Peter C Benedith v. Department of Medicine of Metro Health Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Peter C Benedith and Peter Chukwuka Benedith
Defendant: Department of Medicine of Metro Health Medical Center, Metro Health Medical Center, Case Western University, Cuyahoga County of OH and Showtime Network
Case Number: 2:2021cv04669
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 18 Defendant The MetroHealth Systems Notice of Interested Parties Pursuant to L.R. 7.1-1 and F.R. Civ. P. 7.1 / NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Department of Medicine of Metro Health Medical Center, Metro Health Medical Center, (Love, Avril)
August 2, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File / Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendants Department of Medicine of Metro Health Medical Center, Metro Health Medical Center. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Kaitlyn N. Pangburn, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Proposed Order) (Attorney Avril G Love added to party Department of Medicine of Metro Health Medical Center(pty:dft), Attorney Avril G Love added to party Metro Health Medical Center(pty:dft)) (Love, Avril)
July 27, 2021 Filing 16 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CASE WESTERN RESERVE UNIVERSITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #12 filed by Defendant Case Western University. (Naleway, Nicole)
July 27, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Venkataramanan Balakrishnan In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #12 filed by Defendant Case Western University. (Naleway, Nicole)
July 27, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Nicole Naleway In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #12 filed by Defendant Case Western University. (Naleway, Nicole)
July 27, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #12 filed by Defendant Case Western University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Complaint)(Naleway, Nicole)
July 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Case Western University. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Naleway, Nicole)
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Case Western University, (Attorney Nicole Andrea Naleway added to party Case Western University(pty:dft))(Naleway, Nicole)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Case Western University (Naleway, Nicole)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 9/13/2021 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/7/2021. (lb)
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion Not to Participate in ADR filed by plaintiff Peter Chukwuka Benedith. (es)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (hr)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case, filed by Plaintiff Peter C Benedith. (lh)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Peter C Benedith, (lh)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Case Western University, Cuyahoga County of OH, Department of Medicine of Metro Health Medical Center, Metro Health Medical Center, Showtime Network.Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson.(Filing Fee $402 PAID), filed by Plaintiff Peter C Benedith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Request as to Defendant Department of Medicine of Metro Health Medical Center, #3 Summons Request as to Defendant Cuyahoga County of OH, #4 Summons Request as Defendant Metro Health Medical Center, #5 Summons Request as to Defendant Case Western University, #6 Summons Request as to Defendant Showtime Network) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peter C Benedith v. Department of Medicine of Metro Health Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Medicine of Metro Health Medical Center
Represented By: Avril G Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Health Medical Center
Represented By: Avril G Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Western University
Represented By: Vince Mojica Verde
Represented By: Nicole Andrea Naleway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga County of OH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Showtime Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter C Benedith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Chukwuka Benedith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?