Andrell Rodgers v. Alien Records, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andrell Rodgers and Andrell D Rogers
Defendant: Terrell McNeal, Norva Denton, DOES 1-10 inclusive, Carl D. Zook, NLE Choppa Entertainment, Inc., Bryson Potts, Zachary D. Thomas, MP808 Beats LLC, Alyssa M. Stephens, Warner Music Group Corp., Budda Beats, LLC, Alien Records, Inc., Ron Cabiltes and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv05139
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrell D Rogers, upon Defendant MP808 Beats LLC served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Terrell McNeal Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Blaise, Heather)
August 23, 2021 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrell D Rogers, upon Defendant Terrell McNeal served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Terrell McNeal MP808 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Blaise, Heather)
August 19, 2021 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrell D Rogers, upon Defendant Norva Denton served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; Bryson Potts served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christopher Boyd Front Desk Intake Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Norva Denton)(Blaise, Heather)
August 19, 2021 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrell D Rogers, upon Defendant Warner Music Group Corp. served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Warner Music Group Corp. c/o CT Corporation System in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Blaise, Heather)
August 18, 2021 Filing 30 ALIAS SUMMONS issued as to Defendant Alien Records, Inc. (mrgo)
August 18, 2021 Filing 29 ALIAS SUMMONS issued as to Defendant Carl D. Zook. (mrgo)
August 18, 2021 Filing 28 ALIAS SUMMONS issued as to Defendant Ron Cabiltes. (mrgo)
August 17, 2021 Filing 27 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 filed by Plaintiff Andrell D Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Carl Zook, #2 Ron Cabiltes)(Blaise, Heather)
August 17, 2021 Filing 26 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Andrell D Rogers. as to Alien Records, Inc., Ron Cabiltes, Carl D. Zook. (Attachments: #1 Ron Cabiltes, #2 Carl Zook)(Blaise, Heather)
August 17, 2021 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrell D Rogers, upon Defendant Alyssa M. Stephens served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alyssa M. Stephens in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Blaise, Heather)
August 12, 2021 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrell D Rogers, upon Defendant NLE Choppa Entertainment, Inc. served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kathy Hundley, Managing Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Blaise, Heather)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to defendant Bryson Potts. (mrgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to defendant Terrell McNeal. (mrgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to defendant Norva Denton. (mrgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to defendant NLE Choppa Entertainment, Inc. (mrgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to defendant Alien Records, Inc. (mrgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to defendant Carl D. Zook. (mrgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to defendant Ron Cabiltes. (mrgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to defendant Warner Music Group Corp. (mrgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to defendant Alyssa M. Stephens. (mrgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to defendant Zachary D. Thomas. (mrgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to defendant Budda Beats, LLC. (mrgo)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 as to defendant MP808 Beats LLC. (mrgo)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #9 filed by Plaintiff Andrell Rodgers. (Attachments: #1 Carl D. Zook, #2 Ron Cabiltes, #3 Warner Music Group Corp, #4 Bryson Potts, #5 NLE Choppa Entertainment, Inc., #6 Alyssa M. Stephens, #7 Zachary D. Thomas, #8 Budda Beats, LLC, #9 Terrell McNeal, #10 MP808 Beats LLC, #11 Norva Denton)(Blaise, Heather)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Alien Records, Inc., Budda Beats, LLC, Ron Cabiltes, Norva Denton, Does, MP808 Beats LLC, Terrell McNeal, NLE Choppa Entertainment, Inc., Bryson Potts, Alyssa M. Stephens, Zachary D. Thomas, Warner Music Group Corp., Carl D. Zook amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Andrell Rodgers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blaise, Heather)
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Andrell Rodgers. (Blaise, Heather)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andrell Rodgers, identifying Alien Records, Inc.; Carl D. Zook; Ron Cabiltes; Warner Music Group Corp.; Bryson Potts; NLE Choppa Entertainment, Inc.; Alyssa M. Stephens; Zachary D. Thomas; Budda Beats, LLC; Terrell McNeal; MP808 Beats LLC; Norva Denton. (Blaise, Heather)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Andrell Rodgers. (Blaise, Heather)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31521243 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Andrell Rodgers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Heather Lea Blaise added to party Andrell Rodgers(pty:pla))(Blaise, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrell Rodgers v. Alien Records, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrell McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norva Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl D. Zook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NLE Choppa Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryson Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary D. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MP808 Beats LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa M. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Group Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budda Beats, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alien Records, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Cabiltes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrell Rodgers
Represented By: Heather Lea Blaise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrell D Rogers
Represented By: Heather Lea Blaise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?