Bonnie L. Franklin v. DiDi Global Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bonnie L. Franklin
Defendant: DiDi Global Inc., Will Wei Cheng, Jean Qing Liu, Stephen Jingshi Zhu, Alan Yue Zhuo, Colleen A. De Vries, Cogency Global Inc., Goldman Sachs (Asia) L.L.C., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs Asia L.L.C., Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC, Zhiyi Chen, Martin Chi Ping Lau, Kentaro Matsui, Adria Perica, Daniel Yong Zhang, BofA Securities, Inc., Barclays Capital Inc., China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., UBS Securities LLC, BOCI Asia Limited, BOCOM International Securities Limited, CCB International Capital Limited, CLSA Limited, CMB International Capital Limited, Futu Inc., ICBC International Securities Limited, Mizuho Securities USA LLC and Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited
Case Number: 2:2021cv05486
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-05486 AB(SKx). (rn)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-05486 CAS(SKx). (rn)
July 9, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #10 as to Defendants BOCI Asia Limited, BOCOM International Securities Limited, Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., CCB International Capital Limited, CLSA Limited, CMB International Capital Limited, Zhiyi Chen, Will Wei Cheng, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cogency Global Inc., Colleen A. De Vries, DiDi Global Inc., Futu Inc., Goldman Sachs Asia L.L.C., Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICBC International Securities Limited, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Martin Chi Ping Lau, Jean Qing Liu, Kentaro Matsui, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC, Adria Perica, Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited, UBS Securities LLC, Daniel Yong Zhang, Stephen Jingshi Zhu, Alan Yue Zhuo. (jp)
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Plaintiff Bonnie L. Franklin. (Rosen, Laurence)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Bonnie L. Franklin(Rosen, Laurence)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. If party names do not fit in space provided, enter only the name of the first party and write see attached. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bonnie L. Franklin. (Rosen, Laurence)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bonnie L. Franklin, (Rosen, Laurence)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bonnie L. Franklin. (Rosen, Laurence)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31584666 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Bonnie L. Franklin. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification) (Attorney Laurence M. Rosen added to party Bonnie L. Franklin(pty:pla))(Rosen, Laurence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonnie L. Franklin v. DiDi Global Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie L. Franklin
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DiDi Global Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Wei Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Qing Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Jingshi Zhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Yue Zhuo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen A. De Vries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cogency Global Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs (Asia) L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Asia L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhiyi Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Chi Ping Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentaro Matsui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adria Perica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Yong Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BofA Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOCI Asia Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOCOM International Securities Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCB International Capital Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLSA Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMB International Capital Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Futu Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICBC International Securities Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?