Dennis A. Rockwell et al v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Rockwell and Dennis A Rockwell
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Viacom Inc., General Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., Crane Co., CBS Corporation, Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Asco Valve LLC, Premier Farnell Corp. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to PREMIER INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION d/b/a AKRON BRASS CO., successor-in-interest to AKRON BRASS COMPANY and AKRON BRASS MFG. COMPANY, INC. formerly known as FAC Delaware Corp, Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc, Trane U.S. Inc. formerly known as American Standard Inc doing business as American Standard Products Inc, Clyde Union Inc, Cleaver-Brooks Inc formerly known as Aqua Chem Inc doing business as Cleaver-Brooks Division, Goulds Pumps, Inc., The W.W. Henry Company LP, Flowserve Corporation, Regal Beloit America Inc, Does 1 through 400 Inclusive, Metallo Gasket Co., Armstrong International, Inc., PCC Flow Technologies Holdings Inc, Carver Pump Company, Viking Pump, Inc., Keeler-Dorr Oliver Boiler Company, Asco Valve Inc, Johnson Controls, Inc., The Wm. Powell Company, FAC Delaware Corp, Honeywell International, Inc., Afton Pumps, Inc., Atwood and Morrill, American Standard Inc, Henry Company LLC, Alfa Laval Inc, The Nash Engineering Company, Thrush Co., Inc., Zurn Industries, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., York International Corporation, FMC Corporation, Union Pump Company, David Brown Union Pumps Company, Aqua Chem Inc, Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co., Clark-Reliance Corporation, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, The W.W. Henry Company, Henry Asphalt Company, Burnham LLC, The Duriron Company Inc, Tyco International (US) Inc, Electrolux Home Products Inc, R.P. Richards Construction Co., ITT Industries Inc, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., TKD Inc, Flowserve US Inc, Tuthill Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Taco, Inc., Weil-McLain, Fisher Controls International LLC, Riley Power Inc, Gardner Denver Inc, Fairchild Corp, Akron Brass Company, Aurora Pump Company, Reliance Worldwide Corp LTD, Wilo USA LLC, BW/IP Inc, Raypak, Inc., RBC Manufacturing Corporation and Marathon Electric Manufacturing Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv03963
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 237 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15-20 Days, filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Seitz, Andrew)
July 7, 2021 Filing 236 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Afton Pumps, Inc. Afton Pumps, Inc..(Van Dam, Tina)
July 7, 2021 Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tina Broccardo Van Dam on behalf of Defendant Afton Pumps, Inc. (Van Dam, Tina)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. On July 3, 2021, the Court granted defendant Fisher Controls International LLC's ex parte application ("Application") and quashed and stayed the notice of deposition of plaintiff Rockwell, which had been noticed to begin on July 6, 2021. (ECF No. 232). On July 5, 2021, plaintiff filed an Opposition to the Application. (ECFNo. 233). The Court hereby orders that the "meet and confer" concerning the scheduling of and procedures to be followed at the deposition of plaintiff Rockwell take place NO LATER THAN MONDAY, JULY 12, 2021, and that the deposition itself commence NO LATER THAN JULY 22, 2021. The Court trusts that the parties will be able to work out all details of the deposition, but advises that if called upon to do so, the Court will not hesitate to set a date for the commencement of the deposition that may not accommodate the schedules of counsel, and which could include evening and weekend hours. IT IS SO ORDERED. #232 #233 (ch)
July 5, 2021 Filing 233 Opposition to Defendant Fisher Controls International LLC's Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order to Quash the Deposition of Dennis A. Rockwell Noticed for July 6, 2021 Opposition to re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition of DENNIS A. ROCKWELL #229 filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew Seitz in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Seitz, Andrew)
July 3, 2021 Filing 232 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Defendant's Motion to Quash Deposition (ECF No. 229) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Defendant's Application (ECF No. 229) is GRANTED. The Court hereby quashes the notice of Mr. Rockwell's July 6, 2021, deposition, and stays the deposition of Mr. Rockwell to allow the parties the opportunity to fully meet and confer to consider the objections raised by defendants with respect to this deposition, and to resolve the issues raised by defendant in its Applications. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. #229 (ch)
July 3, 2021 Filing 231 DECLARATION of Elizabeth J. Carpenter re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition of DENNIS A. ROCKWELL #229 filed by Defendant Fisher Controls International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Carpenter, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2021 Filing 230 Plaintiffs' NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE OPPOSITION to Defendant Fisher Controls International LLC's Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order to Quash the Deposition of Dennis A. Rockwell Noticed for July 6, 2021 filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition of DENNIS A. ROCKWELL #229 (Seitz, Andrew)
July 2, 2021 Filing 229 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Quash Notice of Taking Deposition of DENNIS A. ROCKWELL filed by Defendant Fisher Controls International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum DEFENDANT FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLCS EX PARTE MOTION FOR AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH THE JULY 6, 2021 DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c)(1)(A)), #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH J. CARPENTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC NOTICE OF EX PARTE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH THE JULY 6, 2021 DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC EX PARTE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH THE JULY 6, 2021 DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL)(Carpenter, Elizabeth)
July 2, 2021 Filing 228 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney T. Stephen Corcoran on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. Filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC (Powell, Glen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 227 Notice of Withdrawal of Notice (Other),,, #195 filed by Defendant Afton Pumps, Inc.. (Van Dam, Tina)
June 29, 2021 Filing 226 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, Failure to State a Claim #80 DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS JOINDER TO DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; DECLARATION OF THOMAS W. REMILLARD IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC. (Hugo, Edward)
June 29, 2021 Filing 225 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS #80 , and DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATIONS MOTION TO DISMISS #135 , set for July 12, 2021, and DEFENDANT AFTON PUMPS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS #195 , set for July 15, 2021, to July 22, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 28, 2021 Filing 224 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF BURNHAM LLC of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Burnham LLC, identifying Burnham Holdings, Inc.;Burnham LLC; Burnham Holdings, Inc.;Utica Mutual Insurance Company;Dennis A. Rockwell;Dawn Rockwell. (Swallow, William)
June 28, 2021 Filing 223 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF BURNHAM LLC TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Burnham LLC.(Attorney William Chandler Swallow added to party Burnham LLC(pty:dft))(Swallow, William)
June 28, 2021 Filing 222 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Plaintiff Dennis Rockwell on July 6, 2021 filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Seitz, Andrew)
June 28, 2021 Filing 221 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, Failure to State a Claim #80 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #135 filed by Defendants Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James G. Scadden, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L)(Powell, Glen)
June 28, 2021 Filing 220 DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF ERRATA TO REPLACE REDLINED VERSION OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #135 filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Powell, Glen)
June 24, 2021 Filing 219 OPPOSITION to Defendant Afton Pumps Motion to Dismiss re: Notice (Other),,, #195 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew Seitz in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Seitz, Andrew)
June 24, 2021 Filing 218 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bruce G Chusid counsel for Defendants Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Superior Boiler Works, Inc.. Richard M. Lee is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. and Superior Boiler Works, Inc.. (Chusid, Bruce)
June 23, 2021 Filing 217 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. identifying Sarco International Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Gage, Nicole)
June 23, 2021 Filing 216 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products Inc, identifying Electrolux Holdings, Inc.; AB Electrolux;. (Gage, Nicole)
June 23, 2021 Filing 215 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #149 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 23, 2021 Filing 214 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co., (Davis, Geoffrey)
June 23, 2021 Filing 213 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co. (Davis, Geoffrey)
June 22, 2021 Filing 212 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Superior Boiler Works, Inc., identifying Superior Holding, Inc.. (Chusid, Bruce)
June 22, 2021 Filing 211 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by defendant Superior Boiler Works, Inc..(Attorney Bruce G Chusid added to party Superior Boiler Works, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chusid, Bruce)
June 22, 2021 Filing 210 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Afton Pumps, Inc., (Van Dam, Tina)
June 21, 2021 Filing 209 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #135 filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew Seitz in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-11)(Seitz, Andrew)
June 21, 2021 Filing 208 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, Failure to State a Claim #80 filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew Seitz in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-13)(Seitz, Andrew)
June 18, 2021 Filing 207 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc., (Calareso, Christine)
June 18, 2021 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine D Calareso on behalf of Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. (Calareso, Christine)
June 18, 2021 Filing 205 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc..(Calareso, Christine)
June 17, 2021 Filing 204 First Supplemental Initial DISCLOSURE re Disclosure #176 filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell (Seitz, Andrew)
June 17, 2021 Filing 203 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #196 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
June 17, 2021 Filing 202 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other),,, #195 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motions and Related Filings > Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 #193 by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The court clerk is directed to edit the docket text to reflect the correct title of the document. (es)
June 17, 2021 Filing 200 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 #193 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - Motions and Related Filings - Motions; Joinder. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
June 17, 2021 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Defendant Metallo Gasket Co.. (Weiss, Lindsay)
June 17, 2021 Filing 198 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Metallo Gasket Co., identifying Metallo Gasket Company. (Weiss, Lindsay)
June 17, 2021 Filing 197 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Metallo Gasket Compnay Metallo Gasket Co..(Attorney Lindsay Weiss added to party Metallo Gasket Co.(pty:dft))(Weiss, Lindsay)
June 16, 2021 Filing 196 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 RUGGLES KLINGEMANN MFG. CO., INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co..(Attorney Geoffrey M Davis added to party Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co.(pty:dft))(Davis, Geoffrey)
June 16, 2021 Filing 195 [WITHDRAWN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. 227] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Defendant Afton Pumps, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES TO DEFENDANT AFTON PUMPS, INC.S MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF TINA VAN DAM TO DEFENDANT AFTON PUMPS, INC.S MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF TINA VAN DAM TO DEFENDANT AFTON PUMPS, INC.S MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT BTO DECLARATION OF TINA VAN DAM TO DEFENDANT AFTON PUMPS, INC.S MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, #5 Proposed Order (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AFTON PUMPS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION)(Van Dam, Tina) Modified on 7/2/2021 (mrgo).
June 16, 2021 Filing 194 Defendants' objection to premature deposition of plaintiff Dennis A. Rockwell re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 #193 filed by Defendants Armstrong International, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, The Wm. Powell Company. (Calareso, Christine)
June 16, 2021 Filing 193 [JOINDER BY DEFENDANT VIKING PUMP, INC. TO EX PARTE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL filed as] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 filed by Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Giaquinto, Michael) Modified on 6/17/2021 (es).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (ECF NO. 171) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Defendant's Application (ECF No. 171) for a protective order is GRANTED and the deposition of Rockwell noticed for June 17, 2021, is hereby QUASHED. Discovery shall proceed consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, as discussed in more detail below. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. #171 (ch)
June 16, 2021 Filing 191 OPPOSITION Opposition to the related document re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew Seitz In Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Seitz, Andrew)
June 16, 2021 Filing 190 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 filed by Defendants BW/IP Inc, Riley Power Inc, Zurn Industries, Inc.. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 16, 2021 Filing 189 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 filed by Defendant Clark-Reliance Corporation. (Hopwood, Beth)
June 16, 2021 Filing 188 OBJECTIONS DEFENDANT AMTROL INC., SUCCESSOR TO H.A. THRUSH AND THRUSH PRODUCTS, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS THRUSH CO. INC.S OBJECTIONS TO NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF DENNIS ROCKWELL filed by Defendant Thrush Co., Inc.. (Pantuch, Solomon)
June 16, 2021 Filing 187 JOINDER filed by Defendants Electrolux Home Products Inc, Flowserve US Inc, Spirax Sarco, Inc. joining in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 . (Gage, Nicole)
June 16, 2021 Filing 186 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. (Powell, Glen)
June 16, 2021 Filing 185 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant ITT Industries Inc.(Duffy, Joseph)
June 16, 2021 Filing 184 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Powell, Glen)
June 16, 2021 Filing 183 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant ITT Industries Inc (Duffy, Joseph)
June 16, 2021 Filing 182 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corp.. (Powell, Glen)
June 16, 2021 Filing 181 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendant ITT Industries Inc. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for ITT LLC formerly ITT Industries, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ITT LLC formerly ITT Industries, Inc.. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party ITT Industries Inc(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
June 16, 2021 Filing 180 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendant ITT Industries Inc. Adding Amy Jo Talarico as counsel of record for ITT LLC formerly ITT Industries, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ITT LLC formerly ITT Industries, Inc.. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party ITT Industries Inc(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
June 16, 2021 Filing 179 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 filed by Defendant The Wm. Powell Company. (Calareso, Christine)
June 16, 2021 Filing 178 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.. (Attorney Christine D Calareso added to party Armstrong International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Calareso, Christine)
June 16, 2021 Filing 177 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Calareso, Christine)
June 15, 2021 Filing 176 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Exhibit Lists)(Seitz, Andrew)
June 15, 2021 Filing 175 JOINDER filed by Defendants Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC joining in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 . (Hugo, Edward)
June 15, 2021 Filing 174 JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 #171 filed by Defendants General Electric Company, ViacomCBS Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nora Crystal in support of Joinder, #2 Declaration of Justin F. Cronin in support of Joinder by General Electric Company and ViacomCBS Inc. to Motion for Protective Order to Quash Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff by Defendant Fisher Controls International LLC, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Justin F. Cronin, #4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Justin F. Cronin)(Cronin, Justin)
June 15, 2021 Filing 173 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER GRANTING THIRTY-DAY EXTENSION FOR DEFENDANT AKRON BRASS COMPANY TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT #151 by Judge George H. Wu. It is so ordered that Defendant AKRON BRASS COMPANY may have up to and including July 12, 2021 within which to respond or otherwise pleading regarding the above-entitled matter. (lom)
June 15, 2021 Filing 171 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021 filed by Defendant Fisher Controls International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 15, 2021, #2 Declaration OF ELIZABETH J. CARPENTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLCS NOTICE OF EX PARTE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLCS EX PARTE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL NOTICED FOR JUNE 17, 2021)(Carpenter, Elizabeth)
June 15, 2021 Filing 170 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant Flowserve US Inc. Adding Daniel J. Kelly as counsel of record for Flowserve US Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. (Brosamle, Anthony)
June 15, 2021 Filing 169 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant Flowserve US Inc. Adding Anthony D. Brosamle as counsel of record for Flowserve US Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. (Brosamle, Anthony)
June 15, 2021 Filing 168 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc, (Brosamle, Anthony)
June 15, 2021 Filing 167 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc.(Attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle added to party Flowserve US Inc(pty:dft))(Brosamle, Anthony)
June 15, 2021 Filing 166 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by TKD, INC. TKD Inc.(Van Dam, Tina)
June 15, 2021 Filing 165 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., (Chusid, Bruce)
June 15, 2021 Filing 164 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by defendant Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc..(Attorney Bruce G Chusid added to party Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. (pty:dft))(Chusid, Bruce)
June 15, 2021 Filing 163 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT RULE 7.1 filed by Defendant TKD Inc (Van Dam, Tina)
June 15, 2021 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tina Broccardo Van Dam on behalf of Defendant TKD Inc (Attorney Tina Broccardo Van Dam added to party TKD Inc(pty:dft))(Van Dam, Tina)
June 14, 2021 Filing 161 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Weil-McLain, identifying SPX Corporation is an ultimate corporate parent company of The Marley-Wylain Company LLC and is a publicly-traded corporation. (Bailey, Bobbie)
June 14, 2021 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey on behalf of Defendant Weil-McLain (Bailey, Bobbie)
June 14, 2021 Filing 159 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant Weil-McLain.(Attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey added to party Weil-McLain(pty:dft))(Bailey, Bobbie)
June 14, 2021 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BW/IP Inc, identifying Flowserve Corporation. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 14, 2021 Filing 157 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ovsanna Thomas counsel for Defendant BW/IP Inc. Adding Ovsanna Thomas as counsel of record for BW/IP, INC. and its wholly owned subsidiaries for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BW/IP, INC. and its wholly owned subsidiaries. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 14, 2021 Filing 156 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant BW/IP Inc.(Attorney Ovsanna Thomas added to party BW/IP Inc(pty:dft))(Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 14, 2021 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine D Calareso on behalf of Defendant Aurora Pump Company (Calareso, Christine)
June 14, 2021 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company, (Calareso, Christine)
June 14, 2021 Filing 153 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company.(Attorney Christine D Calareso added to party Aurora Pump Company(pty:dft))(Calareso, Christine)
June 14, 2021 Filing 152 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christine D Calareso counsel for Defendant The Wm. Powell Company. Adding Caren D. Dombrowski as counsel of record for The William Powell Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The William Powell Company. (Calareso, Christine)
June 14, 2021 Filing 151 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Akron Brass Company answer now due 7/12/2021, filed by Defendant Akron Brass Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING THIRTY-DAY EXTENSION FOR DEFENDANT AKRON BRASS COMPANY TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT)(Attorney Peter Michael Mularczyk added to party Akron Brass Company(pty:dft))(Mularczyk, Peter)
June 14, 2021 Filing 150 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Wm. Powell Company, (Calareso, Christine)
June 14, 2021 Filing 149 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed by Defendant Akron Brass Company. (Mularczyk, Peter)
June 14, 2021 Filing 148 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant The Wm. Powell Company.(Attorney Christine D Calareso added to party The Wm. Powell Company(pty:dft))(Calareso, Christine)
June 14, 2021 Filing 147 DEFENDANT AMTROL INC., SUCCESSOR TO H.A. THRUSH AND THRUSH PRODUCTS, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS THRUSH CO. INC.S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Thrush Co., Inc., (Pantuch, Solomon)
June 14, 2021 Filing 146 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT DEFENDANT AMTROL INC., SUCCESSOR TO H.A. THRUSH AND THRUSH PRODUCTS, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS THRUSH CO. INC.S RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND RULE 7.1-1 CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES [LOCAL RULE 7.1-1] filed by Defendant Thrush Co., Inc. (Pantuch, Solomon)
June 14, 2021 Filing 145 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 ANSWER OF DEFENDANT AMTROL INC., SUCCESSOR TO H.A. THRUSH AND THRUSH PRODUCTS, INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS THRUSH CO. INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Thrush Co., Inc..(Pantuch, Solomon)
June 14, 2021 Filing 144 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karen M. Sullivan counsel for Defendant Tuthill Corporation. Karen M. Sullivan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tuthill Corporation. (Sullivan, Karen)
June 14, 2021 Filing 143 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Solomon Pantuch counsel for Defendant Thrush Co., Inc.. Adding Khaled Taqi-Eddin as counsel of record for Amtrol Inc., Successor to H.A. Thrush and Thrush Products, Inc., Erroneously Sued as Thrush Co. Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Amtrol Inc., Successor to H.A. Thrush and Thrush Products, Inc., Erroneously Sued as Thrush Co. Inc.. (Attorney Solomon Pantuch added to party Thrush Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(Pantuch, Solomon)
June 14, 2021 Filing 142 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lindsay Weiss counsel for Defendant Tuthill Corporation. Adding Lindsay Weiss as counsel of record for Tuthill Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Tuthill Corporation. (Weiss, Lindsay)
June 14, 2021 Filing 141 OBJECTIONS DEFENDANTS FOSTER WHEELER LLC AND FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATIONS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF DENNIS A. ROCKWELL filed by Defendants Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC. (Hugo, Edward)
June 14, 2021 Filing 140 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicole Elisabet Gage counsel for Defendant Electrolux Home Products Inc. Filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Copes-Vulcan, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole)
June 14, 2021 Filing 139 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicole Elisabet Gage counsel for Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole)
June 14, 2021 Filing 138 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #132 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
June 11, 2021 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gayle Lynne Ketchie on behalf of Defendant The Nash Engineering Company (Attorney Gayle Lynne Ketchie added to party The Nash Engineering Company(pty:dft))(Ketchie, Gayle)
June 11, 2021 Filing 136 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation (Powell, Glen)
June 11, 2021 Filing 135 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 7/12/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit I) (Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Air and Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft)) (Powell, Glen)
June 11, 2021 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gayle Lynne Ketchie on behalf of Defendant PCC Flow Technologies Holdings Inc (Ketchie, Gayle)
June 11, 2021 Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Julie Torres on behalf of Defendant PCC Flow Technologies Holdings Inc. (Ketchie, Gayle)
June 11, 2021 Filing 132 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant PCC Flow Technologies Holdings Inc.(Attorney Gayle Lynne Ketchie added to party PCC Flow Technologies Holdings Inc(pty:dft))(Ketchie, Gayle)
June 11, 2021 Filing 131 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant York International Corporation.(Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2021 Filing 130 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc..(Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2021 Filing 129 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Cleaver-Brooks Inc identifying Cleaver-Brooks Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Ameele, Melanie)
June 11, 2021 Filing 128 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cleaver-Brooks Inc, (Ameele, Melanie)
June 11, 2021 Filing 127 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melanie L Ameele counsel for Defendant Cleaver-Brooks Inc. Adding Christopher E. Williams as counsel of record for Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Ameele, Melanie)
June 11, 2021 Filing 126 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Cleaver-Brooks Inc.(Attorney Melanie L Ameele added to party Cleaver-Brooks Inc(pty:dft))(Ameele, Melanie)
June 11, 2021 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Viking Pump, Inc., identifying Viking Pump, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of IDEX Corporation. (Giaquinto, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Filing 124 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael B Giaquinto counsel for Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.. Adding Edward R. Ulloa as counsel of record for Viking Pump, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.. (Attorney Michael B Giaquinto added to party Viking Pump, Inc.(pty:dft))(Giaquinto, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Filing 123 JOINDER filed by Defendant Viking Pump, Inc. (Giaquinto, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Filing 122 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Zurn Industries, Inc., (Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 11, 2021 Filing 121 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ovsanna Thomas counsel for Defendant Zurn Industries, Inc.. Adding Keith M. Ameele; Suzanna L. Minasian as counsel of record for Zurn Industries, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ovsanna Thomas. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 11, 2021 Filing 120 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Zurn Industries, Inc..(Attorney Ovsanna Thomas added to party Zurn Industries, Inc. (pty:dft))(Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 11, 2021 Filing 119 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James G Scadden counsel for Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. Adding James G. Scadden as counsel of record for Warren Pumps, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attorney James G Scadden added to party Warren Pumps, LLC(pty:dft))(Scadden, James)
June 10, 2021 Filing 118 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc..(Duffy, Joseph)
June 10, 2021 Filing 117 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant York International Corporation identifying Johnson Controls, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
June 10, 2021 Filing 116 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc. identifying Johnson Controls International plc as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
June 10, 2021 Filing 115 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Goulds Pumps, LLC, formerly known as Goulds Pumps, Inc. filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying ITT Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
June 10, 2021 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy Jo Talarico on behalf of Defendant York International Corporation (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party York International Corporation(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
June 10, 2021 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy Jo Talarico on behalf of Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Johnson Controls, Inc.(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
June 10, 2021 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy Jo Talarico on behalf of Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Goulds Pumps, Inc.(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
June 10, 2021 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph Duffy on behalf of Defendant York International Corporation (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party York International Corporation(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
June 10, 2021 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph Duffy on behalf of Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Johnson Controls, Inc.(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
June 10, 2021 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph Duffy on behalf of Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Goulds Pumps, Inc.(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
June 10, 2021 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karen M. Sullivan on behalf of Defendant Tuthill Corporation (Sullivan, Karen)
June 10, 2021 Filing 107 Tuthill Corporation CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tuthill Corporation, identifying Tuthill Corporation. (Sullivan, Karen)
June 10, 2021 Filing 106 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by TUTHILL CORPORATION Tuthill Corporation.(Attorney Karen M. Sullivan added to party Tuthill Corporation(pty:dft))(Sullivan, Karen)
June 10, 2021 Filing 105 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Clark-Reliance Corporation.(Hopwood, Beth)
June 10, 2021 Filing 104 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Reliance Worldwide Corp LTD, (Carpenter, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2021 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael A Graham on behalf of Defendant Regal Beloit America Inc (Attorney Michael A Graham added to party Regal Beloit America Inc(pty:dft))(Graham, Michael)
June 10, 2021 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Elizabeth J Carpenter on behalf of Defendant Reliance Worldwide Corp LTD (Carpenter, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2021 Filing 101 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Reliance Worldwide Corp LTD.(Attorney Elizabeth J Carpenter added to party Reliance Worldwide Corp LTD(pty:dft))(Carpenter, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2021 Filing 100 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Clark-Reliance Corporation, identifying Nationwide Indemnity, Allianz Resolution Management, Resolute Management, Inc. and Argonaut Group. (Hopwood, Beth)
June 10, 2021 Filing 99 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fisher Controls International LLC, identifying Emerson Electric Co.. (Carpenter, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2021 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant Regal Beloit America Inc (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party Regal Beloit America Inc(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
June 10, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Elizabeth J Carpenter on behalf of Defendant Fisher Controls International LLC (Carpenter, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2021 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dana L Burch on behalf of Defendant Regal Beloit America Inc (Burch, Dana)
June 10, 2021 Filing 95 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Regal Beloit America Inc, (Burch, Dana)
June 10, 2021 Filing 94 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Regal Beloit America Inc.(Attorney Dana L Burch added to party Regal Beloit America Inc(pty:dft))(Burch, Dana)
June 10, 2021 Filing 93 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Flowserve Corporation, identifying None. (Carpenter, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2021 Filing 92 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Fisher Controls International LLC.(Attorney Elizabeth J Carpenter added to party Fisher Controls International LLC(pty:dft))(Carpenter, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2021 Filing 91 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, Failure to State a Claim #80 filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corp.. (Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Velan Valve Corp.(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
June 10, 2021 Filing 90 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corp. identifying VELAN INC. as Corporate Parent. (Powell, Glen)
June 10, 2021 Filing 89 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth J Carpenter counsel for Defendant Flowserve Corporation. Adding Keith M. Ameele; Suzanna L. Minasian; Elizabeth J. Carpenter as counsel of record for Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, Inc.. (Carpenter, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2021 Filing 88 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Beth C Hopwood counsel for Defendant Clark-Reliance Corporation. Adding Beth C. Hopwood as counsel of record for Clark-Reliance Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Clark-Reliance Corp.. (Attorney Beth C Hopwood added to party Clark-Reliance Corporation(pty:dft))(Hopwood, Beth)
June 10, 2021 Filing 87 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Flowserve Corporation.(Attorney Elizabeth J Carpenter added to party Flowserve Corporation(pty:dft))(Carpenter, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2021 Filing 86 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Raypak, Inc., identifying Rheem Manufacturing, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Wausau, Unigard/QBE, Great American Insurance Company, CNA/Resolute M'west. (Weglarz, Claire)
June 10, 2021 Filing 85 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Raypak, Inc..(Attorney Claire C Weglarz added to party Raypak, Inc.(pty:dft))(Weglarz, Claire)
June 10, 2021 Filing 84 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicolas P Martin counsel for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. Adding Kendra Tietjen as counsel of record for Honeywell International Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Honeywell International Inc.. (Martin, Nicolas)
June 10, 2021 Filing 83 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products Inc.(Attorney Nicole Elisabet Gage added to party Electrolux Home Products Inc(pty:dft))(Gage, Nicole)
June 10, 2021 Filing 82 DISCLOSURE of Statement Defendant Honeywell International Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Martin, Nicolas)
June 10, 2021 Filing 81 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc..(Attorney Nicole Elisabet Gage added to party Spirax Sarco, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gage, Nicole)
June 10, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, Failure to State a Claim filed by defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/12/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of James G. Scadden, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I) (Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Warren Pumps, LLC(pty:dft)) (Powell, Glen)
June 10, 2021 Filing 79 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC (Powell, Glen)
June 10, 2021 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Defendant Honeywell International Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc..(Attorney Nicolas P Martin added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Martin, Nicolas)
June 10, 2021 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #76 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #75 served on June 10, 2021. (Dyas, Christopher)
June 10, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, (Dyas, Christopher)
June 10, 2021 Filing 75 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant Chicago Bridge & Iron Company.(Attorney Christopher J Dyas added to party Chicago Bridge & Iron Company(pty:dft))(Dyas, Christopher)
June 10, 2021 Filing 74 Demand for Trial filed by Defendant Carver Pump Company re: Answer to Complaint #64 (Berkes, Robert)
June 10, 2021 Filing 73 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant FMC Corporation identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Schatz, Russell)
June 10, 2021 Filing 72 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Harvey Berkes counsel for Defendant Carver Pump Company. Adding Karen Lynn Finateri Silbiger as counsel of record for Carver Pump Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Carver Pump Company. (Berkes, Robert)
June 10, 2021 Filing 71 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by FMC Corporation, obo its Former Peerless Pump business FMC Corporation.(Schatz, Russell)
June 10, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
June 10, 2021 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Defendant The Nash Engineering Company's Answer To Plainftiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant The Nash Engineering Company.(Attorney B Gardiner McKleroy added to party The Nash Engineering Company(pty:dft))(McKleroy, B)
June 10, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy C Pieper on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Timothy C Pieper added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Pieper, Timothy)
June 10, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert Harvey Berkes on behalf of Defendant Carver Pump Company (Berkes, Robert)
June 10, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Russell W Schatz, Jr on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Russell W Schatz, Jr added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Schatz, Russell)
June 10, 2021 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Carver Pump Company, identifying Carver Pump Company. (Berkes, Robert)
June 10, 2021 Filing 64 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Carver Pump Company.(Attorney Robert Harvey Berkes added to party Carver Pump Company(pty:dft))(Berkes, Robert)
June 10, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin F. Cronin on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Attorney Justin F. Cronin added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Cronin, Justin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erin N Empting on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Attorney Erin N Empting added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Empting, Erin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Electric Company, identifying None. (Jamison, Kevin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D. Jamison on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Jamison, Kevin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 59 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant General Electric Company.(Attorney Kevin D. Jamison added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Jamison, Kevin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin F. Cronin on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. (Attorney Justin F. Cronin added to party ViacomCBS Inc.(pty:dft))(Cronin, Justin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erin N Empting on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. (Attorney Erin N Empting added to party ViacomCBS Inc.(pty:dft))(Empting, Erin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ViacomCBS Inc., identifying ViacomCBS Inc. and National Amusements, Inc.. (Jamison, Kevin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D. Jamison on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. (Jamison, Kevin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 54 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant ViacomCBS Inc..(Attorney Kevin D. Jamison added to party ViacomCBS Inc.(pty:dft))(Jamison, Kevin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 53 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice (Other) #14 by Clerk of Court. Docket No. 14 is stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice #18 filed on June 8, 2021. (mrgo)
June 10, 2021 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc. Adding Kurt T. Putnam as counsel of record for Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill. (Bergstrom, Emily)
June 10, 2021 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc. Adding Emily D. Bergstrom as counsel of record for Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill. (Bergstrom, Emily)
June 10, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc, identifying The Weir Group PLC. (Bergstrom, Emily)
June 10, 2021 Filing 49 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc.(Attorney Emily D Bergstrom added to party Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc(pty:dft))(Bergstrom, Emily)
June 9, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Clyde Union Inc, identifying Sentry Insurance Company, Admiral Insurance Company, Amerisure Insurance Company, and Celeros Flow Technology. (Mikacich, Amee)
June 9, 2021 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amee A Mikacich counsel for Defendant Clyde Union Inc. Adding Amee A. Mikacich as counsel of record for Clyde Union, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Clyde Union, Inc.. (Mikacich, Amee)
June 9, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Riley Power Inc, identifying Babcock Power Inc.. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 9, 2021 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ovsanna Thomas counsel for Defendant Riley Power Inc. Adding Ovsanna Thomas as counsel of record for Riley Power Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ovsanna Thomas. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 9, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Crane Co., identifying Crane Co.; Globe Indemnity (Crane Co. Insurer); Liberty Mutual (Crane Co. Insurer); Hartford (Crane Co. Insurer); Aetna (Crane Co. Insurer); Continental (Crane Co. Insurer) ; INA (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies (Crane Co. Insurer) ; The Employers Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas (Crane Co. Insurer) ; The Home Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Firemans Fund Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; American Home Assurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; American Reinsurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer); Aetna Casualty and Surety Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Midland Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Highlands Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Granite State Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Lexington Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Prudential Reinsurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer); The North River Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; AIU Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Boston Old Colony Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Insurance Company of North America (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Employers Mutual Casualty (Crane Co. Insurer) ; American Excess Insurance (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Transit Casualty Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; First State Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; New England Reinsurance Corporation (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Employers Insurance of Wausau (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Government Employees Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Mission Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Dairyland Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Century Indemnity Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Centaur Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Transamerica Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; American Centennial Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Pacific Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer) ; Integrity Insurance Company (Crane Co. Insurer). (Davis, Geoffrey)
June 9, 2021 Filing 43 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Riley Power Inc.(Attorney Ovsanna Thomas added to party Riley Power Inc(pty:dft))(Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 9, 2021 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 filed by Defendant Crane Co. (Davis, Geoffrey)
June 9, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint, #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
June 9, 2021 Filing 40 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Crane Co..(Attorney Geoffrey M Davis added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft))(Davis, Geoffrey)
June 9, 2021 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler LLC, served on 06/09/21. (Hugo, Edward)
June 9, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler LLC, identifying AMEC FOSTER WHEELER. (Hugo, Edward)
June 9, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward R Hugo on behalf of Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC (Hugo, Edward)
June 9, 2021 Filing 36 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler LLC. (Hugo, Edward)
June 9, 2021 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc., identifying Colfax Corporation, a publicly traded company, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, and IMO Holdings, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie)
June 9, 2021 Filing 34 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler LLC.(Attorney Edward R Hugo added to party Foster Wheeler LLC(pty:dft))(Hugo, Edward)
June 9, 2021 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, served on 06/09/21. (Hugo, Edward)
June 9, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, identifying AMEC FOSTER WHEELER. (Hugo, Edward)
June 9, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward R Hugo on behalf of Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Hugo, Edward)
June 9, 2021 Filing 30 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Hugo, Edward)
June 9, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie)
June 9, 2021 Filing 28 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Hugo, Edward)
June 9, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc..(Attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bailey, Bobbie)
June 9, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Attorney Edward R Hugo added to party Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation(pty:dft))(Hugo, Edward)
June 9, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Gardner Denver Inc, identifying Ingersoll Rand Inc. and KKR & Co. L.P.. (Jenkins, Charles)
June 9, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE filed by Defendant Gardner Denver Inc. OF APPEARANCE (Jenkins, Charles)
June 9, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Gardner Denver Inc.(Attorney Charles William Jenkins added to party Gardner Denver Inc(pty:dft))(Jenkins, Charles)
June 8, 2021 Filing 22 DEFENDANT ALFA LAVAL INC.S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND ENTITIES CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc, identifying Alfa Laval AB. (Reeg, Ana)
June 8, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 DEFENDANT ALFA LAVAL INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES filed by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.(Reeg, Ana)
June 8, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ana T Reeg counsel for Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. Adding Ana T. Reeg as counsel of record for Alfa Laval Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ALFA LAVAL INC.. (Attorney Ana T Reeg added to party Alfa Laval Inc(pty:dft))(Reeg, Ana)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for July 22, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than July 8, 2021. See Local Rule 26-1. See minute order for details. (lom)
June 8, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice is in the form of a letter and does not comply with L.R. 83-2.5. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
June 8, 2021 Filing 17 Defendant The W.W. Henry Company L.P.'s Local Rule 7.1-1 Notice of Interested Parties NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The W.W. Henry Company LP, identifying THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY, L.P.. (Tabuena, Cyrian)
June 8, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 JURY DEMAND. Defendant The W.W. Henry Company L.P.'s Answer to First Amended Complaint for Damages filed by THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY, L.P. The W.W. Henry Company LP.(Attorney Cyrian Barraca Tabuena added to party The W.W. Henry Company LP(pty:dft))(Tabuena, Cyrian)
June 8, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 JURY DEMAND. DEFENDANT CLYDE UNION, INC.S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Clyde Union Inc.(Attorney Amee A Mikacich added to party Clyde Union Inc(pty:dft))(Mikacich, Amee)
June 8, 2021 Filing 14 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. 53] NOTICE Scheduling Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Seitz, Andrew) Modified on 6/10/2021 (mrgo).
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Taking Deposition of Plaintiff Dennis Rockwell on June 17, 2021 filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Seitz, Andrew)
May 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Dennis A Rockwell, Dawn Rockwell pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) , without prejudice, as to Wilo USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Seitz, Andrew)
May 18, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #8 as to defendants Afton Pumps, Inc., Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Akron Brass Company, Alfa Laval Inc, Armstrong International, Inc., Asco Valve LLC, Aurora Pump Company, BW/IP Inc, Burnham LLC, Carver Pump Company, Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Clark-Reliance Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks Inc, Clyde Union Inc, Crane Co., Electrolux Home Products Inc, FMC Corporation, Fairchild Corp, Fisher Controls International LLC, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US Inc, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, Gardner Denver Inc, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Henry Company LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., ITT Industries Inc, Johnson Controls, Inc., Keeler-Dorr Oliver Boiler Company, Metallo Gasket Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., PCC Flow Technologies Holdings Inc, Premier Farnell Corp., R.P. Richards Construction Co., Raypak, Inc., Regal Beloit America Inc, Reliance Worldwide Corp LTD, Riley Power Inc, Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Boiler Works, Inc., TKD Inc, Taco, Inc., The Nash Engineering Company, The W.W. Henry Company LP, The Wm. Powell Company, Thrush Co., Inc., Trane U.S. Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Tyco International (US) Inc, Velan Valve Corp., ViacomCBS Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weil-McLain, Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc, Wilo USA LLC, York International Corporation, Zurn Industries, Inc. (mrgo)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Seitz, Andrew)
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 First Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell, identifying Defendants. (Seitz, Andrew)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 First Amended AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Crane Co., Does, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., ViacomCBS Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Metallo Gasket Co., Armstrong International, Inc., PCC Flow Technologies Holdings, Inc. (as sii to Johnston Pump Company and Paco Pumps), Carver Pump Company, Viking Pump, Inc., Keeler-Dorr Oliver Boiler Company, Asco Valve, LLC f/k/a Asco Valve, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Foster Engineering), Johnson Controls, Inc., The Wm. Powell Company, Premier Farnell Corp. f/k/a FAC Delaware Corp. (sued indivi. and as sii to Premier Industrial Corporation d/b/a Akron Brass Co., sii to Akron Brass Company and Akron Brass Mfg. Company, Inc.), Honeywell International, Inc., Afton Pumps, Inc., Weir Valve & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill, Trane U.S. Inc. f/k/a American Standard, Inc. (d/b/a American Standard Porducts, Inc.), Henry Company LLC, Alfa Laval, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to DeLaval Separator Company and Sharples Inc.), The Nash Engineering Company, Thrush Co., Inc., Zurn Industries, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., York International Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Frick Company), FMC Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Peerless Pump Co.), Clyde Union Inc. f/k/a Union Pump Company and David Brown Union Pumps Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. f/k/a Aqua Chem, Inc. d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division, Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co., Clark-Reliance Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Jerguson Gage & Valve Company), Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., The W.W. Henry Company, L.P. f/k/a The W.W. Henry Company and Henry Asphalt Company, Burnham LLC (sued indiv. and as sii to Burnham Corporation), Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, Inc. (as sii to BW/IP International, Inc., sii to Durco International), Tyco International (US) Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Lonergan Valves), Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (sued indivi. and as sii to Copes-Vulcan), R.P. Richards Construction Co., ITT Industries, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Foster Engineering Company and Bell & Gossett), Superior Boiler Works, Inc., TKD, Inc. (as sii to Johnston Pump Company), Flowserve US, Inc. (as sii to Rockwell Manufacturing Company; Edward Valve, Inc.; Nordstrom Valves, Inc.; Edward Vogt Valve Company; and Vogt Valve Company), Tuthill Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Taco, Inc., Weil-McLain, a division of the Marley-Wylain Company, Fisher Controls International LLC, Riley Power Inc, Gardner Denver, Inc. (sued indiv. and sii to Emco Wheaton f/k/a Wheaton Brass Works), Fairchild Corp. (sued indiv. and as sii to Patterson Pump Co.), Akron Brass Company (sued indiv. and as sii to Akron Brass Holding Corp.), Aurora Pump Company, Reliance Worldwide Corp. Ltd. (sued indiv. and as sii to A.W. Cash Valve Manufacturing Corporation), Wilo USA LLC (sued indiv. and as sii to Weil Pump Company Inc.), BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries, Raypak, Inc., Regal Beloit America, Inc. f/k/a RBC Manufacturing Corporation f/k/a Marathon Electric Manufacturing Corporation amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Metallo Gasket Co., Armstrong International, Inc., PCC Flow Technologies Holdings, Inc. (as sii to Johnston Pump Company and Paco Pumps), Carver Pump Company, Viking Pump, Inc., Keeler-Dorr Oliver Boiler Company, Asco Valve, LLC f/k/a Asco Valve, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Foster Engineering), Johnson Controls, Inc., The Wm. Powell Company, Premier Farnell Corp. f/k/a FAC Delaware Corp. (sued indivi. and as sii to Premier Industrial Corporation d/b/a Akron Brass Co., sii to Akron Brass Company and Akron Brass Mfg. Company, Inc.), Honeywell International, Inc., Afton Pumps, Inc., Weir Valve & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill, Trane U.S. Inc. f/k/a American Standard, Inc. (d/b/a American Standard Porducts, Inc.), Henry Company LLC, Alfa Laval, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to DeLaval Separator Company and Sharples Inc.), The Nash Engineering Company, Thrush Co., Inc., Zurn Industries, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., York International Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Frick Company), FMC Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Peerless Pump Co.), Clyde Union Inc. f/k/a Union Pump Company and David Brown Union Pumps Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. f/k/a Aqua Chem, Inc. d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division, Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co., Clark-Reliance Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Jerguson Gage & Valve Company), Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., The W.W. Henry Company, L.P. f/k/a The W.W. Henry Company and Henry Asphalt Company, Burnham LLC (sued indiv. and as sii to Burnham Corporation), Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, Inc. (as sii to BW/IP International, Inc., sii to Durco International), Tyco International (US) Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Lonergan Valves), Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (sued indivi. and as sii to Copes-Vulcan), R.P. Richards Construction Co., ITT Industries, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Foster Engineering Company and Bell & Gossett), Superior Boiler Works, Inc., TKD, Inc. (as sii to Johnston Pump Company), Flowserve US, Inc. (as sii to Rockwell Manufacturing Company; Edward Valve, Inc.; Nordstrom Valves, Inc.; Edward Vogt Valve Company; and Vogt Valve Company), Tuthill Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Taco, Inc., Weil-McLain, a division of the Marley-Wylain Company, Fisher Controls International LLC, Riley Power Inc, Gardner Denver, Inc. (sued indiv. and sii to Emco Wheaton f/k/a Wheaton Brass Works), Fairchild Corp. (sued indiv. and as sii to Patterson Pump Co.), Akron Brass Company (sued indiv. and as sii to Akron Brass Holding Corp.), Aurora Pump Company, Reliance Worldwide Corp. Ltd. (sued indiv. and as sii to A.W. Cash Valve Manufacturing Corporation), Wilo USA LLC (sued indiv. and as sii to Weil Pump Company Inc.), BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries, Raypak, Inc., Regal Beloit America, Inc. f/k/a RBC Manufacturing Corporation f/k/a Marathon Electric Manufacturing Corporation(Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Afton Pumps, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Alfa Laval, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to DeLaval Separator Company and Sharples Inc.)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Akron Brass Company (sued indiv. and as sii to Akron Brass Holding Corp.)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Armstrong International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Asco Valve, LLC f/k/a Asco Valve, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Foster Engineering)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Aurora Pump Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Burnham LLC (sued indiv. and as sii to Burnham Corporation)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Carver Pump Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Clark-Reliance Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Jerguson Gage & Valve Company)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. f/k/a Aqua Chem, Inc. d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Clyde Union Inc. f/k/a Union Pump Company and David Brown Union Pumps Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Chicago Bridge & Iron Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (sued indivi. and as sii to Copes-Vulcan)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Fairchild Corp. (sued indiv. and as sii to Patterson Pump Co.)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Fisher Controls International LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, Inc. (as sii to BW/IP International, Inc., sii to Durco International)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Flowserve US, Inc. (as sii to Rockwell Manufacturing Company; Edward Valve, Inc.; Nordstrom Valves, Inc.; Edward Vogt Valve Company; and Vogt Valve Company)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party FMC Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Peerless Pump Co.)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Gardner Denver, Inc. (sued indiv. and sii to Emco Wheaton f/k/a Wheaton Brass Works)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Goulds Pumps, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Henry Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party ITT Industries, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Foster Engineering Company and Bell & Gossett)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Johnson Controls, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Keeler-Dorr Oliver Boiler Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Metallo Gasket Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party The Nash Engineering Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party PCC Flow Technologies Holdings, Inc. (as sii to Johnston Pump Company and Paco Pumps)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Premier Farnell Corp. f/k/a FAC Delaware Corp. (sued indivi. and as sii to Premier Industrial Corporation d/b/a Akron Brass Co., sii to Akron Brass Company and Akron Brass Mfg. Company, Inc.)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party R.P. Richards Construction Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Raypak, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Regal Beloit America, Inc. f/k/a RBC Manufacturing Corporation f/k/a Marathon Electric Manufacturing Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Riley Power Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Spirax Sarco, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Superior Boile
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Seitz, Andrew)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 Plaintiffs NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell, (Seitz, Andrew)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31274923 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Dennis A Rockwell, Dawn Rockwell. (Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Dennis A Rockwell(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Dawn Rockwell(pty:pla))(Seitz, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis A. Rockwell et al v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Baltes
Represented By: Charles S Park
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: James G Scadden
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Represented By: T Stephen Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Daniel R Baltes
Represented By: Charles S Park
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Edward Martinovich
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: James G Scadden
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asco Valve LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Farnell Corp. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to PREMIER INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION d/b/a AKRON BRASS CO., successor-in-interest to AKRON BRASS COMPANY and AKRON BRASS MFG. COMPANY, INC. formerly known as FAC Delaware Corp
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Kurt T Putnam
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S. Inc. formerly known as American Standard Inc doing business as American Standard Products Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Union Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Amee A Mikacich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Inc formerly known as Aqua Chem Inc doing business as Cleaver-Brooks Division
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Christopher E Williams
Represented By: Melanie L Ameele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The W.W. Henry Company LP
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Julie A Torres
Represented By: Nicolas P Martin
Represented By: Cyrian Barraca Tabuena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Keith M Ameele
Represented By: Suzanna Lianna Minasian
Represented By: Elizabeth J Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Beloit America Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Dana L Burch
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 400 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metallo Gasket Co.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Lindsay Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Alleli P Carino
Represented By: Caren Dawson Dombrowski
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCC Flow Technologies Holdings Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Julie A Torres
Represented By: Gayle Lynne Ketchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Karen Lynn Finateri Silbiger
Represented By: Robert Harvey Berkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Edward R Ulloa
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keeler-Dorr Oliver Boiler Company
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asco Valve Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wm. Powell Company
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Alleli P Carino
Represented By: Caren Dawson Dombrowski
Represented By: William Joseph Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAC Delaware Corp
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Gayle Lynne Ketchie
Represented By: Kendra Tietjen
Represented By: William M Hake
Represented By: Nicolas P Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afton Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Tina Broccardo Van Dam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood and Morrill
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Kurt T Putnam
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Standard Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Company LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Ana T Reeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Gayle Lynne Ketchie
Represented By: B Gardiner McKleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrush Co., Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Khaled Taqi-Eddin
Represented By: Solomon Pantuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Keith M Ameele
Represented By: Suzanna Lianna Minasian
Represented By: Ovsanna Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: James G Scadden
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Russell W Schatz, Jr
Represented By: Timothy C Pieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pump Company
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Amee A Mikacich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brown Union Pumps Company
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Amee A Mikacich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua Chem Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Christopher E Williams
Represented By: Melanie L Ameele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark-Reliance Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Douglas G Wah
Represented By: Beth C Hopwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Bridge & Iron Company
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Joanne Rosendin
Represented By: Christopher J Dyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The W.W. Henry Company
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Julie A Torres
Represented By: Nicolas P Martin
Represented By: Cyrian Barraca Tabuena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Asphalt Company
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Julie A Torres
Represented By: Nicolas P Martin
Represented By: Cyrian Barraca Tabuena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Benedict Ehigie Idemundia
Represented By: William Chandler Swallow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Duriron Company Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Keith M Ameele
Represented By: Suzanna Lianna Minasian
Represented By: Elizabeth J Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco International (US) Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Represented By: Lance D Wilson
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.P. Richards Construction Co.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Boiler Works, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Bruce G Chusid
Represented By: Mark A Love
Represented By: Richard M Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TKD Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Tina Broccardo Van Dam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuthill Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Lindsay Weiss
Represented By: Karen M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Lance D Wilson
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Bruce G Chusid
Represented By: Mark A Love
Represented By: Richard M Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-McLain
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Represented By: Edward Martinovich
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher Controls International LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Gary D Sharp
Represented By: Melanie L Ameele
Represented By: Elizabeth J Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Keith M Ameele
Represented By: Suzanna Lianna Minasian
Represented By: Ovsanna Thomas
Represented By: Peter B Langbord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Charles William Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairchild Corp
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akron Brass Company
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Angela V Sayre
Represented By: Mark D Sayre
Represented By: Peter Michael Mularczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Alleli P Carino
Represented By: Caren Dawson Dombrowski
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Worldwide Corp LTD
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Gary D Sharp
Represented By: Melanie L Ameele
Represented By: Elizabeth J Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilo USA LLC
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Ovsanna Thomas
Represented By: Keith M Ameele
Represented By: Suzanna Lianna Minasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raypak, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Mari Kiridjian
Represented By: Claire C Weglarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Manufacturing Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Dana L Burch
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Electric Manufacturing Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Dana L Burch
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Rockwell
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: John M Caron
Represented By: Scott L Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis A Rockwell
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Represented By: John M Caron
Represented By: Scott L Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?