Serena Fleites et al v. MindGeek S.A.R.L. et al
Plaintiff: Serena Fleites and Jane Doe
Defendant: Bergmair Does, MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., Visa Inc., TrafficJunky Inc., Feras Antoon, David Tassillo, Colbeck Capital Does, Bernd Bergmair, MG Premiun LTD, MG Freesites, LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., Corey Urman, MG Global Entertainment Inc. and 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW & ECONOMICS
Case Number: 2:2021cv04920
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
2 Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
3 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2023 Filing 315 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen Michael Duvernay counsel for Amicus INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW & ECONOMICS. Bradley A. Benbrook is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Amicus Curiae International Center for Law & Economics. (Duvernay, Stephen)
March 13, 2023 Filing 314 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Visa Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Catherine Cazes at catherine.cazes@weil.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Tulumello, Andrew)
March 10, 2023 Filing 313 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/8/2023 10:11 a.m. to 1:26 p.m. re Transcript #312 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (apr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 10, 2023 Filing 312 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/8/2023 10:11 a.m. to 1:26 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC., phone number (858) 453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/31/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2023. (apr)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting #275 APPLICATION to Seal Document(s). (see document for details) (hr)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting #271 APPLICATION to Seal Document(s). (see document for details) (hr)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting #268 APPLICATION to Seal Document(s). (see document for details) (hr)
March 8, 2023 Filing 308 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant David Tassillo for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Carlson Floy at cfloy@maglaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (ls)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting #265 APPLICATION to Seal Document(s). (see document for details) (hr)
March 8, 2023 Filing 306 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Specially-Appearing Defendant Corey Urman for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Sarah Strickland at sestrickland@mintz.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Akoglu, Kerime)
March 8, 2023 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Serena Fleites for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Karina Urena at kurena@brownrudnick.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Tabaksblat, Lauren)
March 8, 2023 Filing 304 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL #261 , #264 , #267 , #274 Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Case is called for hearing. Appearances entered. Argument by counsel. The Court orders the parties to meet and confer as reflected on the record, and file joint supplemental briefing by March 24, 2023. Defendant Bernd Bergmair's supplemental brief is due by March 31, 2023. Court Recorder: CS 03/08/2023. (kh)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 303 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL MINDGEEK ENTITIES' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND INTERROGATORIES by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting in part and denying in part #262 APPLICATION to Seal Document(s). The Application is GRANTED as to Exhibits 7, 8, and 10 submitted as attachments to Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel MindGeek Entities' Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories. The Application is DENIED as to Exhibit 5. The Clerk will file under seal Exhibits 7, 8, and 10. (hr)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Devon A. Little to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bernd Bergmair (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34859652) #299 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Meehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bernd Bergmair (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34859750) #300 , for the following reasons: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. GSC from NY are not within the 30 days. (twdb)
February 28, 2023 Filing 301 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Devon A. Little to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bernd Bergmair (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34859652) #299 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Meehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bernd Bergmair (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34859750) #300 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. Other error(s) with document(s): GSC from NY are not within the 30 days. (lt)
February 27, 2023 Filing 300 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #302] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Meehan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bernd Bergmair (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34859750) filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Marmalefsky, Dan) Modified on 3/3/2023 (twdb).
February 27, 2023 Filing 299 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #302] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Devon A. Little to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bernd Bergmair (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34859652) filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Marmalefsky, Dan) Modified on 3/3/2023 (twdb).
February 22, 2023 Filing 298 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel David Tassillo's Responses #270 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 15, #11 Exhibit 16, #12 Exhibit 17, #13 Exhibit 18)(Bowe, Michael)
February 22, 2023 Filing 297 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Defendant Bernd Bergmair's Responses #264 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 15, #11 Exhibit 16, #12 Exhibit 17)(Bowe, Michael)
February 22, 2023 Filing 296 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel #261 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14)(Bowe, Michael)
February 22, 2023 Filing 295 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Feras Antoon's Responses #274 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 15, #11 Exhibit 16, #12 Exhibit 17, #13 Exhibit 18)(Bowe, Michael)
February 22, 2023 Filing 294 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Corey Urman's Responses #267 Specially-Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to First Set of Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Defendant Corey Urman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kerime Akoglu in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Kerime Akoglu)(Korn, Adam)
February 22, 2023 Filing 293 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Corey Urman's Responses #267 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 19)(Bowe, Michael)
February 22, 2023 Filing 292 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel David Tassillo's Responses #270 filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Wiechert, David)
February 22, 2023 Filing 291 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Feras Antoon's Responses #274 filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. (Wiechert, David)
February 22, 2023 Filing 290 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Defendant Bernd Bergmair's Responses #264 filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit R, #3 Exhibit S, #4 Exhibit T)(White, Ronald)
February 22, 2023 Filing 289 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel #261 filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Boisvert, Christopher)
February 15, 2023 Filing 288 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. correcting Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form, #286 (Bowe, Michael)
February 15, 2023 Filing 287 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. correcting Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form, #285 (Bowe, Michael)
February 14, 2023 Filing 286 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: MOTION to Compel Defendant Bernd Bergmair's Responses #264 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Joint Stipulation is missing the signature of Michael J. Bowe. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
February 14, 2023 Filing 285 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal #262 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document lacks required signature. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST OF PETER A. CHAVKIN FOR PERMISSION TO TELEPHONICALLY OBSERVE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Request of Peter A. Chavkin for Permission to Telephonically Observe the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to the First Sets of Requests for Production and Interrogatories on March 8, 2023 #282 is hereby GRANTED. Mr. Chavkin has the Court's permission to remotely attend and telephonically observe the March 8, 2023 hearing at 10:00 a.m. (kh)
February 13, 2023 Filing 283 DECLARATION of Jason Brown In Support of APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal #275 filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wiechert, David)
February 13, 2023 Filing 282 REQUEST to Telephonically Observe Hearing of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to First Sets of Requests for Production and Interrogatories Request of Peter A. Chavkin for Permission to Telephonically Observe Hearing of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to First Sets of Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Peter A. Chavkin in Support of Request for Permission to Telephonically Observe Hearing of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to Motion to Compel Responses to First Sets of Requests for Production and Interrogatories, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Request of Peter A. Chavkin for Permission to Telephonically Observe Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to First Sets of Requests for Production and Interrogatories) (Chavkin, Peter)
February 13, 2023 Filing 281 DECLARATION of Jonathan S. Sack In Support of APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal #271 filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wiechert, David)
February 13, 2023 Filing 280 DECLARATION of Michelle Hart Yeary in support of APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal #268 filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Boisvert, Christopher)
February 13, 2023 Filing 279 DECLARATION of Michelle Hart Yeary in support of APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal #262 filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order)(Boisvert, Christopher)
February 13, 2023 Filing 278 DECLARATION of Ronald G. White in Support of APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal #265 Declaration of Ronald White in Support of Application for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Attachments: #1 Amended Proposed Order Granting Applications for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses)(White, Ronald)
February 10, 2023 Filing 277 DECLARATION of Adam B. Korn in Support of APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal #268 Declaration of Adam Korn in Support of Application for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses filed by Defendant Corey Urman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order Granting Application for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses)(Korn, Adam)
February 9, 2023 Filing 276 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal #275 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit P)(Bowe, Michael)
February 9, 2023 Filing 275 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit P)(Bowe, Michael)
February 9, 2023 Filing 274 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Feras Antoon's Responses filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. Motion set for hearing on 3/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Declaration, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit E, #14 Exhibit F, #15 Exhibit G, #16 Exhibit H, #17 Exhibit I, #18 Exhibit J, #19 Exhibit K, #20 Exhibit L, #21 Exhibit M, #22 Exhibit N, #23 Exhibit O, #24 Exhibit P, #25 Exhibit Q, #26 Exhibit R, #27 Exhibit S, #28 Proposed Order)(Bowe, Michael)
February 9, 2023 Filing 273 (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE RE MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #261 , presently set for hearing on March 1, 2023, is hereby CONTINUED to March 8, 2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 West Fourth Street, 6th Floor, Santa Ana, California 92701. The parties are required to review Judge Spaeth's procedures page, http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-autumn-d-spaeth, for important procedures regarding motions and mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 9, 2023 Filing 272 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal #271 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit M, #4 Exhibit N)(Bowe, Michael)
February 9, 2023 Filing 271 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit M, #5 Exhibit N)(Bowe, Michael)
February 9, 2023 Filing 270 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel David Tassillo's Responses filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. Motion set for hearing on 3/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Declaration, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit E, #14 Exhibit F, #15 Exhibit G, #16 Exhibit H, #17 Exhibit I, #18 Exhibit J, #19 Exhibit K, #20 Exhibit L, #21 Exhibit M, #22 Exhibit N, #23 Exhibit O, #24 Exhibit P, #25 Exhibit Q, #26 Exhibit R, #27 Exhibit S, #28 Exhibit T, #29 Proposed Order)(Bowe, Michael)
February 9, 2023 Filing 269 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal #268 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit P)(Bowe, Michael)
February 9, 2023 Filing 268 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit P)(Bowe, Michael)
February 8, 2023 Filing 267 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Corey Urman's Responses filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. Motion set for hearing on 3/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Declaration, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit C, #14 Exhibit D, #15 Exhibit E, #16 Exhibit F, #17 Exhibit G, #18 Exhibit H, #19 Exhibit I, #20 Exhibit J, #21 Exhibit L, #22 Exhibit M, #23 Exhibit N, #24 Exhibit O, #25 Exhibit P, #26 Exhibit Q, #27 Exhibit R, #28 Proposed Order)(Bowe, Michael)
February 8, 2023 Filing 266 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal #265 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit N)(Bowe, Michael)
February 8, 2023 Filing 265 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit N)(Bowe, Michael)
February 8, 2023 Filing 264 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Bernd Bergmair's Responses filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. Motion set for hearing on 3/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Declaration, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit D, #13 Exhibit E, #14 Exhibit F, #15 Exhibit G, #16 Exhibit H, #17 Exhibit I, #18 Exhibit J, #19 Exhibit K, #20 Exhibit L, #21 Exhibit M, #22 Exhibit N, #23 Exhibit O, #24 Exhibit P, #25 Exhibit Q, #26 Proposed Order)(Bowe, Michael)
February 8, 2023 Filing 263 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal #262 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 10)(Bowe, Michael)
February 8, 2023 Filing 262 APPLICATION to file document Motion to Compel and Exhibits under seal filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 10)(Bowe, Michael)
February 8, 2023 Filing 261 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Proposed Order)(Bowe, Michael)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND INTERROGATORIES (DKT. NO. 224) by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Plaintiffs Motion #224 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS ORDERED that, on or before February 24, 2023, or a date mutually agreed to by the parties, Defendants shall produce all documents responsive to the granted requests. Furthermore, the Court notes that Defendants agreed to produce certain documents and information at the January 11, 2023 hearing and during the subsequent meet and confer with Plaintiff. To the extent Defendants have not completed those productions, they are ordered to do so on or before February 24, 2023, or a date mutually agreed to by the parties. (kh)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. NO. 225) by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: In light of the absence of a declaration from Defendants, the Court denies Plaintiff's Application to File under Seal #225 . **See Order for details** (kh)
January 25, 2023 Filing 258 LETTER ROGATORY ISSUED: Letter Rogatory signed by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (see document for details) (hr)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth, re Stipulation for Issuance of Letters Rogatory #256 . IT IS ORDERED that the request to issue the Letter Rogatory annexed hereto as Exhibit 1, is GRANTED. (hr)
January 23, 2023 Filing 256 Joint STIPULATION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 (Proposed) Letter of Request)(Bowe, Michael)
January 20, 2023 Filing 255 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Stein, David)
January 13, 2023 Filing 254 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1/11/2023 10:24 a.m. re Transcript #253 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (apr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 13, 2023 Filing 253 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/11/2023 10:24 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC, phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/3/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2023. (apr)
January 13, 2023 Filing 252 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Visa Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Sydney Hargrove at sydney.hargrove@weil.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Tulumello, Andrew)
January 13, 2023 Filing 251 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Christopher Boisvert at chip.boisvert@dechert.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Boisvert, Christopher)
January 11, 2023 Filing 250 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff Serena Fleites for Court Reporter. (Tabaksblat, Lauren)
January 11, 2023 Filing 249 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT MINDGEEK ENTITIES' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS #223 and PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT MINDGEEK ENTITIES' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INTERROGATORIES #224 Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Case is called for hearing. Appearances entered. Argument by counsel. Defendant MindGeek Entities' motion #223 is DENIED as reflected on the record. Plaintiff's motion #224 is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. The parties are ordered to meet and confer in an effort to resolve as many issues raised in the motion as possible and file a joint statement by close of business on January 20, 2023 as to the outcome, setting forth the remaining matters at issue. Court Recorder: CS 01/11/2023. (kh)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER GRANTING THE REQUEST OF MICHELLE HART YEARY FOR PERMISSION TO TELEPHONICALLY OBSERVE THE HEARING ON PLAINITFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND THE MINDGEEK ENTITY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Request of Michelle Hart Yeary for Permission to Telephonically Observe the Hearing #246 is hereby GRANTED. Ms. Yeary has the Court permission to remotely attend and telephonically observe the January 11, 2023 hearing at 10:00 am. (kh)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST OF JASON BROWN TO TELEPHONICALLY OBSERVE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S AND THE MINDGEEK ENTITY DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Request of Jason Brown to Telephonically Observe the Hearing #245 is hereby GRANTED. Mr. Brown has the Court's permission to remotely teleconference in to telephonically observe the hearing or hearings scheduled on the Motions. (kh)
January 9, 2023 Filing 246 REQUEST for Leave of Michelle Hart Yeary to Appear for Telephonically Request of Michelle Hart Yeary for Permission to Telephonically Observe the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and the MindGeek Entity Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. Request set for hearing on 1/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Yeary, Michelle)
January 9, 2023 Filing 245 First REQUEST to allow Jason Brown to Telephonically Observe Hearings on Defendants' Motions to Compel filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. Request set for hearing on 1/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Request to Telephonically Observe the Hearings, #2 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: GRANTING #243 Non-Resident Attorney John G.Doyle APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Serena Fleites, designating David M. Stein as local counsel. (shb)
December 23, 2022 Filing 243 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Serena Fleites (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 11/15/2022, Receipt No. 34326603) filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Pennsylvania, #2 Exhibit Certificate of good standing - New Jersey, #3 Proposed Order) (Stein, David)
December 19, 2022 Filing 242 NOTICE of Change of address by David W. Wiechert attorney for Defendants Feras Antoon, David Tassillo. Changing attorneys address to 4000 MacArthur Blvd. Suite 600 East Tower, Newport Beach, CA 92660. Filed by Defendants Feras Antoon, David Tassillo. (Wiechert, David)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER EXTENDING JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY CUTOFF #240 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Pursuant to the Informal Discovery Conference held before United States Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth on December 15, 2022, jurisdictional discovery is extended for approximately 120 days to May 1, 2023. (lom)
December 15, 2022 Filing 240 MINUTES OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE AND RE-SETTING OF DISCOVERY MOTIONS held before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Case is called for hearing. Telephonic appearances entered. Informal Discovery Conference held regarding Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute #238 . Conference held as reflected on the record. The Court will recommend to Judge Carney that the jurisdictional discovery cutoff be extended by 120 days with no restrictions. Further, by agreement, the Court RE-SETS the hearing on MindGeek Entity Defendants' and Plaintiff's Motions to Compel #223 and #224 , presently set for hearing on December 27, 2022, to January 11, 2023 at 10:00 before Magistrate Judge Spaeth in Courtroom 6B. Court Recorder: CS 12/15/2022. (kh)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #234 Non-Resident Attorney Michelle H. Yeary APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MindGeek S.A.R.L., et al., Defendants, designating Benjamin Sadun as local counsel. Granting #236 Non-Resident Attorney Michelle H. Yeary APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MindGeek S.A.R.L., et al., Defendants, designating Benjamin Sadun as local counsel. (twdb)
December 13, 2022 Filing 238 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute. This matter is set for a Telephonic Informal Discovery Conference on December 15, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. Call in information will be provided by separate email. (kh)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 TEXT ONLY ENTRY SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE CONTINUANCE AND COURTROOM CHANGE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The hearing on MindGeek Entity Defendants' and Plaintiff's Motions to Compel #223 and #224 , presently set for hearing on December 21, 2022, are CONTINUED to December 27, 2022 at 10:00 before Magistrate Judge Spaeth in Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California 92701. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 12, 2022 Filing 236 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle H. Yeary to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 12/8/2022, Receipt No. 34444241) filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Sadun, Benjamin)
December 8, 2022 Filing 235 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle H. Yeary to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated (Pro Hac Vice F #234 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Local counsel failed to sign the application. Staff or someone other than attorney signed. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) note that electronic signatures are not accepted. (G-64). (lt)
December 8, 2022 Filing 234 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle H. Yeary to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 12/8/2022, Receipt No. 34444241) filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Sadun, Benjamin)
December 7, 2022 Filing 233 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Defendant MindGeek Entities' Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories #224 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bowe, Michael)
December 7, 2022 Filing 232 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents #223 filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Boisvert, Christopher)
December 6, 2022 Filing 231 NOTICE of Change of address by Peter A. Chavkin attorney for Defendant Corey Urman. Changing attorneys address to 919 Third Avenue, 39th Floor, New York, NY 10022. Filed by Defendant Corey Urman. (Chavkin, Peter)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST OF KERIME S. AKOGLU FOR PERMISSION TO TELEPHONICALLY OBSERVE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND INTERROGATORIES #229 by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Ms. Akoglu has the Court's permission to remotely attend and telephonically observe the December 21, 2022 hearing at 10:00 a.m. (kh)
December 5, 2022 Filing 229 REQUEST to to Telephonically Observe Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to Requests for Production and Interrogatories Request of Kerime S. Akoglu for Permission to Telephonically Observe Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses to Requests for Production and Interrogatories filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kerime S. Akoglu in Support of Request for Permission to Telephonically Observe Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Request of Kerime S. Akoglu for Permission to Telephonically Observe Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Responses) (Akoglu, Kerime)
December 2, 2022 Filing 228 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Kerime S. Akoglu counsel for Defendant Corey Urman. Changing Address to 919 Third Avenue, New York, NY 10022. Filed by Defendant Corey Urman. (Akoglu, Kerime)
December 1, 2022 Filing 227 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Motions have been filed in this case #223 , #224 . The parties are required to review Judge Spaeth's procedures page, http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-autumn-d-spaeth, for important procedures regarding motions and mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 30, 2022 Filing 226 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Application for Leave to File Under Seal Material Designated by Another Party as Confidential Pursuant to a Protective Order under seal #225 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Motion to Compel, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit 7)(Tabaksblat, Lauren)
November 30, 2022 Filing 225 APPLICATION to file document Application for Leave to File Under Seal Material Designated by Another Party as Confidential Pursuant to a Protective Order under seal filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document Motion to Compel, #3 Redacted Document Redacted Version of Ex. 7)(Tabaksblat, Lauren)
November 30, 2022 Filing 224 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant MindGeek Entities' Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Tabaksblat, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Declaration of Michelle Hart Yeary, #11 Proposed Order)(Tabaksblat, Lauren)
November 30, 2022 Filing 223 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation Related to Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Christopher R Boisvert in Support of Motion to Compel, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1, #11 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 2, #12 Exhibit Declaration of John G. Doyle in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel, #13 Proposed Order)(Boisvert, Christopher)
November 29, 2022 Filing 222 LETTERS ROGATORY ISSUED: Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters, to Grant Thornton Luxembourg signed by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (kh)
November 29, 2022 Filing 221 LETTERS ROGATORY ISSUED: Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance, Pursuant to the Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters, to Grant Thornton (Cyprus) Ltd. signed by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (kh)
November 29, 2022 Filing 220 LETTERS ROGATORY ISSUED: Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance, (Letter Rogatory) to Grant Thornton LLP re Ireland signed by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (kh)
November 29, 2022 Filing 219 LETTERS ROGATORY ISSUED: Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance, (Letter Rogatory) to Grant Thornton LLP re Canada signed by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (kh)
November 28, 2022 Filing 218 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Visa Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Sydney Hargrove at sydney.hargrove@weil.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Tulumello, Andrew)
November 25, 2022 Filing 217 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/16/2022 re Transcript #216 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (aa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 25, 2022 Filing 216 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/16/2022. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/16/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2023. (aa)
November 23, 2022 Filing 215 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Christopher Boisvert at chip.boisvert@dechert.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Boisvert, Christopher)
November 22, 2022 Filing 214 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Serena Fleites (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34326603) #208 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The document is stricken. Local Rule 83-2.l.3.3(d), Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. NJ GSC missing. Declaration required for unavailability of good standing certificates due to Covid or other delays. See Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (twdb)
November 22, 2022 Filing 213 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,, #211 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Canada, #2 Proposed Order Ireland, #3 Proposed Order Cyprus, #4 Proposed Order Luxembourg)(Tabaksblat, Lauren)
November 22, 2022 Filing 212 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff Serena Fleites for Court Reporter. (Tabaksblat, Lauren)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ROGATORY (DKT. NO. #178 ); AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND GRANTING DEFENDANT VISA'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (DKT. NO. #180 ) by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that, on or before Tuesday, November 22, 2022 at 5:00 p.m., Plaintiff shall lodge with the Court the proposed letters rogatory with revisions. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Visa's Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents is DENIED AS MOOT and Defendant Visa's Motion for a Protective Order is GRANTED. **See Order for Details** (kh)
November 16, 2022 Filing 210 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF REQUESTS FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Case is called for hearing. Appearances entered. Argument by counsel as reflected on the record. Plaintiff's motion #178 is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Written order to follow. Court Recorder: CS 11/16/2022. (kh)
November 16, 2022 Filing 209 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Serena Fleites (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34326603) #208 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): NJ GSC missing. Declaration required for unavailability of good standing certificates due to Covid or other delays. See Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (lt)
November 15, 2022 Filing 208 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #214] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Serena Fleites (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34326603) filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Stein, David) Modified on 11/23/2022 (twdb).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST OF JASON BROWN TO TELEPHONICALLY OBSERVE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS ROGATORY by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Request of Jason Brown to Telephonically Observe the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory #206 is hereby GRANTED. Mr. Brown has the Court's permission to remotely teleconference in to telephonically observe the hearing or hearings scheduled on the Motion. (kh)
November 14, 2022 Filing 206 REQUEST for Order for Jason Brown to Telephonically Observe the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. Request set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Brown, #2 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING ORDER. A clerical error caused the issuance of that Scheduling Order. Accordingly, the Scheduling Order, (Dkt. 173), is hereby VACATED in its entirety. (twdb)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Court finds Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Protective Order #180 appropriate for decision without oral argument on November 16, 2022. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory #178 remains on the November 16, 2022 calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 TEXT ONLY ENTRY SCHEDULING NOTICE. (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE CONTINUANCE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Court CONTINUES the following matters from November 9, 2022 at 1o:00am to November 16, 2022 at 10:00am: Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory #178 , Motion to Compel and for Protective Order #180 , before Magistrate Judge Spaeth in Courtroom 6B, 6th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California 92701. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST OF KERIME S. AKOGLU FOR PERMISSION TO TELEPHONICALLY OBSERVE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND VISA'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER ON NOVEMBER 9, 2022 #201 by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Ms. Akoglu has the Court's permission to remotely attend and telephonically observe the November 9, 2022 hearing at 10:00 a.m. Teleconference information will be sent by separate email. (kh)
October 31, 2022 Filing 201 REQUEST for Leave of Kerime S. Akoglu to Appear for Telephonically Observe Hearing Request of Kerime S. Akoglu for Permission to Telephonically Observe Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Visa's Motion for Protective Order on November 9, 2022 filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kerime S. Akoglu in Support of Request for Permission to Telephonically Observe Hearing on Motions to Compel and for Protective Order on November 9, 2022, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Permission to Telephonically Observe Hearing on Motions to Compel and for Protective Order on November 9, 2022) (Akoglu, Kerime)
October 27, 2022 Filing 200 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. Amendment to Reply (Motion related) #195 Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tabaksblat, Lauren)
October 27, 2022 Filing 199 Notice of Withdrawal of Leave to File Document Under Seal #196 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration #197 filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Bowe, Michael)
October 27, 2022 Filing 198 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1 & 2 under seal #196 , Sealed Declaration #197 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 79-5.2.2 requires that certain documents be filed with the Application: (1) a declaration; (2) a proposed order; (3) a redacted version of any documents of which only a portion is proposed to be filed under seal; and (4) an unredacted version of any documents proposed to be filed under seal. The rule specifies that the Application, the proposed order, and the redacted documents will be publicly viewable, while the declaration and the unredacted documents will not. Accordingly, you must file the Application, the proposed order, and any redacted documents using one, non-sealed, event (Leave to File Under Seal), and the declaration and unredacted documents using another, sealed event (Sealed Declaration in Support). Step-by-step instructions for each of those two steps are set forth below. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
October 26, 2022 Filing 197 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1 & 2 under seal #196 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Tabaksblat, Lauren)
October 26, 2022 Filing 196 **WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL #199 ** APPLICATION to file document Exhibits 1 & 2 under seal filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bowe, Michael) Modified on 10/27/2022 (kh).
October 26, 2022 Filing 195 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory #178 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Bowe, Michael)
October 21, 2022 Filing 194 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ronald G. White counsel for Defendant Bernd Bergmair. Changing Address and Firm Name to Walden Macht & Haran LLP; 250 Vesey Street, 27th Floor, New York, New York, 10281. Changing Email and Fax Number to rwhite@wmhlaw.com; 212-335-2040. Filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (White, Ronald)
October 19, 2022 Filing 193 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Evan S Nadel counsel for Defendant Corey Urman. Evan Nadel is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Nadel, Evan)
October 19, 2022 Filing 192 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory #178 filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen Massey in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Boisvert, Christopher)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #185 Non-Resident Attorney Peter A. Biagetti APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Specially appearing defendant Corey Urman, designating Adam B. Korn as local counsel. (twdb)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #184 Non-Resident Attorney Kerime S. Akoglu APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Specially appearing defendant Corey Urman, designating Adam B. Korn as local counsel. Granting #189 Non-Resident Attorney Kerime S. Akoglu APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Specially appearing defendant Corey Urman, designating Adam B. Korn as local counsel. (twdb)
October 17, 2022 Filing 189 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kerime S. Akoglu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Corey Urman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/12/2022, Receipt No. 34140684) filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Korn, Adam)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth, re Stipulation for Discovery as to Electronically Stored Information #183 . (see document for details) (hr)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re Stipulation for Protective Order #182 . (see document for details) (hr)
October 13, 2022 Filing 186 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kerime S. Akoglu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Corey Urman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. CCACDC-34140684) #184 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (lt)
October 13, 2022 Filing 185 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter A. Biagetti to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Corey Urman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/13/2022, Receipt No. 34147168) filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Korn, Adam)
October 12, 2022 Filing 184 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kerime S. Akoglu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Corey Urman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. CCACDC-34140684) filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Korn, Adam)
October 12, 2022 Filing 183 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Electronically Stored Information filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated.(Sadun, Benjamin)
October 12, 2022 Filing 182 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated.(Sadun, Benjamin)
October 11, 2022 Filing 181 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: A motion has been filed in this case #180 . The parties are required to review Judge Spaeth's procedures page, http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-autumn-d-spaeth, for important procedures regarding motions and mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 7, 2022 Filing 180 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Visa, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents and, MOTION for Protective Order by Visa, Inc. filed by Defendant Visa Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Visa's Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Visa, Inc.' Motion for Protective Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
October 6, 2022 Filing 179 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: A motion has been filed in this case #178 . The parties are required to review Judge Spaeth''s procedures page, http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-autumn-d-spaeth, for important procedures regarding motions and mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 4, 2022 Filing 178 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order) (Bowe, Michael)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #175 Non-Resident Attorney Meghan McCafferty APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Serena Fleites, designating David M Stein as local counsel. (lom)
September 30, 2022 Filing 176 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Meghan McCafferty to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Serena Fleites (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34068375) #175 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1).. (lt)
September 29, 2022 Filing 175 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Meghan McCafferty to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Serena Fleites (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34068375) filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order (Proposed) order) (Stein, David)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 4/6/2023. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 6/5/2023. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/20/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2023 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 8/15/2023 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #170 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher R. Boisvert APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, designating Benjamin Sadun as local counsel. (twdb)
August 8, 2022 Filing 171 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher R. Boisvert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated (Pro Hac #170 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
August 8, 2022 Filing 170 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher R. Boisvert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33766813) filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Sadun, Benjamin)
August 2, 2022 Filing 169 FOR COURT USE ONLY: STATISTICAL CORRECTION (Notice of Motion) #145 re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief (rolm)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SCHEDULING ORDER AND REQUEST TO OPEN DISCOVERY #129 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. On May 6, 2022, Plaintiff requested that the Court enter a scheduling order and that the Court order the parties to proceed to discovery. (Dkt. 129.) The Court DENIES that request. In a separate order, the Court ordered the MindGeek Defendants (individual and entity) to submit to jurisdictional discovery. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER DIRECTING THE MINDGEEK DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT TO JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY UNTIL DECEMBER 30, 2022, GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND HER COMPLAINT AFTER JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY IS COMPLETE, AND DENYING THE MINDGEEK DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE #135 #136 #137 #139 #140 FOR THEM TO RENEW AFTER PLAINTIFF HAS FILED A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff and the MindGeek Defendants to engage in jurisdictional discovery. The Court sets FRIDAY, DECEMBER 30, 2022 as the close for jurisdictional discovery. The Court REFERS this matter to the Magistrate Judge for the jurisdictional discovery period. The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the MindGeek Defendants motions to dismiss in light of the near certainty that Plaintiff will file a Second Amended Complaint at the close of jurisdictional discovery, which the Court GRANTS her leave to do. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART VISAS MOTION TO DISMISS #138 , DEMANDING A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS CIVIL CONSPIRACY CLAIM, AND GRANTING THE INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW & ECONOMICS MOTION TO FILE AN AMICUS BRIEF #145 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. For the foregoing reasons, Visas motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. However, leave to amend is limited. The Court will not permit Plaintiff to amend her section 1591(a)(2) claim against Visa. Such amendment would be futile because Plaintiff simply has no basis for claiming Visa directly participated in the sex trafficking ventures that harmed her.16 Plaintiff shall withhold any amendment until the parties have completed jurisdictional discovery, which the Court has ordered in a companion order. (See Dkt. 167.) (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
July 25, 2022 Filing 165 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #139 filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Sadun, Benjamin)
July 25, 2022 Filing 164 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #137 filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. (Wiechert, David)
July 25, 2022 Filing 163 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #136 filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Wiechert, David)
July 25, 2022 Filing 162 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant David Tassillo. correcting Reply (Motion related) #160 (Wiechert, David)
July 25, 2022 Filing 161 REPLY Reply in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint #140 Reply in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Corey Urman. (Nadel, Evan)
July 25, 2022 Filing 160 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #136 filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Wiechert, David) Modified on 7/26/2022 (twdb).
July 25, 2022 Filing 159 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim #138 filed by Defendant Visa Inc.. (Tulumello, Andrew)
July 25, 2022 Filing 158 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #135 filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (White, Ronald)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #156 Unopposed Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulation to Expand Page Limit. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 20, 2022 Filing 156 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Entry of Stipulation to Expand Page Limit , Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 8/22/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order) (Sadun, Benjamin)
July 18, 2022 Filing 155 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief #145 filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Bowe, Michael)
July 12, 2022 Filing 154 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adam B Korn counsel for Defendant Corey Urman. Adding Adam B. Korn as counsel of record for specially appearing defendant Corey Urman for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Attorney Adam B Korn added to party Corey Urman(pty:dft))(Korn, Adam)
July 12, 2022 Filing 153 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kathryn L. Ignash counsel for Defendant Corey Urman. Kathryn L. Ignash is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kathryn L. Ignash. (Ignash, Kathryn)
July 1, 2022 Filing 152 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andre Fontana counsel for Defendant Bernd Bergmair. Andre Fontana is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Fontana, Andre)
June 27, 2022 Filing 151 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim #138 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #136 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #135 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #137 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #139 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint #140 Plaintiff's Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Bowe, Michael)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #148 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulation to Extend Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion is GRANTED and the Proposed Stipulation To Extend Time is APPROVED. (twdb)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS #147 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion is GRANTED and the Proposed Stipulation for Plaintiff to File an Omnibus Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss is APPROVED. (twdb)
June 23, 2022 Filing 148 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File opposition to defendants' motions to dismiss filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Bowe, Michael)
June 22, 2022 Filing 147 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for entry of stipulation for plaintiff to file an omnibus opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss filed by plaintiff Serena Fleites. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Bowe, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Filing 146 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief #145 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
May 31, 2022 Filing 145 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW & ECONOMICS. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Benbrook, Bradley)
May 27, 2022 Filing 144 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Evan S Nadel counsel for Defendant Corey Urman. Changing Address to 44 Montgomery Street, 36th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94104. Filed by Defendant Corey Urman. (Nadel, Evan)
May 26, 2022 Filing 143 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Kathryn L. Ignash counsel for Defendant Corey Urman. Changing Address to 2049 Century Park East, Suite 300, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendant Corey Urman. (Ignash, Kathryn)
May 25, 2022 Filing 142 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated (Sadun, Benjamin)
May 24, 2022 Filing 141 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #135 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
May 23, 2022 Filing 140 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint) (Nadel, Evan)
May 23, 2022 Filing 139 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of MindGeek's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Andreas Alkiviades Andreou in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #4 Declaration of Jean Rochette in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #5 Declaration of Benjamin M. Sadun in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Sadun, Benjamin)
May 23, 2022 Filing 138 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Visa Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendant Visa Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Tulumello, Andrew)
May 23, 2022 Filing 137 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David)
May 23, 2022 Filing 136 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant David Tassillo. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David)
May 23, 2022 Filing 135 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (White, Ronald)
May 11, 2022 Filing 134 JOINDER filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated joining in Response in Opposition to Motion, #133 . (Sadun, Benjamin)
May 10, 2022 Filing 133 OPPOSITION to REQUEST for Issuance of Scheduling Order pursuant to Rule 16(b) #129 Opposition Of Individual Defendants Bernd Bergmair, Feras Antoon, David Tassillo And Corey Urman To Plaintiff's Request For Issuance Of Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Feras Antoon, Bernd Bergmair, David Tassillo, Corey Urman. (White, Ronald)
May 9, 2022 Filing 132 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Visa Inc. to REQUEST for Issuance of Scheduling Order pursuant to Rule 16(b) #129 (Tulumello, Andrew)
May 6, 2022 Filing 131 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re REQUEST for Issuance of Scheduling Order pursuant to Rule 16(b) #129 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bowe, Michael)
May 6, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Issuance #129 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
May 6, 2022 Filing 129 REQUEST for Issuance of Scheduling Order pursuant to Rule 16(b) filed by Plaintiff Serena Fleites. (Bowe, Michael)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND TO ADD AND REMOVE DEFENDANTS [DKT. 124] AND ENTERING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER AND TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS [Dkt. 127] by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, having considered Plaintiff Serena Fleites's unopposed Motion to Amend the Complaint and to Add and Remove Defendants (Dkt. 124), and having considered the written submissions, declarations and evidence of the parties, and the arguments of counsel in support of and in opposition to the motion, GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion. The Court also APPROVES the joint motion for entry of stipulation to File Amended Complaint, Set Briefing Schedule, and Expand Page Limits. (Dkt. 127.) The Court ORDERS the following: #1 Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is May 23,2022. #2 Plaintiff's deadline to respond to any motion filed as to the Complaint is June 24, 2022. #3 Defendants have until July 25, 2022 to submit any reply in support of such motion. #4 A hearing on Defendants' motions is set for August 8, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Page limits for any motion submitted under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 is expanded to 50 pages. See Local Rule 11-6. See minute order for details. (lom)
April 4, 2022 Filing 127 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 5/23/2022, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 5/2/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulation) (Sadun, Benjamin)
March 22, 2022 Filing 126 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The MOTION to Amend to Add and Remove Defendants #124 is advanced from 4/26/2022 at 1:30 PM to 4/25/2022 at 1:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 22, 2022 Filing 125 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend to Add and Remove Defendants #124 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
March 21, 2022 Filing 124 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend to Add and Remove Defendants filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. Motion set for hearing on 4/26/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Amend the Complaint to Add and Remove Defendants, #2 Declaration of Lauren Tabaksblat in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint to Add and Remove Defendants, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Order) (Tabaksblat, Lauren)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #121 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulation to Set Time to File a First Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion is GRANTED and the Proposed Stipulation to Set Time to File a First Amended Complaint is APPROVED. (twdb)
March 14, 2022 Filing 122 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #120 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text; missing name of event and text content. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 12, 2022 Filing 121 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint filed by plaintiff Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order) (Bowe, Michael)
March 11, 2022 Filing 120 (D'Aquila, Danielle)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEVER [Dkt. #75 , DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS [Dkts. #55 , #62 , #67 , #68 , #69 , #70 , DENYING AS MOOT INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW & ECONOMICS REQUEST TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF [Dkt. #95 , and DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY CASE [Dkt. #108 . For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to sever is GRANTED. Plaintiff Serena Fleites will continue as the only named Plaintiff in this action and the Court ORDERS her to file a First Amended Complaint consistent with this order by Monday, March 14, 2022. Plaintiffs Jane Doe No. 1 through No. 33 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and may re-file their actions in any court of competent jurisdiction. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 9, 2022 Filing 118 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bowe, Michael)
February 9, 2022 Filing 117 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 1595(b)(1) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: Why Stay Should Not Remain in Place Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 1595(b)(1) #108 Joinder filed on behalf of Defendants Feras Antoon, David Tasillo, Bernd Bergmair, Corey Urman filed by Defendants Feras Antoon, David Tassillo. (Wiechert, David)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #115 Non-Resident Attorney Hayden Coleman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, designating Benjamin Sadun as local counsel. (twdb)
February 8, 2022 Filing 115 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hayden A. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32757075) filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Corrected Proposed Order) (Sadun, Benjamin)
February 8, 2022 Filing 114 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Hayden A. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated (Pro Hac Vice #113 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests.. Application.. Appear Pro Hac Vice. Note: Wrong event does not provide relief or changes sought. Document is not a Noticed Motion. (lt)
February 7, 2022 Filing 113 Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Hayden A. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32752450) filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Corrected Proposed Order) (Sadun, Benjamin)
February 7, 2022 Filing 112 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hayden A. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., TrafficJunky Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32751789) filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., TrafficJunky Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadun, Benjamin)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #110 Non-Resident Attorney Kathleen N. Massey APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MindGeek S.A.R.L., et al., Defendants, designating Benjamin Sadun as local counsel. (twdb)
February 4, 2022 Filing 110 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kathleen N. Massey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., TrafficJunky Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32741199) filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., TrafficJunky Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sadun, Benjamin)
February 3, 2022 Filing 109 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites.. (Tabaksblat, Lauren)
February 3, 2022 Filing 108 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 1595(b)(1) , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: Why Stay Should Not Remain in Place Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 1595(b)(1) filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., TrafficJunky Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/7/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion by MindGeek for Stay and Order to Show Cause Why Stay Should Not Remain in Place Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 1595(b)(1), #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kathleen Massey) (Sadun, Benjamin)
January 24, 2022 Filing 107 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #68 filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. (Wiechert, David)
January 24, 2022 Filing 106 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #70 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 #75 filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., TrafficJunky Inc.. (Sadun, Benjamin)
January 24, 2022 Filing 105 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint #69 filed by Defendant Corey Urman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Reply Brief, #2 Declaration of Patrick Ouellet in Support of Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Ex. A to Declaration of Patrick Ouellet)(Nadel, Evan)
January 24, 2022 Filing 104 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim #62 filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (White, Ronald)
January 24, 2022 Filing 103 REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Wiechert, David)
January 24, 2022 Filing 102 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief #95 /Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to International Center for Law & Economics' Motion for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Bowe, Michael)
January 21, 2022 Filing 101 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State A Claim #55 filed by Defendant Visa Inc.. (Tulumello, Andrew)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #98 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulation to Consolidate Reply Briefs. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE REPLY BRIEFS by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 20, 2022 Filing 98 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulation to Consolidate Reply Briefs filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., TrafficJunky Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/28/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order) (Sadun, Benjamin)
January 18, 2022 Filing 97 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief #95 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
January 17, 2022 Filing 96 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amicus INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW & ECONOMICS (Benbrook, Bradley)
January 17, 2022 Filing 95 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW & ECONOMICS. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attorney Bradley A Benbrook added to party INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW & ECONOMICS(pty:am)) (Benbrook, Bradley)
December 10, 2021 Filing 94 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim #62 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State A Claim #55 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #67 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint #69 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 #75 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #70 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #68 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Tabaksblat in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Mindgeek's Motion to Sever, #2 Exhibit A)(Tabaksblat, Lauren)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS #92 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion is GRANTED and the Proposed Stipulation for Plaintiffs to File Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions is APPROVED. (lom)
December 8, 2021 Filing 92 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to for Entry of Stipulation for Plaintiffs to file Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order) (Bowe, Michael)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME #90 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Joint Motion is GRANTED and the Proposed Stipulation To Extend Time is APPROVED. The hearing date for the following motions are continued to February 14, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
November 21, 2021 Filing 90 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File responses to Defendants motions to dismiss and the MindGeek Entities motion to sever filed by plaintiff Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order) (Bowe, Michael)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #88 Non-Resident Attorney Nathaniel P.T. Read APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Feras Antoon Defendant, designating David W. Wiechert as local counsel. (twdb)
November 2, 2021 Filing 88 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathaniel P. T. Read to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Feras Antoon (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32260572) filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David)
November 2, 2021 Filing 87 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair, (White, Ronald)
November 2, 2021 Filing 86 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 #75 filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (White, Ronald)
November 2, 2021 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Specially Appearing Defendants Corey Urman, (Lafferty Ignash, Kathryn)
November 1, 2021 Filing 84 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Feras Antoon, (Wiechert, David)
November 1, 2021 Filing 83 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant David Tassillo, (Wiechert, David)
November 1, 2021 Filing 82 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 #75 Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. (Wiechert, David)
November 1, 2021 Filing 81 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 #75 Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Wiechert, David)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #63 Non-Resident Attorney Peter A. Chavkin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant David Tassillo, designating Kathryn L. Ignash as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #66 Non-Resident Attorney Karen R. King APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant David Tassillo, designating David W. Wiechert as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #65 Non-Resident Attorney Ryan McMenamin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant David Tassillo, designating David W. Wiechert as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #64 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Sack APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant David Tassillo, designating David W. Wiechert as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 29, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 #75 filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Lafferty Ignash, Kathryn)
October 22, 2021 Filing 75 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., TrafficJunky Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion by MindGeek to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33) (Sadun, Benjamin)
October 22, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Jonathan Sack's Connecticut Certificate of Good Standing re Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Sack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/12/2021, Receipt No. 32132683) #64 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wiechert, David)
October 22, 2021 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Visa Inc., (Tulumello, Andrew)
October 21, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #70 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss by Defendants, #2 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration of Andreas A. Andreou ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #4 Declaration of Benjamin Sadun ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' MTD)(Sadun, Benjamin)
October 20, 2021 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated identifying MindGeek S.a.r.l. as Corporate Parent. (Sadun, Benjamin)
October 20, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Declaration of Andreas A. Andreou ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration of Benjamin Sadun ISO Defendants' Motion to Dimiss, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Proposed Order Granting MTD) (Sadun, Benjamin)
October 20, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Motion to Dismiss Complaint) (Nadel, Evan)
October 20, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David)
October 20, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant David Tassillo. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David)
October 20, 2021 Filing 66 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen R. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/12/2021, Receipt No. 32132959) filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David)
October 20, 2021 Filing 65 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan McMenamin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/12/2021, Receipt No. 32133045) filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David)
October 20, 2021 Filing 64 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Sack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/12/2021, Receipt No. 32132683) filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David)
October 20, 2021 Filing 63 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter A. Chavkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Corey Urman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32189266) filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Lafferty Ignash, Kathryn)
October 20, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, Ronald)
October 20, 2021 Filing 61 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kathryn Lafferty Ignash counsel for Defendant Corey Urman. Filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Attorney Kathryn Lafferty Ignash added to party Corey Urman(pty:dft))(Lafferty Ignash, Kathryn)
October 20, 2021 Filing 60 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Evan S Nadel counsel for Defendant Corey Urman. Adding Evan S. Nadel as counsel of record for Corey Urman for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Attorney Evan S Nadel added to party Corey Urman(pty:dft))(Nadel, Evan)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin C. Bridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Feras Antoon and designating David W. Wiechert as local counsel #53 by Judge Cormac J. Carney (lc)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney S. Jason Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Feras Antoon and designating David W. Wiechert as local counsel #50 by Judge Cormac J. Carney (lc)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Sack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32132683) #46 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen R. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32132959) #47 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan McMenamin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32133045) #48 , for the following reasons: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Local counsel's address missing on proposed order. (lc)
October 20, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on February 10, 2022. (eva)
October 18, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State A Claim filed by Defendant Visa Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendant Visa Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Tulumello, Andrew)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION TO SET TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Cormac J. Carney #52 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion is GRANTED and the Proposed Stipulation To Set Time To Respond To Initial Complaint is APPROVED. (twdb)
October 18, 2021 Filing 53 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin C. Bridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Feras Antoon (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32168208) filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David)
October 17, 2021 Filing 52 JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION TO SET TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/18/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #27 filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulation to Set Time to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Sadun, Benjamin)
October 14, 2021 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andre Fontana counsel for Defendant Bernd Bergmair. Adding Andre Fontana as counsel of record for Defendant Bernd Bergmair for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Attorney Andre Fontana added to party Bernd Bergmair(pty:dft))(Fontana, Andre)
October 14, 2021 Filing 50 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney S. Jason Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Feras Antoon (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32147724) filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney David W. Wiechert added to party Feras Antoon(pty:dft)) (Wiechert, David)
October 12, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Sack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32132683) #46 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen R. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32132959) #47 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan McMenamin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32133045) #48 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Local counsel's address missing on proposed order. (lt)
October 12, 2021 Filing 48 (STRICKEN PER 10/20/2021 ORDER DOCKET NO. 57). APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan McMenamin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32133045) filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David) Modified on 10/20/2021 (lc).
October 12, 2021 Filing 47 (STRICKEN PER 10/20/2021 ORDER DOCKET NO. 57). APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen R. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32132959) filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David) Modified on 10/20/2021 (lc).
October 12, 2021 Filing 46 (STRICKEN PER 10/20/2021 ORDER DOCKET NO. 57). APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Sack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32132683) filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney David W. Wiechert added to party David Tassillo(pty:dft)) (Wiechert, David) Modified on 10/20/2021 (lc).
October 6, 2021 Filing 45 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [DKT. 41]. Denying #41 REQUEST. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 5, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re REQUEST for Pretrial Conference Request for Conference #41 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bowe, Michael)
October 5, 2021 Filing 43 OPPOSITION to REQUEST for Pretrial Conference Request for Conference #41 filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Marmalefsky, Dan)
October 5, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Pretrial Conference #41 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
October 4, 2021 Filing 41 REQUEST for Pretrial Conference Request for Conference filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Bowe, Michael)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #39 Non-Resident Attorney Ronald G. White APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bernd Bergmair Defendant, designating Dan Marmalefsky as local counsel. (twdb)
August 12, 2021 Filing 39 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ronald G. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bernd Bergmair (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31797892) filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Marmalefsky, Dan)
August 12, 2021 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dan E. Marmalefsky counsel for Defendant Bernd Bergmair. Adding Dan Marmalefsky as counsel of record for Bernd Bergmair for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Attorney Dan E. Marmalefsky added to party Bernd Bergmair(pty:dft))(Marmalefsky, Dan)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation to Ste Time for Visa, Inc. to Respond to Initial Complaint and Exceed Page Limitation #36 . Visa must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before October 18, 2021; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 36 STIPULATION to Set Time for Visa, Inc. to Respond to Initial Complaint and Exceed Page Limitation filed by plaintiffs and defendants Serena Fleites, Visa Inc. (twdb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order to Set Time for Visa, Inc. to Respond to Initial Complaint and Expand Page Limits re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation 50 pagesJoint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/18/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #34 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew)
August 10, 2021 Filing 34 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation 50 pages, Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/18/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Visa Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Stipulation To Set Time For Visa, Inc. to Respond to Initial Complaint and Expand Page Limits) (Attorney Andrew S Tulumello added to party Visa Inc. (pty:dft)) (Tulumello, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. upon Corey Urman waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/23/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Corey Urman. (Bowe, Michael)
July 29, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. upon Bernd Bergmair waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/23/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Bernd Bergmair. (Bowe, Michael)
July 26, 2021 Filing 31 STIPULATION to set time to response to initial complaint and expand page limits #1 filed by Plaintiffs and Defendants Serena Fleites, MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., David Tassillo, TrafficJunky Inc., Corey Urman.(et)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION TO SET TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT AND EXPAND PAGE LIMITS #27 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion is GRANTED and the Proposed Stipulation To Set Time To Respond To Initial Complaint and Expand Page Limits is APPROVED. (et)
July 26, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. upon David Tassillo waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/23/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. Waiver of Service signed by David Tassillo. (Bowe, Michael)
July 26, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. upon Feras Antoon waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/23/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Feras Antoon. (Stein, David)
July 23, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/18/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., TrafficJunky Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/23/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party MG Freesites, LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party MG Global Entertainment Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party MG Premiun LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party MindGeek S.A.R.L.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party MindGeek USA Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party RK Holdings USA Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party TrafficJunky Inc.(pty:dft)) (Sadun, Benjamin)
July 14, 2021 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, Serena Fleites, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (Stein, David)
July 14, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #24 (Stein, David)
July 13, 2021 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, Serena Fleites, upon Defendant MindGeek USA Incorporated served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Stein, David)
July 13, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. upon Visa Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Chantale Fiebig. (Stein, David)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER A PSEUDONYM by Judge Cormac J. Carney (Dkt. #7 ). (twdb)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Danielle A D'Aquila APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Serena Fleites and Jane Doe Nos. 1 through 33, designating David M Stein as local counsel. (et)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Lauren Tabaksblat APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Serena Fleites and Jane Doe Nos. 1 through 33, designating David M Stein as local counsel. (et)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Michael J Bowe APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Serena Fleites and Jane Doe Nos. 1 through 33, designating David M Stein as local counsel. (et)
June 22, 2021 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Feras Antoon, Bernd Bergmair, Bergmair Does, Colbeck Capital Does, MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., David Tassillo, TrafficJunky Inc., Corey Urman, Visa Inc. (Attachments: #1 part 2)(twdb)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:21-cv-00338 CJC(ADSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-04920 CJC(ADSx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn)
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 to Summons)(Stein, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Danielle A. D'Aquila to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31486236) filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stein, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lauren Tabaksblat to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31486184) filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stein, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Bowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31486102) filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stein, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #6 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is directed to a non-defendant. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Danielle A. D'Aquila. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lauren Tabaksblat. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Bowe. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stein, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 and 2 to Summons)(Stein, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1(a) and 1(c) to Civil Cover Sheet)(Stein, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. Related Case(s): 8:21-cv-00338-CJC-ADS (Stein, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Notice of Pendency of Other Actions and Proceedings filed by PLAINTIFFS Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Stein, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFFS All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Stein, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31481775 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFFS Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attorney David M. Stein added to party Jane Doe(pty:pla), Attorney David M. Stein added to party Serena Fleites(pty:pla))(Stein, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serena Fleites et al v. MindGeek S.A.R.L. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bergmair Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MindGeek USA Incorporated
Represented By: Benjamin Maxwell Sadun
Represented By: Hayden Coleman
Represented By: Kathleen N. Massey
Represented By: Christopher R. Boisvert
Represented By: Michelle H. Yeary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RK Holdings USA Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Maxwell Sadun
Represented By: Kathleen N. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S Tulumello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TrafficJunky Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Maxwell Sadun
Represented By: Kathleen N. Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feras Antoon
Represented By: Colin C. Bridge
Represented By: David W. Wiechert
Represented By: Nathaniel P. T. Read
Represented By: S. Jason Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tassillo
Represented By: David W. Wiechert
Represented By: Jonathan S. Sack
Represented By: Karen R. King
Represented By: Ryan McMenamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colbeck Capital Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernd Bergmair
Represented By: Dan E. Marmalefsky
Represented By: Ronald G. White
Represented By: Andre Fontana
Represented By: Devon A. Little
Represented By: James Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MG Premiun LTD
Represented By: Benjamin Maxwell Sadun
Represented By: Hayden Coleman
Represented By: Kathleen N. Massey
Represented By: Christopher R. Boisvert
Represented By: Michelle H. Yeary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MG Freesites, LTD
Represented By: Benjamin Maxwell Sadun
Represented By: Hayden Coleman
Represented By: Kathleen N. Massey
Represented By: Christopher R. Boisvert
Represented By: Michelle H. Yeary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MindGeek S.A.R.L.
Represented By: Benjamin Maxwell Sadun
Represented By: Hayden Coleman
Represented By: Kathleen N. Massey
Represented By: Christopher R. Boisvert
Represented By: Michelle H. Yeary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Urman
Represented By: Evan S Nadel
Represented By: Adam B Korn
Represented By: Kathryn L. Ignash
Represented By: Peter A. Chavkin
Represented By: Kerime S. Akoglu
Represented By: Peter A. Biagetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MG Global Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Maxwell Sadun
Represented By: Hayden Coleman
Represented By: Kathleen N. Massey
Represented By: Christopher R. Boisvert
Represented By: Michelle H. Yeary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Maxwell Sadun
Represented By: Christopher R. Boisvert
Represented By: Michelle H. Yeary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serena Fleites
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Danielle A D'Aquila
Represented By: Lauren Tabaksblat
Represented By: Michael J Bowe
Represented By: David M Stein
Represented By: Danielle A. D'Aquila
Represented By: Meghan McCafferty
Represented By: John G. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: David M Stein
Represented By: Danielle A D'Aquila
Represented By: Lauren Tabaksblat
Represented By: Michael J Bowe
Represented By: Danielle A. D'Aquila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW & ECONOMICS
Represented By: Bradley A Benbrook
Represented By: Stephen Michael Duvernay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?