Michael Bernard Potere v. The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California et al
Plaintiff: Michael Bernard Potere
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California and Donna S. Hershkowitz
Case Number: 2:2021cv05208
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Filing 34 JUDGMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt, Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations #33 . IT IS ADJUDGED that Judgment be entered dismissing the operative First Amended Complaint without leave to amend and dismissing this action. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge John A. Kronstadt for MOTION to Dismiss #18 , Report and Recommendation (Issued) #24 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that (1) Defendants' unopposed Request for Judicial Notice is granted; (2) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint is granted; (3) the First Amended Complaint is dismissed without leave to amend; (4) this action is dismissed; and (5) Judgment shall be entered accordingly. (see document for further details) (hr)
April 8, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. Party name listed in document conflicts with docket text. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 8, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
April 7, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Jou Chang on behalf of Defendants Donna S. Hershkowitz, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California (Chang, James)
April 7, 2022 Filing 29 Appearance of Counsel (Retana, Robert)
February 23, 2022 Filing 28 REPLY TO OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued), #24 filed by Defendants Donna S. Hershkowitz, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California. (Chang, James)
February 10, 2022 Filing 27 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued), #24 filed by plaintiff Michael Bernard Potere.(Potere, Michael)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON, SUBMITTING, AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR THIRTY (30) DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Report and Recommendation (Issued) #24 . Plaintiff's deadline to file Objections to the Report and Recommendation is extended to February 10, 2022. (hr)
January 4, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Notice of Report and Recommendation, #23 , Report and Recommendation (Issued), #24 filed by plaintiff Michael Bernard Potere. Motion set for hearing on 2/1/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Potere, Michael)
December 28, 2021 Filing 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Board of Trustees of The State Bar of California and Leah Wilson's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof
December 28, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Lodging of Proposed Judgment and Order. Objections to R&R due by 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Report and Recommendation, #2 Proposed Order and Judgment) (et)
October 4, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Board of Trustees of The State Bar of California and Leah Wilson's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #18 filed by Defendants Donna S. Hershkowitz, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California. (Chang, James)
September 27, 2021 Filing 21 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Board of Trustees of The State Bar of California and Leah Wilson's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #18 filed by Plaintiff Michael Bernard Potere. (Potere, Michael)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS; AND (2) TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION #18 by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Plaintiff shall file an opposition/response to Defendants' Motions by not later than September 27, 2021, and Defendants shall file a reply by not later than October 4, 2021. (see document for further details) (hr)
September 20, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Board of Trustees of The State Bar of California and Leah Wilson's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #18 filed by Defendants Donna S. Hershkowitz, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California. (Andresen, Carissa)
September 20, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Board of Trustees of The State Bar of California and Leah Wilson's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Donna S. Hershkowitz, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California. (Andresen, Carissa)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS ORIGINAL SUPERSEDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (DOCKET NOS. #12 , #13 ) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. In light of Plaintiff's filing of a First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 15), Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Request for Judicial Notice, which are directed to the non-operative original Complaint instead of the First Amended Complaint which supersedes the original Complaint, are moot and are denied such. (hr)
September 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carissa Noelle Andresen on behalf of Defendants Donna S. Hershkowitz, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California (Attorney Carissa Noelle Andresen added to party Donna S. Hershkowitz(pty:dft), Attorney Carissa Noelle Andresen added to party The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California(pty:dft))(Andresen, Carissa)
September 4, 2021 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Referred), #1 , filed by plaintiff Michael Bernard Potere (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Potere, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS; AND (2) VACATING HEARING DATE AND TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 . Plaintiff shall file an opposition/response to Defendants' Motions by not later than September 21, 2021,1 and Defendants shall file a reply by not later than September 28, 2021. The hearing calendared for October 12, 2021 is hereby vacated and the matter taken off calendar. The matter will be deemed submitted on the date on which Defendants' Reply is due. (see document for further details) (hr)
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #12 filed by Defendants Donna S. Hershkowitz, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California. (Chang, James)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Donna S. Hershkowitz, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California. Motion set for hearing on 10/12/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Chang, James)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE Notice of Automatic Substitution of Public Officer Defendant Party Pursuant to FRCP 25(d) filed by Defendant Donna S. Hershkowitz, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California. (Chang, James)
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, re Complaint - (Referred), #1 filed by Defendants Donna S. Hershkowitz, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California.(Attorney James Jou Chang added to party Donna S. Hershkowitz(pty:dft), Attorney James Jou Chang added to party The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California(pty:dft))(Chang, James)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Donna S. Hershkowitz, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California. (hr)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (DOCKET NO. #4 ) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, is reminded that pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.1.1: (1) he must register to use the Court's CM/ECF System within five days of being served with the instant order; and (2) if he does not already have a PACER account, he must establish one within the same five-day period. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Court's website. Upon registering, plaintiff will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (see document for further details) (hr)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING (1) SERVICE OF PROCESS; AND (2) REQUIREMENTS FOR PREPARATION AND SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Plaintiff is advised that, under Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, service of the summons and complaint must be accomplished on each named defendant within 90 days after the filing of the complaint. The 90-day period will expire on September 22, 2021. (see document for further details) (hr)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Michael Bernard Potere. (esa)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Michael Bernard Potere. (esa)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Michael Bernard Potere. (esa)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against defendants Donna S. Hershkowitz, The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, filed by plaintiff Michael Bernard Potere. (Attachments: #1 CV 71, #2 Summons to issue) (esa) Modified on 6/25/2021 (esa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Bernard Potere v. The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bernard Potere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of the State Bar of California
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Represented By: Robert G Retana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna S. Hershkowitz
Represented By: James Jou Chang
Represented By: Carissa Noelle Andresen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?