Renee Fontana v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Renee Fontana
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Womens Health, Inc. and Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R and D, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04976
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Northern District of Georgia, 1:21-cv-02712 filed 7/7/2021. (iv)
July 6, 2021 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - CTO-27 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2974, transferring case to USDC, USDC Northern District of Georgia and assigned to Honorable Leigh Martin May. Case transferred electronically on 7/7/2021. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.), (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (droj)
June 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
June 18, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R and D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Womens Health, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Renee Fontana. Filed in State Court on 4/29/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
June 18, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant The Cooper Companies, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Teva Womens Health, LLC.(Jones, Allison)
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Teva Womens Health, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
June 18, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
June 18, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant CooperSurgical, Inc..(Jones, Allison)
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Womens Health, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 served on 06/18/2021. (Jones, Allison)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Womens Health, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc., (Jones, Allison)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Womens Health, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Jones, Allison)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Los Angeles County, California, case number 21STCV16156 Receipt No: ACACDC-31489978 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Womens Health, LLC, Teva Womens Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party CooperSurgical, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Womens Health, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party Teva Womens Health, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Lenore Jones added to party The Cooper Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jones, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renee Fontana v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Fontana
Represented By: Lauren A Welling
Represented By: Timothy M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Womens Health, LLC
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Womens Health, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R and D, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Lenore Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?