Amado Munoz et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amado Munoz, Michael Schwartz, Lingyan Yin, Frank Costobile, Matthew Robinson, Gary Tetrault, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, James Tillery and Rachel Fairchild
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and Honda North America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04030
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
2 Judge: Karen E Scott
3 Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 29 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zarifian, Zourik)
July 6, 2021 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Matthew Robinson, Frank Costobile, Ben Hu, Carolyn Heier, Rachel Fairchild, Amado Munoz, upon Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. served on 5/19/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation - Carlos Paz, Agent for Service, 818 W. 7th Street, Ste. 930, Los Angeles, CA 90017 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Straus, Alex)
June 11, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney William A. Ladnier counsel for Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. Changing Firm Name to Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC. Changing E-mail to wladnier@milberg.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Ladnier, William)
June 11, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Alex R. Straus counsel for Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. Changing Address and Firm Name to Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC; 280 South Beverly Drive, Penthouse, Beverly Hills, CA 90212. Changing E-mail to astraus@milberg.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Straus, Alex)
June 7, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc., identifying American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and Honda North America, Inc. are wholly-owned subsidiaries of Honda Motor Co., Ltd., a publicly-held company in Japan. (Kizirian, Eric)
June 7, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc..(Attorney Eric Y. Kizirian added to party American Honda Motor Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Y. Kizirian added to party Honda North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kizirian, Eric)
May 25, 2021 Filing 23 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
May 24, 2021 Filing 22 Text Only ORDER GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yi #21 #17 and Application of Non-Resident Attorney Glen L. Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin #16 pursuant to the Courts directive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 21, 2021 Filing 21 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 5/19/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-31323635) filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Straus, Alex)
May 20, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin ( #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not signed. (lt)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-00818 JLS(KESx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Virginia A. Phillips to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-04030 JLS(KESx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn)
May 20, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa A. White counsel for Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. Lisa A. White is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Amado Munoz, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Gary Tetrault, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, James Tillery and Lingyan Yin. (Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Frank Costobile(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Rachel Fairchild(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Carolyn Heier(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Ben Hu(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Amado Munoz(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Matthew Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Michael Schwartz(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Gary Tetrault(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party James Tillery(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Lingyan Yin(pty:pla))(White, Lisa)
May 19, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31323635) filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Straus, Alex)
May 19, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Glen L. Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31323408) filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Straus, Alex)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
May 17, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William A. Ladnier on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin (Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Frank Costobile(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Rachel Fairchild(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Carolyn Heier(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Ben Hu(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Amado Munoz(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Matthew Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Michael Schwartz(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Gary Tetrault(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party James Tillery(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Lingyan Yin(pty:pla))(Ladnier, William)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00818-JLS-KES (Straus, Alex)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Glen L. Abramson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bryan L. Clobes. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel O. Herrera. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lisa A. White. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Plaintiffs and Defendants. (Straus, Alex)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Matthew Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Straus, Alex)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Matthew Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Straus, Alex)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31290695 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Schwartz, Ben Hu, Frank Costobile, James Tillery, Carolyn Heier, Rachel Fairchild, Amado Munoz, Matthew Tetrault, Lingyan Yin, Matthew Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX. A - Honda message to authorized dealers re 2016-2020 Honda Civic Compressor Replacement, #2 Exhibit EX B - Exemplar of Warranty Booklet, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - November 2019 Letter to Honda owners, #4 Declaration Declaration of Alex R. Straus Pursuant to California Legal Remedies Act Section 1780(d)) (Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Frank Costobile(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Rachel Fairchild(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Carolyn Heier(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Ben Hu(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Amado Munoz(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Matthew Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Michael Schwartz(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Matthew Tetrault(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party James Tillery(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Lingyan Yin(pty:pla))(Straus, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amado Munoz et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amado Munoz
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Glen L. Abramson
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schwartz
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Glen L. Abramson
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lingyan Yin
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Glen L. Abramson
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Costobile
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Glen L. Abramson
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Robinson
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Glen L. Abramson
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Tetrault
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Glen L. Abramson
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Heier
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Glen L. Abramson
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Hu
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Glen L. Abramson
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tillery
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Glen L. Abramson
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Fairchild
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Alex R Straus
Represented By: Glen L. Abramson
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Eric Y. Kizirian
Represented By: Zourik Zarifian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda North America, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Y. Kizirian
Represented By: Zourik Zarifian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?