Oleg Taran et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Oleg Taran, Valentina Ichim and Oleg Taran
Defendant: Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS), Donna Campagnolo and Alejandro Mayorkas
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Barry Freeman
Case Number: 2:2021cv04301
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for dates and requirements.* (iv)
July 14, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Tracy Renaud, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS), Donna Campagnolo.(Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party Donna Campagnolo(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party Tracy Renaud(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party United States Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS)(pty:dft))(Barragan, Matthew)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Barry Freeman has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
June 8, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Oleg Taran, Arthur Oleg Taran, Valentina Ichim, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz, Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Guzman, Megan)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for dates, deadlines and requirements.* (iv)
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendants Donna Campagnolo, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS). (jtil)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Valentina Ichim, Arthur Oleg Taran, Oleg Taran. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Face Page, #2 Summons Request - Campagnolo, #3 Summons Request - Renaud, #4 Summons Request - Mayorkas)(Guzman, Megan)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plantiffs All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Complaint Face Page)(Guzman, Megan)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Valentina Ichim, Arthur Oleg Taran, Oleg Taran. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Face Page)(Guzman, Megan)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31343974 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Oleg Taran, Arthur Oleg Taran, Valentina Ichim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - I-526 Approval Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - I-485 Receipt Notices, #3 Exhibit 3 - Oleg Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Valentina Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - EAD Cards, #6 Exhibit 6 - EAD Extension Receipts, #7 Exhibit 7 - Hardship Documents) (Attorney Megan Nicole Guzman added to party Valentina Ichim(pty:pla), Attorney Megan Nicole Guzman added to party Arthur Oleg Taran(pty:pla), Attorney Megan Nicole Guzman added to party Oleg Taran(pty:pla))(Guzman, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oleg Taran et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Oleg Taran
Represented By: Megan Nicole Guzman
Represented By: Niralkumar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentina Ichim
Represented By: Megan Nicole Guzman
Represented By: Niralkumar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oleg Taran
Represented By: Megan Nicole Guzman
Represented By: Niralkumar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship & Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Campagnolo
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Matthew Jimenez Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Barry Freeman
Represented By: Barry V Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?