Genella Green v. Westwood Healthcare and Wellness Center, LP
Plaintiff: Genella Green
Defendant: Westwood Healthcare & Wellness Center, LP, Westwood Healthcare and Wellness Center, LP and Does 1 through 200, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv04839
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 16 CORRECTED TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter unsigned from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 21STCV16452, received on 7/22/2021. (iv)
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant's request to stay proceedings is DENIED. Defendant has not met its burden to demonstrate that a stay is warranted here. Accordingly, the action is REMANDED, and the Clerk of Court is ORDERED to return this action to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Westwood Healthcare and Wellness Center, LP. (Zarmi, David)
July 12, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #5 filed by Defendant Westwood Healthcare and Wellness Center, LP. (Zarmi, David)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #8 filed by Defendant Westwood Healthcare and Wellness Center, LP. (Zarmi, David)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Genella Green. Motion set for hearing on 8/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF ART GHARIBIAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS JOINT MOTION TO REMAND AND RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND AND DENYING DEFENDANTS 12(b) MOTION TO DISMISS) (Gharibian, Artin)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Genella Green. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF ART GHARIBIAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REMAND ACTION TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REMAND ACTION TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA) (Gharibian, Artin)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before July 14, 2021, why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Defendant's failure to respond by the above date will result in the action being remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (iv)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of David Zarmi - in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #5 filed by Defendant Westwood Healthcare and Wellness Center, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Zarmi, David)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Westwood Healthcare and Wellness Center, LP. Motion set for hearing on 7/26/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Zarmi, David)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet and No. 2 Corporate Disclosure should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
June 14, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Westwood Healthcare and Wellness Center, LP. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Genella Green. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/30/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
June 14, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Genella Green, upon Defendant Westwood Healthcare and Wellness Center, LP served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Harold Einstein, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/19/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Receipt No: ACACDC-31464805 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Westwood Healthcare & Wellness Center, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure) (Attorney David Zarmi added to party Westwood Healthcare & Wellness Center, LP(pty:dft))(Zarmi, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genella Green v. Westwood Healthcare and Wellness Center, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genella Green
Represented By: Alexander H Feldman
Represented By: Artin Gharibian
Represented By: Justin Vitug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westwood Healthcare & Wellness Center, LP
Represented By: David Zarmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westwood Healthcare and Wellness Center, LP
Represented By: David Zarmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 200, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?