Lucia Cortez et al v. Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Kaufman, Lucia Cortez and shlomo Mizrachi
Defendant: Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano and DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv05172
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTES OF 1) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF LUCIA CORTEZ' COMPLAINT #8 ; 2) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF RACHEL KAUFMAN'S COMPLAINT #10 ; 3) PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND #13 (Video Conference-Zoom) held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motions under submission. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (lom)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Plaintiff Lucia Cortez. (Glovsky, Scott)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano. (Kanno, Rita)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Defendants Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano. (Kanno, Rita)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE RE.: 1) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF LUCIA CORTEZ' COMPLAINT #8 ; and 2) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF RACHEL KAUFMAN'S COMPLAINT #10 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The hearing date regarding these motions is continued from August 6, 2021 to August 20, 2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Plaintiff Rachel Kaufman's Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Complaint of Rachel Kaufman) #10 filed by Defendants Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano. (Kanno, Rita)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Plaintiff Lucia Cortez' Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Complaint of Lucia Cortez) #8 filed by Defendants Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano. (Kanno, Rita)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Complaint of Rachel Kaufman) #10 filed by Plaintiffs Lucia Cortez, Rachel Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Messner in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Rachel Kaufman's Complaint)(Glovsky, Scott)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Complaint of Lucia Cortez) #8 filed by Plaintiffs Lucia Cortez, Rachel Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Messner in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Lucia Cortez' Complaint)(Glovsky, Scott)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Lucia Cortez, Rachel Kaufman, identifying Lucia Cortez; Rachel Kaufman. (Glovsky, Scott)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiffs Lucia Cortez, Rachel Kaufman. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Messner in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand) (Glovsky, Scott)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (tf)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Complaint of Rachel Kaufman) #10 filed by Defendants Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano. (Kanno, Rita)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Complaint of Rachel Kaufman) filed by Defendants Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano. Motion set for hearing on 8/6/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rita R. Kanno in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Rachel Kaufman's Complaint, #2 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Rachel Kaufman's Complaint) (Kanno, Rita)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Complaint of Lucia Cortez) #8 filed by Defendants Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano. (Kanno, Rita)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Complaint of Lucia Cortez) filed by Defendants Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano. Motion set for hearing on 8/6/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rita R. Kanno in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Lucia Cortez' Complaint, #2 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Lucia Cortez' Complaint) (Kanno, Rita)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order NON-CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Lucia Cortez, Rachel Kaufman, upon Defendant Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bia Santiago Receptionist/Accepting Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Submitted with Attachment 7 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Lucia Cortez, Rachel Kaufman. Filed in State Court on 4/20/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Lucia Cortez, Rachel Kaufman, upon Defendant Crystal Solorzano served on 5/27/2021, answer due 6/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe Secretary in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. Submitted with Attachment 8 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION filed by Defendants Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34)(Kanno, Rita)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano, (Kanno, Rita)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Crystal Solorzano. (Kanno, Rita)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV14847 Receipt No: ACACDC-31530756 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Crystal Solorzano, Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1 Summons, #2 Exhibit A2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit A4 Addendum to Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A5 Notice of Case Assignment, #6 Exhibit A6 Notice of Case Management Conference, #7 Exhibit A7 Proof of Service Re Parkwest, #8 Exhibit A8 Proof of Service Re C Solorzano, #9 Exhibit B Notice to Adverse Party of Removal, #10 Exhibit C Notice to State Court of Removal) (Attorney Rita Rebecca Kanno added to party Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rita Rebecca Kanno added to party Crystal Solorzano(pty:dft))(Kanno, Rita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucia Cortez et al v. Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkwest Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Rita Rebecca Kanno
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Walker
Represented By: Lann Gottesman McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Solorzano
Represented By: Rita Rebecca Kanno
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Walker
Represented By: Lann Gottesman McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Kaufman
Represented By: Scott Charles Glovsky
Represented By: Steven Patrick Messner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Cortez
Represented By: Scott Charles Glovsky
Represented By: Steven Patrick Messner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: shlomo Mizrachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?