Robin Mizrahi v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robin Mizrahi
Defendant: Chattem, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Perrigo Company, PLC, Pfizer, Inc., Safeway, Inc, Perrigo Research & Development Company, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Albertsons Companies, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and DOES 1 through 300, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv04111
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 20 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of Florida, 9:21-cv-81053 filed 6/14/2021. (iv)
June 7, 2021 Filing 19 Conditional Transfer Order - 65 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2924, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
May 19, 2021 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Albertsons Companies, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc, Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Perrigo Company, PLC, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Pfizer, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Safeway, Inc, and Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Amneal, #2 Boehringer, #3 Chattem, #4 CVS, #5 GlaxoSmithKline, #6 Perrigo, #7 PerrigoCompany, #8 Pfizer, #9 Rite Aid, #10 Safeway, #11 Sanofi) (jtil)
May 18, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 18, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
May 17, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi, (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31308178 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Robin Mizrahi. (Attorney Boris Treyzon added to party Robin Mizrahi(pty:pla))(Treyzon, Boris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robin Mizrahi v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Company, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Research & Development Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 300, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Mizrahi
Represented By: Boris Treyzon
Represented By: Michael P Kelly
Represented By: Robert William Finnerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?