Richard J. Kirk, III v. Unibank For Savings et al
Plaintiff: Richard J Kirk, III and Richard J. Kirk, III
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., DOES 1-10, inclusive, Trans Union LLC, Equifax Information Services LLC, Unibank For Savings and Does 1-10 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv03970
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 3/28/22. (jgr)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2022 at 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 7/19/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. See document for additional pretrial dates and deadlines. (jgr)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on July 19, 2021 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 6, 2021 Filing 22 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 Days, filed by Plaintiff Richard J. Kirk, III.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scheduling Exhibit)(Friedman, Todd)
July 6, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Marker, Kristin)
June 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC, identifying Equifax, Inc.. (Quinn, Thomas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed in State Court filed by defendant Equifax Information Services LLC.(Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft))(Quinn, Thomas)
June 15, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC.(Marker, Kristin)
June 8, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Unibank For Savings, identifying Unibank for Savings. (Shatz, Sanford)
June 8, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS (G-112a) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: In accordance with the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents (ECF No. #15 ), regarding Answer by UniBank for Savings (ECF No. #14 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the document is accepted as filed. Defendant must file its notice of interested parties by June 10, 2021. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
June 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #14 by Unibank For Savings. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Unibank For Savings.(Attorney Sanford P Shatz added to party Unibank For Savings(pty:dft))(Shatz, Sanford)
May 18, 2021 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Trans Union LLC answer now due 6/15/2021, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC.(Marker, Kristin)
May 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC, identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc.. (Attorney Kristin L Marker added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft))(Marker, Kristin)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR by Stephen Montes Kerr, Courtroom Deputy Clerk to Judge Mark C. Scarsi: You are hereby notified that due to a clerical error the Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference (ECF No. #9 ) was issued in error. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Acebo, Pamela)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 served on May 11, 2021 & May 12, 2021. (Acebo, Pamela)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
May 11, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC, Unibank For Savings. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Richard J. Kirk, III. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/12/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc; Central Source LLC; Online Data Exchange LLC; New Management Services LLC; VantageScore Solutions LLC; Opt-Out Services LLC. (Acebo, Pamela)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Acebo, Pamela)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21PSCV00294 Receipt No: ACACDC-31276600 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Pamela C Acebo added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Acebo, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard J. Kirk, III v. Unibank For Savings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela C Acebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Kristin L Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unibank For Savings
Represented By: Sanford P Shatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J Kirk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Kirk, III
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?