as Registered Agent for Defendant in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gadoury, Christopher)
June 29, 2021 Filing 29 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Northrup Grumman Systems Corporation. (iv)
June 29, 2021 Filing 28 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Northrup Grumman Corporation. (iv)
June 28, 2021 Filing 27 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Alisa Behar, Jed Behar. (Akselrud, Michael)
June 28, 2021 Filing 26 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Alisa Behar, Jed Behar. (Akselrud, Michael)
June 28, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #24 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
June 28, 2021 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Alisa Behar, Jed Behar. (Akselrud, Michael)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #13 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher L. Gadoury APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Alisa Behar and Jed Behar, designating Michael Akselrud as local counsel. (lt)
May 28, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #14 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan B. Nace APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jed and Alisa Behar, designating Michael Akselrud as local counsel. (lt)
May 20, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Electronic Filing re Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #7 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #12 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #10 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #9 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #11 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #8 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #6 e-mailed to Cheryl M Thigpen at dthigpen@eenradvocates.gom bounced due to No longer with firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #16 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher T. Nidel APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jed and Alisa Behar, designating Michael Akselrud as local counsel. (lt)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #15 Non-Resident Attorney David P. Page APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jed and Alisa Behar, designating Michael Akselrud as local counsel. (lt)
May 18, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan B. Nace to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Alisa Behar, Jed Behar (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31311453) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): MD missing. (lt)
May 18, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher T. Nidel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Alisa Behar, Jed Behar (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31312011) filed by Plaintiff Alisa Behar, Jed Behar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Akselrud, Michael)
May 18, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David P. Page to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Alisa Behar, Jed Behar (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31311901) filed by Plaintiff Alisa Behar, Jed Behar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Akselrud, Michael)
May 18, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan B. Nace to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Alisa Behar, Jed Behar (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31311453) filed by Plaintiff Alisa Behar, Jed Behar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Akselrud, Michael)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher L. Gadoury to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Alisa Behar, Jed Behar (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31306173) filed by Plaintiff Alisa Behar, Jed Behar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Akselrud, Michael)
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Cheryl M. Thigpen. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David P. Page. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan Nace. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christopher T. Nidel. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Alex J. Brown. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Chris L. Gadoury. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney W. Mark Lanier. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Alisa Behar, Jed Behar, (Akselrud, Michael)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Alisa Behar, Jed Behar. (Akselrud, Michael)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31270099 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jed Behar, Alisa Behar. (Attorney Michael A Akselrud added to party Alisa Behar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A Akselrud added to party Jed Behar(pty:pla))(Akselrud, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jed Behar et al v. Northrup Grumman Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Behar
Represented By: Michael A Akselrud
Represented By: Gideon Kracov
Represented By: Jordan Reid Sisson
Represented By: Christopher L. Gadoury
Represented By: Christopher T. Nidel
Represented By: David P. Page
Represented By: Jonathan B. Nace
Represented By: Michael A. Akselrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jed Behar
Represented By: Michael A Akselrud
Represented By: Gideon Kracov
Represented By: Jordan Reid Sisson
Represented By: Christopher L. Gadoury
Represented By: Christopher T. Nidel
Represented By: David P. Page
Represented By: Jonathan B. Nace
Represented By: Michael A. Akselrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrup Grumman Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?