Frances Fisher v. Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists et al
Plaintiff: Frances Fisher
Defendant: Linda Powell, Michael Pniewski, David Hartley Margolin, Ray Rodriguez, Duncan Crabtree Ireland, Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, Gabrielle Carteris, John T. Mcguire, David P. White, John Carter Brown, Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists and David Hartley-Margolin
Case Number: 2:2021cv05215
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint adding Claim Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 501(A) filed by Plaintiff Frances Fisher. Application set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 [Proposed] First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to [Proposed] First Amended Complaint) (Johnson, Neville)
August 4, 2021 Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule JOINT STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING OF THE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO ADD SECTION 501(a) CLAIM AND RULE 12 MOTION filed by plaintiffs John Carter Brown, Gabrielle Carteris, Duncan Crabtree Ireland, John T. Mcguire, Linda Powell, Ray Rodriguez, David P. White.(Leonard, Danielle)
August 4, 2021 Filing 21 STATEMENT PROPOSED 29 U.S.C. 501 CLAIM DEFENDANTS STATEMENT RE: LACK OF GOOD CAUSE filed by Defendants John Carter Brown, Gabrielle Carteris, Duncan Crabtree Ireland, John T. Mcguire, Linda Powell, Ray Rodriguez, David P. White (Leonard, Danielle)
August 3, 2021 Filing 20 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 06/25/2021, receipt number ACACDC-31533169), filed by Plaintiff Frances Fisher.(Johnson, Neville)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Emely L Skaug APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frances Fisher, designating Neville L Johnson as local counsel. (jp)
July 28, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE (In Chambers) PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PROPOSED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 501 (Dkt. 1, filed June 25, 2021) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court ORDERS as follows: 1. Plaintiffs verified application to file the proposed complaint is DENIED, without prejudice to plaintiff filing a complaint setting forth her Section 159(a) claim, alongside a verified application for leave to add a claim pursuant to Section 501(a). 2. The proposed defendants SHALL file any opposition to the verified application for leave to add the Section 501(a) claim concurrently with their responsive pleading or Rule 12 motion, whichever is first filed. a. In the interim, the Court DIRECTS the parties as follows: i. The parties shall meet and confer and submit a stipulated schedule for briefing the application for leave to add the Section 501(a) claim, and any Rule 12 motion, on or before August 4, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more details. (shb)
July 27, 2021 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily L. Skaug to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frances Fisher (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31700967) filed by Plaintiff Frances Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Neville)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: GRANTING #14 Non-Resident Attorney Steven A. Schwartz APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frances Fisher, designating Neville L. Johnson as local counsel. (shb)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: GRANTING #13 Non-Resident Attorney Robert Kriner, Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frances Fisher, designating Neviille L. Johnson as local counsel. (shb)
July 8, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven A. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frances Fisher (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31597994) filed by Plaintiff Frances Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Neville)
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert J. Kriner, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frances Fisher (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31597736) filed by Plaintiff Frances Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Neville)
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Frances Fisherto Response,, #11 (Johnson, Neville)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Defendants John Carter Brown, Gabrielle Carteris, David Hartley-Margolin, Duncan Crabtree Ireland, John T. Mcguire, Michael Pniewski, Linda Powell, Ray Rodriguez, Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, David P. Whiteto Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Proposed Defendants' Preliminary Response to Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File Proposed Complaint Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 501 (Leonard, Danielle)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 21-01 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-10914 CAS(JEMx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for DISCOVERY. The case number will now read as follows: 2:21-cv-05215 CAS(JEMx). Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (rn)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward Siedle. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Emily L. Skaug. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert J. Kriner, Jr.. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven A. Schwartz. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Frances Fisher, identifying Frances Fisher, Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, Gabrielle Carteris, David P. White, Duncan Crabtree-Ireland, Ray Rodriguez, John T. Mcguire, Michael Pniewski, David Hartley-Margolin, John Carter Brown, Linda Powell. (Johnson, Neville)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Frances Fisher. (Johnson, Neville)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION For Leave to File Proposed Complaint Pursuant To 29 U.S.C. 501 Receipt No: ACACDC-31533169 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Frances Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Class Action Complaint) (Attorney Neville Lawrence Johnson added to party Frances Fisher(pty:pla))(Johnson, Neville)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frances Fisher v. Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Powell
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Represented By: Jeffrey B Demain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pniewski
Represented By: Julie Gutman Dickinson
Represented By: Lisa C Demidovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hartley Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Rodriguez
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Represented By: Jeffrey B Demain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan Crabtree Ireland
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Represented By: Jeffrey B Demain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabrielle Carteris
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Represented By: Jeffrey B Demain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Mcguire
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Represented By: Jeffrey B Demain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. White
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Represented By: Jeffrey B Demain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carter Brown
Represented By: Danielle Evelyn Leonard
Represented By: Jeffrey B Demain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Screen Actors Guild American Federation of Television and Radio Artists
Represented By: Julie Gutman Dickinson
Represented By: Lisa C Demidovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hartley-Margolin
Represented By: Julie Gutman Dickinson
Represented By: Lisa C Demidovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Fisher
Represented By: Neville Lawrence Johnson
Represented By: Daniel Boris Lifschitz
Represented By: Douglas L Johnson
Represented By: Emily L. Skaug
Represented By: Robert J. Kriner, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?